Eloy Romero V. Perfumania, Et Al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. CIVBS1100123
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Eloy Romero, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gloria Dredd Haney +1 714 938 3230 +1 714 921 2856 dreddlaw@sbcglobal.net
v.
No Logo Ipc International, Defendant
No Logo Mike Callahan, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jackson Lewis Llp +1 213 689 0404
No Logo Perfumania, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jackson Lewis Llp +1 213 689 0404
No Logo Simon Property Group, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Simon Property Group"
No Logo STEVE COHEN, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jackson Lewis Llp +1 213 689 0404
No Logo Stewart Greenhut, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jackson Lewis Llp +1 213 689 0404
Attributes
Complaint 1 0001 Cmp Complaint Unlimited Of Eloy Romero
Complaint 1 Filing Date 3/14/2011
Complaint 1 Status Req For Dsmsl No Adr Before Trial (civ) 10/09/2013
Timeline
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (11) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 85 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013
Return To Court's Control
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013
Request For Dismissal Filed- With Prejudice. (imaged)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 83 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minutesstage At Disposition: Request For Dismissal No Adr Before Trial (civ) Disposition: Request For Dismissal No Adr Before Trial (civ)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 82 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013
Court Orders Matter Stayed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 81 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013
Vacate Jt Hearing Scheduled For 08/12/13 At 09:30 In Department S32.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013
Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Action Filed By Eloy Romero.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 79 Filed: None, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes: Minutesdonald Alvarez, Judge Clerk: Stephanie Chandler Court Reporter Lisa Jelke 10643 Court Attendant Eric Ashe - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Dredd Haney Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. Attorney Thomas Mackey Present For Defendant/respondent. - Proceedings: Hearing On: Trial Setting Conference Held Predisposition Hearing Held Parties Announce Ready For Trial No Time Estimate Given. Jury Fees Are To Be Posted At Least 25 Days Prior To Trial Date. Failure To Post Jury Fees Will Be Deemed A Waiver Of Jury Trial. Trial Requested. - Hearings: Set On Trial Readiness/assignment Calendar For 08/08/13 At 08:30 In Department S32 Jury Trial Set For 08/12/13 At 09:30 In Department S32 Estimated Duration Of 0 Days. Notice Waived. Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 78 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013
Update Jurisdiction To Ds.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 77 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013
Update Jurisdiction To Ds.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 76 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013
Case Re-assigned To Department S32 For All Purposes. Notice Of Re-assignment Sent To All Counsel Of Record.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 75 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013
Hearing Re-assigned
Request RequestSpace
Blank 74 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013
Hearing Re-assigned
Request RequestSpace
Blank 73 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minutesmediator Hon. Michael B. Rutberg (ret.) From Ivams Present. Clerk: Cara Huston Not Reported - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Dredd Haney Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. Plaintiff Eloy Romero Present Attorney Thomas Mackey Present For Defendant/respondent. Defendant Perfumania, Mike Callahan Present Parties Not Present: Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut - Proceedings: Action Came On For Voluntary Settlement Conference. Predisposition Hearing Held Settlement Conference Held. No Settlement Reached Parties Are Referred To Department B3 For Further Action. Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 72 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Becky Genovesi Court Reporter Cathy Albritton 7137 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Dredd Haney Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. Plaintiff Eloy Romero Present Attorney Thomas Mackey Present For Defendant/respondent. Defendant Mike Callahan Present Parties Not Present: Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut - Proceedings: Action Came On For Mandatory Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference Held. - Court Finds: No Settlement Reached - The Court Now Orders This Case Assigned To Department ( S32) For All Purposes. Assigned To Dept. S32 - Hearings: Hearing Re: Trial Setting Set For 05/15/13 At 08:30 In Department S32. Notice Waived. Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 71 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013
Fee Payment
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013
