Dyrenforth v. Alcatel USA, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00001-PSF-CBS
District Judge Phillip S. Figa, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William P. Dyrenforth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Howard B. Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Herrera +1 970 498 9999 +1 970 472 5365 dmhlaw@qwestoffice.net
v.
No Logo Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Anthony Chrisman +1 303 892 7473 +1 303 893 1379 chris.chrisman@dgslaw.com
Alcatel-Lucent, Inc. Alcatel-Lucent, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Alcatel USA, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Bell +1 303 892 9400 tom.bell@dgslaw.com
Space Christopher Anthony Chrisman +1 303 892 7473 +1 303 893 1379 chris.chrisman@dgslaw.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Larimer
Terminated 4/8/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 02CV-001409-0001[Larimer Cty Dist Ct]
Def Custody Status
Flags SuppressAnsRpt, TERMED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL OF CASE with prejudice by plaintiff William P. Dyrenforth, defendant Alcatel USA, Inc., each party bearing own costs and atty's fees ; entry date : 4/9/04 (lam)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Objections
    OBJECTIONS by defendant to pre-trial order exhibits [24-1] (dlb)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding [24-1] pre-trial order final pretrial conf held 2/12/04 ; pto approved ; entry : 2/18/04 Court Reporter: FTR (lam)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
        Final PRE-TRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ptc held on2/12/04; trial to jury, estimated for three (3) days (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; settlement conf held 12/1/03 , no settlement reached (lam)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock pursuant to the general plan of case reassignment Case reassigned to Judge Phillip S. Figa (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/3/03 (former empl)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; settlement conf set for 8:00 12/1/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/10/03 (dlb)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to continue settlement conf set for 7/1/03 to 9/12/03 9:30 [19-1], regarding [12-1] schedule order ; settlement conf reset for 9:30 9/12/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/27/03 (former empl)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Motion to Continue
                  Joint MOTION by plaintiff and defendants to continue settlement conf set for 7/1/03 to 9/12/03 9:30 (pap)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Answer
                    ANSWER by defendant Alcatel USA, Inc., defendant Alcatel USA Mkt Inc to amended complaint [16-1] (former empl)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                      NOTICE of Change of address and firm name of David M. Herrera by plaintiff William P. Dyrenforth (former empl)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Amended Complaint
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT [0-1] by plaintiff William P. Dyrenforth; jury demand; adding defendant Alcatel USA Mkt Inc (former empl)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion to amend complaint [0-1] [14-1], and accepting for filing [0-0] document tendered (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/12/03 (former empl)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003, Terminated: 5/9/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                            Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff William P. Dyrenforth to amend complaint [0-1] (former empl)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                              Tendered ORIGINAL Amended Complaint with Jury Demand submitted by plaintiff William P. Dyrenforth with motion to amend complaint [0-1] [14-1] (former empl)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock ;3 day jury trial set for 8:30 5/3/04 ; Trial prep conference set for 8:00 4/9/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/9/03 (former empl)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER signed 4/7/03 by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; Discovery cutoff 8/29/03 ;dispositive motions due 10/15/03 ; settlement conference 1:30 7/1/03 ;pretrial conference set 9:00 2/12/04 (cc: all counsel) (former empl)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; rule 16 conf held on 4/7/03 ; discovery ddl set 8/29/03 ; disp mtn ddl set 10/15/03 ; settlement conf set for 1:30 7/1/03 ; pretrial conf set for 9:00 2/12/04 ; 3 day jury trial set for 5/3/04 ; Trial prep conference set for 8:00 4/9/04 ; entry date : 4/8/03 Court Reporter: CBS Civil Tape 2003-49 (former empl)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to reset the 3/31/03 scheduling conference [8-1] ; rule 16 conference reset for 9:30 4/7/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/24/03 (former empl)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to reset the 3/31/03 scheduling conference [8-1] (former empl)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003, Terminated: 2/20/2003 Motion to Reset
                                          MOTION by defendant Alcatel USA, Inc. to reset the 3/31/03 scheduling conference (former empl)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                            Minute ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:30 3/31/03 (cc: all counsel) (gms)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER R16 stat stlmt pt pto referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock (cc: to counsel) (former empl) Modified on 12/16/2003
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Answer
                                                ANSWER by defendant Alcatel USA, Inc. to complaint [0-1] (former empl)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Supplement/Amendment
                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL Cover Sheet for Notices of Removal and add'l State Court documentation by plaintiff William P. Dyrenforth to complaint [0-1] (dlb)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Chief Judge Lewis T. Babcock granting motion to extend time to answer or respond to complaint until Jan 29'03 [2-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/10/03 (former empl)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      Uncontested MOTION by defendant Alcatel USA, Inc. to extend time to answer or respond to complaint until Jan 29'03 (former empl)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Notice of Removal
                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Larimer Cty Dist Ct Case Number: 02CV-001409-0001 (bpm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                          FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240340. (bpm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT (bpm)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?