Exxonmobil Prod Co v. Norton, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00119-WYD-BNB
District Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

ExxonMobil Corporation ExxonMobil Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Exxonmobil Production Company"
Unknown Role, MOBIL CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Stephen Luna +1 713 656 5572 +6562 656 656 2254
Space Kip Irvin Plankinton +1 713 656 5572 +6562 656 656 2254

Toggle Switch Represented by Temkin Wielga Hardt & Longenecker, L.L.P

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott William Hardt +1 303 292 4922 +2924 292 292 4921 hardt@twhlaw.com
v.
No Logo Gail Norton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori Caramanian +1 303 844 1499 +1 303 844 1350 lori.caramanian@usdoj.gov
No Logo Rejane Medinger Burton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori Caramanian +1 303 844 1499 +1 303 844 1350 lori.caramanian@usdoj.gov
Office Denver
Filed 1/21/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 290 - Real Property: Other
Cause Section 30 U.S.C. § 1701 Federal Oil Gas Royalty Mgt Act 1982 (FOGRMA)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 1/16/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags SuppressAnsRpt, TERMED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel upon jt stipulation for dismissal [30-1] matter is dismissed with prej, each party to pay own costs and atty's fees (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/22/04 (lam)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
    JT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF CASE purs to FRCvP 41(a)(1) by plaintiff, defendants, with each party agreeing to bear own attys' fees, costs and expenses (settlement agreement attached) ; entry date : 1/20/04 (lam) Modified on 01/20/2004
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel ; dsm papers ddl set for 1/20/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/23/03 (dlb)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Status Report
        Joint STATUS REPORT by plaintiff, defendants' pursuant to 8/7/03 minute order (erv)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; dsm papers ddl set for 12/22/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/18/03 (gms)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Status Report
            Joint STATUS REPORT by plaintiff, defendants' (erv)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, Pursuant to the Joint Status Report filed 10/20/03, It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, or a status report explaining why dismissal has not been accomplished ; dsm papers ddl set for 11/21/03 ; status report ddl set for 11/21/03 regarding [24-1] report (cc: all counsel) ; date : 10/24/03 (erv)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Status Report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT by plaintiff, defendants' (erv)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                  NOTICE of Change of address of Lori Caramanian (erv)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel; the parties shall file either a Stipulation for Dismissal or a further Status Report ; dsm papers ddl set for 10/20/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/26/03 (erv)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Status Report
                      Joint STATUS REPORT by plaintiff, defendants' (erv)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Case has settled ; dsm papers ddl set for 9/22/03 ; rule 16 conf is vacated (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/8/03 (gms)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff Exxonmobil Prod Co by Charles Stephen Luna (erv)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                            ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; Supplemental Rule 16 conference set for 9:30 8/7/03 (cc: all counsel) (gms)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; rule 16 conf was set for this date . Conf will be reset ; entry date : 7/2/03 Court Reporter: BNB Civil Tape 2003-73 and FTR (gms)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland granting dfts' motion for leave to appear at 7/1/03 scheduling/planning conf by telephone [13-1], granting dfts' unopposed motion for 1 day extension of time to file confidential settlement statement to 6/25/03 [12-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/27/03 (pap)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion for 1 day extension of time to file confidential settlement statement to 6/25/03 [12-1] (gms)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the motion for leave to appear at 7/1/03 scheduling/planning conf by telephone [13-1] (gms)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Motion for Leave
                                      Unopposed MOTION by defendants for leave to appear at 7/1/03 scheduling/planning conf by telephone (gms)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Unopposed Request (MOTION) by defendants for 1 day extension of time to file confidential settlement statement to 6/25/03 (gms)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Answer
                                          ANSWER by Dfts' to complaint [1-1] (erv)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland granting Pla's Unopposed motion to vacate and reset the Scheduling Conf set for 5/15/03 [8-1] ; rule 16 conference Reset for 9:00 7/1/03 Proposed scheduling order is due on or before 6/24/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/15/03 (erv)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the Pla's Unopposed motion to vacate and reset the Scheduling Conf set for 5/15/03 [8-1] (erv)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003, Terminated: 4/14/2003 Motion to Reset
                                                Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Exxonmobil Prod Co to vacate and reset the Scheduling Conf set for 5/15/03 (erv)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland granting Dfts motion to extend time to Answer extended to: 5/21/03 [5-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/24/03 (erv)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland the Dfts motion to extend time to Answer extended to: 5/21/03 [5-1] (erv)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003, Terminated: 3/24/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      MOTION by defendant Gail Norton, defendant Rejane Medinger Burton to extend time to Answer extended to: 5/21/03 (erv)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                        Amended ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:00 5/15/03 (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:00 6/15/03 (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel (cc: to counsel) (erv)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT for review of administrative action and for declaratory relief (Summons(es) issued) (bpm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                FILING FEE PAID: on 1/21/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240739. (bpm)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?