Johnson v. The Riverview Lodge, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC06-00232

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Oralee Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jean Greenbaum +1 510 839 1200
v.
No Logo Carole Chadwick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
No Logo The Riverview Lodge, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
No Logo Case Mediator, Mediator/evaluator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William R Strickland +1 415 435 8460
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 2/7/2006
Complaint 1 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 01/31/2007
Complaint 2 Type Cross Complaint
Complaint 2 Filing Date 4/24/2006
Complaint 2 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 01/31/2007
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 60
Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
    Blank 59 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007
    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
      Blank 58 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007
      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
        Blank 57 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007
        Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudiceas To Entire Action
          Blank 56
          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
            Blank 55 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007
            Dismissal Filed/entered On The Cross-complaint Of Riverlodge, Inc
              Blank 54
              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                Blank 53 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007
                Notice Of Unavailability Of Attorney Jean Greenbaum For Oralee Johnson For Period 02/16-22 & 04/09-16 & 05/18-25 Filed
                  Blank 52 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
                  5clkc1 Calendared On 04/02/07 In Dept. 33. Has Been Updated To 04/02/07 In Dept. 02.
                    Blank 51 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006
                    Clerk`s Tickler Was Set For 4/02/07 At 7:00 In Dept 33
                      Blank 50 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006
                      Notice Of/to Conditional Settlement Of Entire Case Filed On Behalf Of Oralee Johnson
                        Blank 49 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006
                        Mediator's Report Received: Did Not Take Place Scheduled On 11/30/06, Mediator Time Spent 0 Hours
                          Blank 48
                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                            Blank 47 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006
                            Reply Fax Sent To Atty Greenbaum Re: Req To Extend Med Deadline To 1-31-07 Is Granted.
                              Blank 46
                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                Blank 45 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006
                                Notice Of Unavailability Of Attorney Jean Greenbaum For Oralee Johnson For Period 11/08/06 Thru 11/15/06 Filed
                                  Blank 44 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                                  Case Mediator Added As A Party
                                    Blank 43 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                                    Notice Of Assignment Of Mediator
                                      Blank 42
                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                        Blank 41 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
                                        Return From Mediation Set For 11/30/06
                                          Blank 40
                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                            Blank 39 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                                            Notice Of/to Intent To Appear Telephonically Filed On Behalf Of Sue Smith, Sue Smith Insurance
                                              Blank 38 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                                              Proof Of Service By Facsimile Of Case Management Statement On Jean Greenbaum, Martin T. Gonzalves Filed; Served On 08/02/06
                                                Blank 37 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Sue Smith, Sue Smith Insurance
                                                  Blank 36
                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Oralee Johnson
                                                      Blank 34
                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006
                                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By The Riverview Lodge, Inc, Carole Chadwick
                                                          Blank 32
                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                            (u.j.) Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 04/24/2006 Of The Riverview Lodge, Inc Filed By Sue Smith, Sue Smith Insurance
                                                              Blank 30
                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                Blank 29
                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006
                                                                  X-def Sue Smith & Sue Smith Insurances Request For Prior Pleadings & Discovery
                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006
                                                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By The Riverview Lodge, Inc, Carole Chadwick
                                                                      Blank 26
                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
                                                                        Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Case Management Statement Executed On 05/19/06
                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Oralee Johnson
                                                                            Blank 23
                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                                                              Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Cross Complaint Filed 04/24/2006 Of The Riverview Lodge, Inc As To Sue Smith With Service Date Of 05/09/06
                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                                                                Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Cross Complaint Filed 04/24/2006 Of The Riverview Lodge, Inc As To Sue Smith Insurance With Service Date Of 05/09/06
                                                                                  Blank 20
                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006
                                                                                    Proof Of Service By Mail Of Answer/x-cmplt On Jean Greenbaum Filed; Served On 04/25/06
                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006
                                                                                      Declaration Of Jean Greenbaum Filed Re: Osc
                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                                                        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed On Cross-complaint
                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                                                          Original Summons On Cross Complaint Filed 04/24/2006 Of The Riverview Lodge, Inc Filed
                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                                                            (u.j.) Cross-complaint Filed By The Riverview Lodge, Inc, Carole Chadwick
                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                                                              (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 02/07/2006 Of Oralee Johnson Filed By The Riverview Lodge, Inc, Carole Chadwick
                                                                                                Blank 13
                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                                                                                                  Hearing On Osc Was Set For 5/09/06 At 9:00 In Dept. 33
                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
                                                                                                    Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 02/07/2006 Of Oralee Johnson As To The Riverview Lodge, Inc With Service Date Of 02/09/06
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
                                                                                                      Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Request For Entry Of Default Was Set For 4/14/06 At 7:00 In Dept. 33
                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
                                                                                                        Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 02/07/2006 Of Oralee Johnson As To Carole Chadwick With Service Date Of 02/09/06
                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                          Case Entry Complete
                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                            Original Summons On Complaint Filed 02/07/2006 Of Oralee Johnson Filed
                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                              Color Of File Is Red
                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Was Set For 6/27/06 At 8:30 In Dept. 33
                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                                  Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 4/13/06 At 7:00 In Dept. 33
                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                                    Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                                                                      Blank 2
                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                                        Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 33

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?