Serquina v. Crogan's Bar & Grill
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC06-00420

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Rosechily Serquina, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
No Logo Segundo Serquina, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
No Logo The Estate Of Normida Serquina, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
v.
No Logo Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark R. Mittelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mittelman, Mark R. +1 925 256 0677
No Logo Michael Moncur, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mcdowell, David A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mcdowell, David A +1 925 210 1300
No Logo Ralph Kaine, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark R. Mittelman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mittelman, Mark R. +1 925 256 0677
No Logo Case Mediator, Mediator/evaluator

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Hacking Staples +1 925 930 6600 wstaples@archernorris.com
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 3/9/2006
Complaint 1 Status Judgment 11/12/2008
Complaint 2 Type Cross Complaint
Complaint 2 Filing Date 7/24/2006
Complaint 2 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 12/11/2008
Complaint 3 Type Appeal Of An Order
Complaint 3 Filing Date 1/9/2009
Complaint 3 Status Active
  Entries (232) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 232 Filed: 12/18/2010, Entered: 12/18/2010
Jury Fees Forfeited By (depositor): Allan M Schuman
    Blank 231 Filed: 12/18/2010, Entered: 12/18/2010
    Jury Fees Forfeited Pursuant To Ccp 631.3
      Blank 230
      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
        Blank 229 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010
        Correspondence Memo Re: Request For Dismissal Of Cross-complaints
          Blank 228
          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
            Blank 227 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010
            Memorandum Of Costs (summary) Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc In The Amount Of $98.84 Mailed On 02/18/10
              Blank 226
              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                Blank 225 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010
                Remittitur From Dca - Costs Awarded To Respondent/judgment Affirmed
                  Blank 224
                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                    Blank 223 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: 12/10/2009
                    Opinion; Affirmed
                      Blank 222 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009
                      Appellate Court Appeals Cad - Certification
                        Blank 221 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009
                        Number Of Volumes (original Transcripts).
                          Blank 220
                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                            Blank 219 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009
                            Fee Received For Ctx From The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                              Blank 218
                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                Blank 217 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009
                                Memorandum Of Costs (summary) Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc In The Amount Of $3,439.40 Mailed On 02/03/09
                                  Blank 216 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009
                                  Original Proof Of Service Re: Rtx
                                    Blank 215 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009
                                    Designation Of Clerk And Reporters Transcript On Appeal By Appellant
                                      Blank 214
                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                        Blank 213
                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                          Blank 212 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009
                                          Request Filed & Dismissal Entered Complaint Filed 03/09/2006 Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina As To Defendant Michael Moncur Without Prejudice
                                            Blank 211 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009
                                            Notice Of Judgment On Order Granting Defts Motion For Summary Judgment
                                              Blank 210 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009
                                              Declaration Of Thomas J. Murray Filed Re: Order To Show Cause Re: Filing Dismissal
                                                Blank 209 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009
                                                Appeal Of Order Filed
                                                  Blank 208 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008
                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
                                                    Blank 207 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008
                                                    Dismissal Filed/entered On The Cross-complaint Of Crogans Bar & Grill, Inc.
                                                      Blank 206
                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                        Blank 205
                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008
                                                          Summary Judgment For Defendant Entered On 11/12/08
                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008
                                                            Notice Of/to Change Of Address Filed On Behalf Of Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008
                                                              Osc Hearing Re: Failure To File Dismissal Was Set For 11/19/08 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                                                Blank 201
                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                  Blank 200
                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                    Blank 199
                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                      Blank 198 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008
                                                                      Further Case Management Conference Was Set For 8/25/08 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                                                        Blank 197
                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                          Blank 196
                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                            Blank 195
                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
                                                                              Conditional Opposition Of Crogans To Mtn For Good Faith Settlement Filed
                                                                                Blank 193 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
                                                                                Declaration Of Mark Mittelman Filed Re: In Support Of Cond Opp Of Crogans Mtn For Good Fa Ith Settlement
                                                                                  Blank 192
                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                    Blank 191 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                    Hearing On Motion Was Set For 6/06/08 At 8:30 Updated To 8:31 In Dept. 16
                                                                                      Blank 190 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
                                                                                      Order Granting Motion To Continue Trial Filed
                                                                                        Blank 189
                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                          Blank 188
                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008
                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Order Grntg Mtn For Summ Judgment Filed
                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008
                                                                                              Issue Conference Statement Filed By Attorney For The Estate Of Normida Serquina, Segundo Serquina, Rosechily Serquina
                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008
                                                                                                Opposition To Defts Mtn In Limine To X-clud Bac Level Filed By Plaintiffs.