Pltf Eloy Romeros Settlement Conference Statement Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 69 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013
Conformed Copy Mailed To Counsel
Request RequestSpace
Blank 68 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013
Fee Payment
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013
Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief Filed By Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut
Request RequestSpace
Blank 66 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013
New Volume Made. Volume 03 Includes Documents Filed Between 12/20/12 And 01/10/13.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 65 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Court Filing
Stip For Appointment Of Court Commissioner As Judge Pro Tem Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 64 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Carol Mauk Court Reporter Cathy Albritton 7137 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Haney Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. Thomas Mackey Appears By Courtcall For Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut. - Proceedings: Action Came On For Defendants Motion For Sanctions. Predisposition Hearing Held - Motion Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut's Motion For Sanctions Is Heard. Argued By Counsel And Submitted. - Court Finds: Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut's Motion For Sanctions Is Denied. Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 63 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Carol Mauk Court Reporter Cathy Albritton 7137 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Haney Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. Thomas Mackey Appears By Courtcall For Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut. - Proceedings: Action Came On For Trial Setting Conference. Predisposition Hearing Held - Hearings: Voluntary Settlement Conference Set On 03/21/13 At 11:30 In Dept Vmc. Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For 03/21/13 At 11:30 In Department B3 (rule 3.1380 Of The California Rules Of Court Settled Statements Shall Be Filed With The Department 5 Days Prior To Hearing) Notice Waived. Action - Complete Minute Order End ==minute Order Changed Or Corrected By Cmauk; Changes Made Are As Follows: Correct Dates == Minute Order Corrected On 02/14/13
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013
Order Denying Pltfs Mtn For Summary Judgment Signed And Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013
Reply P&as In Support Of Defts Mtn For Sanctions Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013
Reply Declaration Of Thomas G. Mackey In Support Of Defts Mtn For Sanctions Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 59 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: 1/16/2013
Fee Payment
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: 1/16/2013
Points & Authorities Filed By Eloy Romero.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: 1/16/2013
Declaration Of Gloria Dredd Haney/support Of Oppo To Mtn Sanction Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 56 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013 Court Filing
Stip For Appointment Of Court Commissioner As Judge Pro Tem Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 55 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Carol Mauk Court Reporter Cathy Albritton 7137 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Dredd Haney Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. Thomas Mackey Appears By Courtcall For Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut. - Proceedings: Action Came On For Osc Re: Trial Setting. Predisposition Hearing Held - Hearings: Trial Setting Conference Set For 01/30/13 At 08:30 In Dept. B3 To Be Heard At Time Of Motion Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 54 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Carol Mauk Court Reporter Cathy Albritton 7137 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Dredd Haney Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. Thomas Mackey Appears By Courtcall For Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut. - Proceedings: Action Came On For Pltfs Motion For Summary Judgment/adjudication. Predisposition Hearing Held - Eloy Romero's Motion (10/22/12) For Summary Judgment/adjudication Is Heard. Argued By Counsel And Submitted. - Court Finds: Eloy Romero's Motion For Summary Judgment/adjudication Is Denied. As To All Causes Of Action - Mr. Mackey To Prepare Notice Of Ruling. And Submit To Opposing Counsel For Approval As To Form And Content. Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013
Declaration Of Thomas Mackey/support Of Mtn Sanctions Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013
Motion Re: Sanctions Set For Hearing On 01/30/13, Filed By Defendant Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut (imaged)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 51 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013
Vacate Oscx Hearing Scheduled For 01/03/13 At 08:30 In Department B3.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 50 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: 1/2/2013
