Transasia Commodities Limited v. Newlead JMEG, L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-07895
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 7:05 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Transasia Commodities Limited, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ERIC D. FREED +1 215 665 3724 +1 215 665 2013 efreed@cozen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill L. Mandell +1 212 509 9400 +1 866 782 9441 jmandell@cozen.com
v.
No Logo Jan Berkowitz, Defendant
No Logo Michael Zolotas, Defendant
No Logo Newlead Holdings Limited, Defendant
No Logo Newlead JMEG, L.L.C., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P.41 (a)(1)(A)(i):Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) Transaisa Commodities or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Newlead JMEG, LLC, et al. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/19/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: You are directed to appear for a pretrial conference, to be held on Tuesday, January 14, 2014, in Courtroom 12B, at 4:30pm in front of the Honorable John G. Koeltl. All requests for adjournments must be made in writing to the Court. For any further information, please contact the Court at (212) 805-0107 (Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl). (djc) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
      DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Transasia Commodities Limited. (Mandell, Jill) Modified on 11/19/2013 (jno). (Entered: 11/18/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: The plaintiff has alleged diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332.... The plaintiff should therefore advise the Court as soon as possible as to the citizenship of all members of NewLead JMEG, LLC, and any other parties to this action that qualify as limited liability companies or limited partnerships. The complaint also indicates that there are alien parties on both sides of this action. The plaintiff, TransAsia Commodities Limited, is described as a "foreign corporation with its principal place of business located in London, United Kingdom." (Compl. paragraph. 1.) Defendant NewLead Holdings Ltd. is described as a "Bermuda corporation with its principal place of business located... [in] Greece," and Defendant Michael Zolotas is described as a citizen of Greece. (Compl. paragraphs 2, 6.) The plaintiff should therefore advise the Court as to why the presence of aliens on both sides of this action does not destroy diversity jurisdiction... ("[D]iversity does not exist within the meaning of [28 U.S.C. § 1332(a)] where on both sides of the dispute the parties are all foreign entities, or where on one side there are citizens and aliens and on the opposite side there are only aliens." (citations omitted)). (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/12/2013) (ja) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Transasia Commodities Limited.(Mandell, Jill) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against Jan Berkowitz, Newlead Holdings Limited, Newlead JMEG, L.L.C., Michael Zolotas. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1080833)Document filed by Transasia Commodities Limited. (Attachments: # 1 a, # 2 b, # 3 c, # 4 d, # 5 e)(laq) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 2,256 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?