                                                                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008
                                                                                                  Settlement Conference Statement Received From Attorney For The Estate Of Normida Serquina, Segundo Serquina, Rosechily Serquina
                                                                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008
                                                                                                    Proof Of Service By Facsimile Of Order Granting Ex Parte App & Ex Parte Application On See Svc List Filed; Served On 06/03/08
                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                      Moncurs Ex Parte App For Order Shortening Time To Hear Good Faith Settlement
                                                                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                        (civil) Exparte Fee Collected For Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                          Blank 180
                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                            Blank 179 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                            Declaration Of Jacq Wilson Filed Re: In Support Of Mot To Continue Trial
                                                                                                              Blank 178 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina In Support Of Mot To Continue Trial
                                                                                                                Blank 177 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                Hearing On Motion Was Set For 6/06/08 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                  Motion To/for Continue Trial Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                    Blank 175
                                                                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                      (civil) Exparte Fee Collected For Appl Cont Of Trial Date, Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                        Blank 173
                                                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                          Blank 172 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                          Order Shortening Time To Cont Trial Date
                                                                                                                            Blank 171 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                            Amended Proof Of Service Re: Settmnt/issue Conference Stmt Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                              Order Granting Ex Parte App For Order Shortening Time For Settlement Motion
                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
                                                                                                                                Motion In Limine Filed By Michael Moncur Re: To Exclude Reference To Moncurs Bac Level/prior Felony Convictions
                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
                                                                                                                                  Issue Conference Statement Filed By Attorney For Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
                                                                                                                                    Settlement Conference Statement Received From Attorney For Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion For Summary Judgment/summary Adjudication Filed
                                                                                                                                        Blank 165
                                                                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service By Personal Of Ntc/mtn For Deter Of Gd Faith Stlmt/pts & Auths/de On See List Filed; Served On 05/29/08
                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Michael Moncur Filed Re: In Support Of Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement
                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Thomas J. Murray Filed Re: In Support Of Motion For Good Faith Settlement
                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Michael Moncur In Support Of Motion For Good Faith Settlement
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                  Hearing On Motion Was Set For 7/18/08 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                    Motion To/for Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158
                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157
                                                                                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156
                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
                                                                                                                                                            Reply Of Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc To Opposition To Mtn For Summary Judgment Filed
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
                                                                                                                                                              Response To Pltfs Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Opps To Mtn For Summ Judgment Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153
                                                                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152
                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Jacq M Wilson Filed Re: In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition To Defts Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Plaintiffs.
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice And Joinder By The Estate Of Normida Serquina, Segundo Serquina, Rosechily Serquina In Motion To/for Continue Trial Filed
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148
                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Diane Rae Filed Re: In Support Of Pltfs Opps To Defts Mtn For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                              Dec Of Jacq M. Wilson Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Allan M. Schuman Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Kenneth A Mark Filed Re: In Support Of Pltfs Opps To Defts Mtn For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Index To Evidence In Support Of Pltfs Opps To Motion To Summary Judgement Received
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                      Responses And Objections To Deft Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Suppt Of
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                          Separate Statement Re: Undisp Facts In Opps To Defts Mtn For Summ Jdgmt
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition To To Defts Mtn For Summary Judgment Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina, Segundo Serquina.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138
                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Order Shortening Time/continue Trial/decl Of Mitte Man/order Granting Mot Mailed On 4/11/08
