Bartholomew v. Schlage Lock Co Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00002-REB-OES
District Judge Robert E. Blackburn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:57 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Michael DiGiglia +1 719 686 9617 +6869 686 686 9618

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeansonne & Remondet (LAF)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Ekendahl +1 318 671 8102 +6718 671 671 8103
Space John Allen Jeansonne, Jr. +1 337 237 4370 +1 504 304 0480 johnj@jeanrem.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanders Jones & Frank, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert John Frank +1 719 329 1700 +1 719 328 1509 imulhern@sjflaw.net
Space Donald Robert Jones +1 719 630 1556 +1 719 630 7004 jones@drjpc.com
No Logo Jim Stulb, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Michael DiGiglia +1 719 686 9617 +6869 686 686 9618

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeansonne & Remondet (LAF)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Ekendahl +1 318 671 8102 +6718 671 671 8103
Space John Allen Jeansonne, Jr. +1 337 237 4370 +1 504 304 0480 johnj@jeanrem.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanders Jones & Frank, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert John Frank +1 719 329 1700 +1 719 328 1509 imulhern@sjflaw.net
Space Donald Robert Jones +1 719 630 1556 +1 719 630 7004 jones@drjpc.com
v.
Ingersoll-Rand Company Ingersoll-Rand Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam S. Cohen +1 303 892 9400 +8931 893 893 1379 adam.cohen@dgslaw.com
Space Gail L. Wurtzler +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 gail.wurtzler@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hale Friesen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Krumholz +1 720 904 6007 +1 720 904 6006 pkrumholz@halewestfall.com
No Logo Schlage Lock Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam S. Cohen +1 303 892 9400 +8931 893 893 1379 adam.cohen@dgslaw.com
Space Gail L. Wurtzler +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 gail.wurtzler@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hale Friesen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Krumholz +1 720 904 6007 +1 720 904 6006 pkrumholz@halewestfall.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County El Paso
Terminated 3/11/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '05-1178'[], '05-1464'[], '05-1484'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags NDISPO, TERMED
  Entries (244) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 237 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [226] Notice of Appeal filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc., Schlage Lock Company, Inc., [208] Notice of Appeal filed by Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust, Jim Stulb, [220] Notice of Appeal filed by Jim Stulb. Upon consideration of the stipulation to dismiss the appeals, it is ordered that the appeals are dismissed pursuant to Rule 42(b), FRAp. Each party shall bear its own costs on appeal. (USCA case nos. 05-1178; 05-1464 and 05-1484) (bjr, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 236 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
    ORDER denying [217] MOTION to Stay re [216] Order on Motion for Review,, Awarding Costs to Defendants by Plaintiff . Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/5/06. (dln, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 234 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Letter re Appeal
      LETTER re Appeal to USCA and all counsel advising that the record on appeal is now complete as to [226] Notice of Appeal. (djs, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 235 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 USCA Case Number
        USCA Case Number 05-1484 for [226] Notice of Appeal filed by Schlage Lock Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc. (djs, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 233 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Transcript Order Form
          TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re [226] Notice of Appeal Cross Appeal by Defendants Schlage Lock Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc. (Wurtzler, Gail)
            LREF
            Legal Document 232 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Letter re Appeal
            LETTER re Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the [226] Notice of Cross Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Retained counsel, Fees paid) (Attachments: # (1) Receipt)(djs, )
              LREF
              Blank 231 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Docket Annotation
              Docket Annotation re: [229] Letter re Appeal main document added. Text only entry - no document attached. (djs, )
                LREF
                Blank 230 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Docket Annotation
                Docket Annotation re: [226] Notice of Appeal linked to the order being appealed. Text only entry - no document attached. (djs, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 229 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Letter re Appeal
                  LETTER re Appeal to USCA and all counsel advising that the record on appeal is now complete as to [220] Notice of Appeal. (djs, ) (Main document added on 10/26/2005) (djs, ).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 228 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Transcript Order Form
                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re [220] Notice of Appeal filed on October 12, 2005 by Plaintiff Jim Stulb (Jones, Donald)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 227 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Transcript Order Form
                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re [220] Notice of Appeal filed on October 12, 2005 by Plaintiff Jim Stulb (Jones, Donald)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 226 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005, Terminated: 1/16/2007 Notice of Appeal
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL (Cross Appeal) re: [216] Order dated 9/14/05by Defendants Schlage Lock Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc. (Cohen, Adam) (Modified on 10/26/2005 to indicate what order is being appealed)(djs, ).
