Arena v. Boyd

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC324057
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Vincent Arena, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Jason Boyd, Defendant
Attributes
Complaint 1 0001 Ud Unlawful Detainer Complaint Of Vincent Arena
Complaint 1 Filing Date 2/18/1999
Complaint 1 Status Judgment 03/02/1999
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010
Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999
Writ Of Possession Returned Satisfied
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999
Application For Issuance Of Writ Of Possession Filed (form Ri-003).
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 11 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999
Writ Of Possession Issued For The County Of Riverside
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999
Judgment By Default By Clerk - Possession Only Filed 02/02/99
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999
Request For Entry Of Default And Clerk's Judgment For Possession Only On The Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed 02/18/1999 Of Vincent Arena As To Jason Boyd
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999
Application For Judgment For Restitution Of Premises Only, Pursuant To C.c.p 1169.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999
Summons And Proof Of Service Of Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed 02/18/1999 Of Vincent Arena On Jason Boyd Service Date Of 02/19/99 (personally Served)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999
Certified Copy(s) Made.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 5 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999
Prejudgment Claim Of Right To Possession Attached To The Complaint
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999
Filed; Clerks Notice Of Complaint For Unlawful Detainer.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 3 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Notice Sent To Jason Boyd On 2/18/99.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 2 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999
Osc Re: Dismissal Of Case Set 4/21/99, @ 8:00, In Department 22
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999
Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed - Under $10,000.00 - Summons Issued
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

Statistics

This case has been viewed 7 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?