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing On Motion Was Set For 4/18/08 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion To/for Continue Trial Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex-parte Application For Ost To Hear Mtn To Continue Trial Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application For Ost To Hear Motion To Continue Trial, Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Jennifer L Sommer Filed Re: In Supportof Ex Parte Appl For Ost To Hear Motion To Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc In Support Of Mtn To Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Mark R Mittelman Filed Re: In Support Of Motion To Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Mark R Mittelman Filed Re: In Support Of Mtn For Summar Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Jennfier L Sommer Filed Re: In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Received Index To Evidence In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Patricia Wilkinson Filed Re: In Support Of Mtn Fopr Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Ralph Kaine Filed Re: In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Wells Fargo Order Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing On Motion For Summary Judgment Was Set For 5/02/08 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Order Granting Mtn To Cont Trial Srvd On A. Schuman, Esq & T. Murray, Esq On 013108
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Ord Granting Mtn To Cont Trial And Vacate Jury Wvr Filed By Grogans Bar & Grill, Inc. And Ralph Kaine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of/to Order Granting Mtn To Cont Trial Date Filed On Behalf Of Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Motion To Continue Trial Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Order For Ost To Hear Mtn To Cont Trial To: See Service List On: 11/5/07
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Re-notice Of Motion To Continue Trial & To Vacate Deemed Jury Waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application For Ost To Hear Motion To Continue Trial Date Filed, To Be On 11-16-07
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex-parte Application & Dec For Ost For Mtn To Continue Trial Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc In Support Of Ex Parte Dec For Ost For Mtn To Continue Trial Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Mtn To Cont Trial & Vacate Deemed Jury Waiver On See List Executed On 10/19/07
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Mark Mittelman Filed Re: In Support Of Mtn To Cont Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc In Support Of Mtn To Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Jennifer L. Sommer Filed Re: In Support Of Mtn To Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing On Motion Was Set For 11/30/07 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fee Received For Mtn To Continue Trail & Vacate Deemed Jury Waiver From Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion To/for Continue Trial And Vacate Deemed Jury Waiver Filed By Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sanctions Received In The Amount Of $150.00 From Mark Mittleman For Jennifer Sommer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order For $150.00 Sanctions From Jennifer Sommer Filed With Clerks Certificate Of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Tammy L Sharp Filed Re: In Response To Order To Show Casue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Jennifer L. Sommer Filed Re: In Response To Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Mark R. Mittelman Filed Re: In Response To Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response To Order Show Cause Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To Trial Date Filed By Crogans Bar & Gr Ill, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Demand For Jury Trial Notice Of Posting Jury Fees Filed By Estate Of Nor
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Receipt For Jury Fees Posted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Jury Fees Posted By Allan M. Schuman On Behalf Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mediator's Report Received: No Agreement Scheduled On 07/23/07, Mediator Time Spent 1.3 Hours
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of/to Telephonic Courtcall Appearance For Cmc Filed On Behalf Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Conference Statement Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Date, Time & Place Of Mediation Filed/received. Hearing Set For 07/23/07 At 10:00 Filed/received 06/28/07.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Date, Time & Place Of Mediation Filed/received. Hearing Set For 07/10/07 At 09:00 Filed/received 05/14/07.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Mediator Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Assignment Of Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return From Mediation Set For 7/24/07
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of/to Telephonic Courtcall Appearance For Cmc Filed On Behalf Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            5fcmc5 Calendared On 02/07/07 In Dept. 22. Has Been Updated To 02/07/07 In Dept. 16.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of/to Telephonic Courtcall Appearance For Cmc Filed On Behalf Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (u.j.) Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 07/24/2006 Of Ralph Kaine Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Michael Moncur Added As A Defendant/cross-deft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Cross Complaint Filed Substituting In Names Of Roe Cross Def, Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Conference Statement Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Answer To Complaint To: David A. Mcdowell Atty For Michael Moncur On: 7/27/06
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Original Summons On Cross Complaint Filed 07/24/2006 Of Ralph Kaine Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (u.j.) Cross-complaint Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 03/09/2006 Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina Filed By Ralph Kaine, Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Updated Case To Change Name Of Party Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 03/09/2006 Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina Filed By Michael Moncur
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of/to Telephonic Courtcall Appearance For Cmc Filed On Behalf Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina, Segundo Serquina, Rosechily Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina, Segundo Serquina, Rosechily Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Substituted Service Of Complaint Filed 03/09/2006 Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina As To Michael Moncur With Declaration Of Diligence And Declaration Of Mailing On 06/15/06 Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Request For Entry Of Default Was Set For 7/27/06 At 7:00 In Dept. 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Substituted Service Of Complaint Filed 03/09/2006 Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina Re: Business Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc W/mailing On 06/09/06 Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Substituted Service Of Complaint Filed 03/09/2006 Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina Re: Business Ralph Kaine W/mailing On 05/30/06 Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Substituted Service Of Complaint Filed 03/09/2006 Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina Re: Business Crogan's Bar & Grill Inc W/mailing On 06/09/06 Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Allan M Schuman Filed Re: In Supt Of Pltfs Response To Osc Re Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response To Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service & Dec Of Alan M Schuman Filed By The Estate Of Normida Serquina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing On Osc Was Set For 6/12/06 At 9:00 In Dept. 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 5/15/06 At 7:00 In Dept. 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Was Set For 7/27/06 At 8:30 In Dept. 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 22
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Entry Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Original Summons On Complaint Filed 03/09/2006 Of The Estate Of Normida Serquina Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Color Of File Is Yellow

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?