Royal Citrus v. Bennett

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC331854
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Royal Citrus Company, Plaintiff

Represented by Pistone Baruch & Wolder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pistone Baruch & Wolder +1 949 622 8980
v.
No Logo Robert Bennett, Defendant
Attributes
Complaint 1 0001 Cmp Complaint Of Royal Citrus Company
Complaint 1 Filing Date 8/20/1999
Complaint 1 Status Transferred Out 02/16/2000
Timeline
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010
Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000
Receipt For Record Returned From Tulare County, Superior Court, With New Case Number: 190408
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 20 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000
Receipt For Record Sent To The Superior Court--county Of Tulare.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 19 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000
Check #10724 In The Amount Of $185.00.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 18 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000
Transferred To The Superior Court--county Of Tulare.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 17 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000
Complaint Filed 08/20/1999 Of Royal Citrus Company Ordered Transferred To The Superior Court--county Of Tulare.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 16 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000
Transfer Fees Were Received
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 15 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000
Hearing On Order To Show Cause Set 2/16/00, @ 8:30 In Dept 07
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/19/2000
Nonopposition To Motion For Change Of Venue
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000
Proof Of Service Of Motion For Change Of Venue Filed.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999
Declaration Of Robert Bennett In Support Of Motion For Change Of Venue
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999
Memo Of Points & Authorities In Support Of/to Motion To Change Venue By Robert Bennett Filed.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 10 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999
Motion Set For 1/21/00, @ 8:30 In Department 07
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999
Notice Of Motion For Change Of Venue By Robert Bennett Filed.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 8 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999
First Appearance Posted By Robert Bennett
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999
Response To Order To Show Cause Set 11/24/99
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 6 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999
Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 10/20/99 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 5 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999
Directly Assigned To Department 07 For All Purposes
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 4 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999
Assigned To Department 07 For All Purposes
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 3 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minutes: Notice Sent To Pistone, Baruch, &wolder On 8/25/99
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999
Certified Copy(s) Made.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999
Complaint Filed, Summons Issued (fast Track)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

Statistics

This case has been viewed 55 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?