Miller v. Nagel
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC04-01177

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bart Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
v.
No Logo Robert E Nagel, Defendant
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 6/24/2004
Complaint 1 Status Judgment 10/18/2004
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004
Abstract Of Judgment Issued
    Blank 20
    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
      Blank 19
      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
        Blank 18 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004
        Judgment Filed/entered-before Trial On 10/18/04
          Blank 17 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004
          Exhibits Returned To Plaintiffs Counsel With Judgment
            Blank 16
            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
              Blank 15
              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                Blank 14 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004
                Hearing On Default Was Set For 8/25/04 At 9:00 In Dept. 02
                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004
                  Default Entered On The Complaint Filed 06/24/2004 Of Bart Miller Against Defendant Robert E Nagel By Clerk As Requested
                    Blank 12 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004
                    Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 06/24/2004 Of Bart Miller As To Robert E Nagel With Service Date Of 06/25/04
                      Blank 11 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004
                      Request To Enter Default On Complaint Filed 06/24/2004 Of Bart Miller Filed As To Robert E Nagel
                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004
                        Original Summons On Complaint Filed 06/24/2004 Of Bart Miller Filed
                          Blank 9 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                          Case Entry Complete
                            Blank 8 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                            Color Of File Is Purple
                              Blank 7 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                              Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 8/30/04 At 7:00 In Dept. 02
                                Blank 6 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                                Case Management Conference Was Set For 11/17/04 At 8:30 In Dept. 02
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                                  Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                    Blank 4
                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                                      Continued Receipt
                                        Blank 2
                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                                          Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 02

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?