Vacate L&m Hearing Scheduled For 01/03/13 At 08:30 In Department B3.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 49 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: 1/2/2013
Called Counsel On Both Sides & Gave Notice Of Cont
Request RequestSpace
Blank 48 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: 1/2/2013
On Court's Motion, The Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing Presently Set In This Case, Is Ordered Reset For 01/10/13 At 08:30 In Department B3. Notice Sent To All Counsel Of Record.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012
Proof Of Service Of Reply-req/judical Ntc-objections-decl By Overnight Mail On 10/19/12 As To See Service Lst, Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012
Pltfs Objections In Support Of Msj * Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012
Points & Authorities Filed By Eloy Romero.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012
Request For Judicial Notice Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012
Reply Declaration Of Gloria Dredd Haney In Support Of Plts Mtn For Summary Judgment Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012
Notice Of Return Of Document(s)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 41 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012
Advanced Jury Fees Posted For Eloy Romero.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 40 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012
Notice Of Posting Jury Fees Is Returned By Court For The Following Reason(s): Per Rule 3.250-document Not Filed With The Court, However Your Fees Are.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 39 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012
New Volume Made. Volume 2 Includes Documents Filed Between 10/22/12 And 12/20/12.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012
Proof Of Service Of Pas,opp To Msj,dec Of T.mackey,def Evid Obj By Mail On 12/20/12 As To Law Office Of Gloria Haney, Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012
Def Evidentiary Objection In Sppt Of Opp To Pla Msj Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012
Declaration Of Thomas G Mackey In Sppt Of Opp To Pla Msj Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012
Opposition To Motion Re: Summary Judgment Set For Hearing On 01/03/13, Filed By Defendant Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut (imaged)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012
Points & Authorities Filed By Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 33 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Carol Mauk Court Reporter Cathy Albritton 7137 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Gloria Haney Appears By Courtcall For Eloy Romero. Thomas Mackey Appears By Courtcall For Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut. Parties Stipulate To Commissioner - Proceedings: Action Came On For Osc Re: Trial Setting. Predisposition Hearing Held - Hearings: Current Hearing Continued To 01/03/13 At 08:30 In Department B3. To Be Heard With Summary Judgment Motion Notice Waived. Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: 10/22/2012
Declaration Of Gloria Dredd Haney Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: 10/22/2012
Pltfs Separate Statment Of Undisputed Material Facts Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: 10/22/2012
Motion Re: Summary Judgment Set For Hearing On 01/03/13, Filed By Plaintiff Eloy Romero (imaged)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 29 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Court Filing
Stip For Appointment Of Court Commissioner As Judge Pro Tem Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 28 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Becky Genovesi Court Reporter Cathy Albritton 7137 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Dredd Haney Present For Plaintiff/petitioner. Attorney Thomas Mackey Present For Defendant/respondent. - Proceedings: Action Came On For Osc Re: Mediation Completion. Predisposition Hearing Held - Hearings: Order To Show Cause Re : Trial Setting Set For 10/24/12 At 08:30 In Department B3. Notice Waived. Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 27 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Becky Genovesi Court Reporter Rita Cortinas 7776 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Dredd Haney Appears By Courtcall For Eloy Romero. Attorney Brian Fahy Appears By Courtcall For Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut. Parties Not Present: Ipc International, Simon Property Group - Proceedings: Action Came On For Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference Held. Counsel Stipulates To The Court Commissioner By Court Call. - Parties To Seek Mediation And Select A Mutually Agreeable Mediator And Bear Costs. Mediation To Be Completed By 04/30/12. - Hearings: Order To Show Cause Re : Mediation Completion Set For 05/30/12 At 08:30 In Department B3. Appearance Mandatory Unless Matter Is Resolved And Proper Court Documents Are Filed Five Court Days Prior To The Court Date. Notice Waived. Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 26 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012
Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Eloy Romero.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012
Fee Payment
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/11/2012
Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Court Filing
Stip For Appointment Of Court Commissioner As Judge Pro Tem Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: None, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Becky Genovesi Court Reporter Cathy Albritton 7137 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Dredd Haney Appears By Courtcall For Eloy Romero. Attorney Sandra Mcmullan Present For Defendant/respondent. - Proceedings: Action Came On For Osc Re: Cmc/sanctions Defense Atty Fta 8/10/11. Predisposition Hearing Held Counsel Stipulates To The Court Commissioner By Court Call. Stip For Appointment Of Court Commissioner As Judge Pro Tem Filed The Court Imposes Sanctions On Counsel For Defense In The Amount Of $90.00 (court Call Fees For Plaintiff) Payable To Attorney Gloria Dredd Haney On Or Before 11/02/11. - Hearings: Case Management Conference Set For 01/25/12 At 08:30 In Department B3 Court Orders Parties To Submit New Case Management Statements. - Appearance Is Mandatory Unless Matter Is Resolved And Proper Documents Filed 5 Court Days Prior To Hearing. Notice Waived. Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 21 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Minuteskirtland L Mahlum, Commissioner Clerk: Becky Genovesi Court Reporter Cathy Albritton 7137 Bailiff: Janet Halterman - Appearances: Attorney Gloria Haney Appears By Courtcall For Eloy Romero. Jackson Lewis Llp For Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut Not Present Parties Not Present: Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut - Proceedings: Action Came On For Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference Held. Counsel Stipulates To The Court Commissioner By Court Call. - Court Finds That Attorney For Defense, Attorney Andrea Somerville Applied For Court Call But Did Not Appear Today. - Hearings: Order To Show Cause Re : Cmc/sanctions Defense Atty Fta 8/10/11 Set For 09/14/11 At 08:30 In Department B3. Mandatory Appearance Parties Are Hereby Advised That Failure To Appear May Result In Dismissal And/or Answer Being Stricken And Default Being Entered. Notice Given By Judicial Assistant Correspondence Coversheet Generated To Mail Copy Of 8/10/11 Minute Order To Counsel Of Record. Action - Complete Minute Order End
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 20 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/2/2011
Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011
Fee Payment
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011
Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Eloy Romero.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011
Vacate Oscsv Hearing Scheduled For 06/15/11 At 08:30 In Department B3.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011
Filing Fee Paid By Eloy Romero For Fax Filing/pos Req Dism
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011
Proof Of Service Of Sum/comp Ntc/assign Ntc/cmc Ntc/osc Filed As To Perfumania. Party Served On 04/15/11. Type Of Service Is Sub-service (manager). With Fees Of $100.00.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011
Proof Of Service Of Sum/comp Ntc/assign Ntc/osc Ntc/cmc Filed As To Mike Callahan. Party Served On 04/15/11. Type Of Service Is Sub-service (manager). With Fees Of $100.00.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011
Proof Of Service Of Sum/comp Ntc/assign Ntc/cmc Ntc/osc Filed As To Steve Cohen. Party Served On 04/15/11. Type Of Service Is Sub-service (manager). With Fees Of $100.00.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011
Proof Of Service Of Sum/comp Ntc/assign Ntc/cmc Ntc/osc Filed As To Stewart Greenhut. Party Served On 04/11/11. Type Of Service Is Personal. With Fees Of $100.00.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011
Dismissal Filed As To Simon Property Group, Without Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011
Dismissal Filed As To Ipc International, Without Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011
Answer Filed By Perfumania, Mike Callahan, Steve Cohen, Stewart Greenhut; Party Represented By Jackson Lewis Llp.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011
On The Complaint (unlimited) Filed 03/14/2011 Of Eloy Romero, Ipc International Is Added As A Defendant.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011
On The Complaint (unlimited) Filed 03/14/2011 Of Eloy Romero, Simon Property Group Is Added As A Defendant.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011
On The Complaint (unlimited) Filed 03/14/2011 Of Eloy Romero, Stewart Greenhut Is Added As A Defendant.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011
On The Complaint (unlimited) Filed 03/14/2011 Of Eloy Romero, Mike Callahan Is Added As A Defendant.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011
On The Complaint (unlimited) Filed 03/14/2011 Of Eloy Romero, Steve Cohen Is Added As A Defendant.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/14/2011
Summons Issued On Complaint (unlimited) Filed 03/14/2011 Of Eloy Romero - Original Filed In Court File.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/14/2011
Case Assigned For All Purposes To Department B3
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/14/2011
Complaint And Party Information Entered
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 200 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?