Owens v. Hartinger
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC05-01582

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Damayanthie Pusey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
No Logo Daphne Owens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
v.
No Logo Doe #1, Defendant
No Logo Monica Hartinger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Walsh, Catherine A (concord)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine A +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Case Mediator, Mediator/evaluator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown, Herbert L. +1 925 253 1566
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 7/27/2005
Complaint 1 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 05/15/2006
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 36 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006
Receipt Of Record On Transfer Received. Assigned Case Number L06-02392
    Blank 35 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
    Placed On Clerk`s Calendar For 7/18/06 At 7:00 In Dept. 09
      Blank 34 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
      On 05/15/06
        Blank 33 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
        Civil Sad Before Trial - Intracounty Transfer
          Blank 32 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
          File Sent To Lower Juris Martinez
            Blank 31
            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
              Blank 30 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006
              Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Monica Hartinger
                Blank 29
                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                  Blank 28 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006
                  Mediator`s Report Received: Did Not Take Place Scheduled On 03/14/06, Mediator Time Spent 0 Hours
                    Blank 27
                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006
                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Daphne Owens, Damayanthie Pusey
                        Blank 25
                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006
                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Monica Hartinger
                            Blank 23
                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                              Blank 22 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005
                              Notice Of Assignment Of Mediator
                                Blank 21
                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005
                                  Case Mediator Added As A Party
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005
                                    Return From Mediation Set For 3/14/06
                                      Blank 18
                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005
                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Monica Hartinger
                                          Blank 16
                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005
                                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Daphne Owens, Damayanthie Pusey
                                              Blank 14
                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
                                                Notice Of Unavailability Of Attorney Martin T. Gonsalves For Daphne Owens, Damayanthie Pusey For Period 11-15 - Filed
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005
                                                  (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 07/27/2005 Of Daphne Owens Filed By Monica Hartinger
                                                    Blank 11
                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005
                                                      Original Summons On Complaint Filed 07/27/2005 Of Daphne Owens Filed
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005
                                                        Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 07/27/2005 Of Daphne Owens As To Monica Hartinger With Service Date Of 07/31/05
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005
                                                          Case Entry Complete
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005
                                                            Color Of File Is Gold
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005
                                                              Doe 1 Added As A Party
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005
                                                                Case Management Conference Was Set For 12/14/05 At 8:30 In Dept. 02
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005
                                                                  Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 10/03/05 At 7:00 In Dept. 02
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005
                                                                    Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                      Blank 2
                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005
                                                                        Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 02

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 291 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?