Jacob Vieira -v- Elizabeth Warren, Etal
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. BCVBS06262

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jacob Vieira, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morgan Law Firm +1 760 256 2183
v.
Warren, Elizabeth Warren, Elizabeth, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elizabeth Warren"
Complaint 1 0001 Cmp
Complaint 1 Filing Date 4/22/2002
Complaint 1 Status Dismissed W/predjudice 12/10/2002
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002
Dismissal With Prejudice As To Entire Action Filed
    Blank 12 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002
    Stage At Disposition: Other Dismissals And Transfers
      Blank 11 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002
      Court Now Rules -- Stat Case For 2c Report
        Blank 10
        Minutes: Minutes John P Vanderfeer Presiding. Clerk: Carol Mauk Reporter: Valerie Foster Bailiff: Rick Alcantara - Appearances: Attorney Brian Morgan Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. - Hearings: Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement Set For 08:30 At B2 In Department Notice Of Settlement Has Been Filed Appearance Is Mandatory Unless Dismissal Documents Are Filed 5 Court Days Prior To Next Hearing. Minute Order End
          Blank 9 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002
          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Jacob Vieira.
            Blank 8 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002
            Notice Of Settlement Filed By Jacob Vieira.
              Blank 7 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002
              Notice Of Continuance Of Cmc Filed.
                Blank 6
                Minutes: Minutes John P Vanderfeer Presiding. Clerk: Carol Mauk Reporter: Valerie Foster Bailiff: Dave Leicht - Appearances: Attorney Brian Morgan Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. - Hearings: Current Hearing Continued To 11/18/02 At 08:30 In Department B2. Case Is To Be Dismissed Or Default Or Answer Is To Be Filed Prior To Next Hearing. Minute Order End
                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002
                  Vacate Oscsv Hearing Scheduled For 06/21/02 At 08:30 In Department B2.
                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002
                    Proof Of Service Of Smmns Cmplt Ntc Case Assgnmnt Cmc Osc Serv Cccs Served On 05/14/02 As To Elizabeth Warren ( Prsnl)
                      Blank 3 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002
                      Summons Issued On Complaint (unlimited) Filed 04/22/2002 Of Jacob Vieira
                        Blank 2 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002
                        Complaint And Party Information Entered
                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002
                          Case Assigned For All Purposes To Department B2

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 12 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?