                          LREF
                          Blank 225 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Docket Annotation
                          Docket Annotation re: [224] Notice of Cross Appeal was filed using the incorrect event. To be re-filed by counsel. Text only entry - no document attached. (djs, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 224 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Cross Appeal by Defendants Schlage Lock Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc. (Cohen, Adam)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 223 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 USCA Appeal Fees
                              USCA Appeal Fees received $ 255 receipt number 263692 re [220] Notice of Appeal filed by Jim Stulb. (Attachments: # (1) Receipt)(djs, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 222 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 USCA Case Number
                              USCA Case Number 05-1464 for [220] Notice of Appeal filed by Jim Stulb. (djs, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 221 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Letter re Appeal
                                LETTER re Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the [220] Notice of Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Retained counsel, Fees not paid) (djs, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 220 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005, Terminated: 1/16/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [216] Order on Motion for Review,, by Plaintiff Jim Stulb (Jones, Donald)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 219 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Appeal by Plaintiff Jim Stulb (Jones, Donald) (Modified on 10/13/2005 to indicate the incorrect event was used) (djs, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 218 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [217] MOTION to Stay re [216] Order on Motion for Review,, Awarding Costs to Defendants filed by Defendants Schlage Lock Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Adam)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 217 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005, Terminated: 9/5/2006 Motion to Stay
                                        MOTION to Stay re [216] Order on Motion for Review,, Awarding Costs to Defendants by Plaintiff Jim Stulb. (Jones, Donald)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 216 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Order on Motion for ReviewCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [209] MOTION for Review of Clerk's Action on Dfts' Bill of Costs and Supporting Memorandum by Defendants. The motion is denied with respect to dfts' req for reimbursement of the costs of in-house copies; that in all other respects the motion is granted. Dfts are awarded costs in the amount of $92,406.50 which shall be addition to the $7,493.02 already awarded by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/14/05. (dlb, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 215 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            Dfts' REPLY to Pla's Response to [209] MOTION for Review of Clerk's Action on Dfts' Bill of Costs and Supporting Memorandum by Defendants Schlage Lock Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc. (dlb, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 214 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Response to Motion
                                              Pla's Opposition (RESPONSE) to [209] MOTION for Review of Clerk's Action on Dfts' Bill of Costs and Supporting Memorandum by Defendants Schlage Lock Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc.(dlb, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 213 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Letter re Appeal
                                                LETTER re Appeal to USCA and all counsel advising that the record is now complete as to [208] Notice of Appeal. TOF filed by appellant stating a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. (djs, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 212 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Transcript Order Form
                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by appellants Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust stating a transcript is not necessary for this appeal re [208] Notice of Appeal. Appeal Deadlines Terminated (TOF deadline terminated). (djs, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 211 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 USCA Case Number
                                                    USCA Case Number 05-1178 for [208] Notice of Appeal filed by Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust and Jim Stulb. (djs, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 210 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER denying Pla's [204] Motion for Order for Relief Under Rule 59(e) and denying as moot Pla's [205] Motion to Deem Pleading filed 3/28/05 as a Motion for Relief Under Rule 59(e). Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/15/05. (gms, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 209 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005, Terminated: 9/14/2005 Motion for Review
                                                        MOTION for Review of Clerk's Action on Dfts' Bill of Costs and Supporting Memorandum by Defendants Schlage Lock Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc. (gms, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 208 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Notice of Appeal
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [202] Judgment on 3/14/05 by Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust and Jim Stulb. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 259470. Notice mailed to all counsel on 4/14/05. Transcript Order Form due by 4/27/2005. (djs, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 207 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Costs Taxed
                                                            Costs Taxed in amount of $ 7,493.02 against Plaintiff (dlb, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 206 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Response to Motion
                                                              COMBINED RESPONSE to [204] MOTION for Order of relief under Rule 59(e) and memorandum by Plaintiffs Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust, Jim Stulb and [205] MOTION to deem pleading filed 3/28/05 (For Extension of Time) re: [204] MOTION for Order of relief under Rule 59(e) and memorandum by by Plaintiffs filed by Defendants. (dlb, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 205 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                MOTION to deem pleading filed 3/28/05 (For Extension of Time) re: [204] MOTION for Order of relief under Rule 59(e) and memorandum by by Plaintiffs Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust, Jim Stulb. (dlb, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 204 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005, Terminated: 4/15/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                  MOTION for Order of relief under Rule 59(e) and memorandum by Plaintiffs Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust, Jim Stulb. (dlb, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 203 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Brief
                                                                    Memorandum (BRIEF) in support of plas' motion for relief under Rule 59(e) by Plaintiffs Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust, Jim Stulb. (dlb, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 202 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Clerks JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                      JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff pursuant to ORDER granting [124] MOTION by dfts, Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds. That this case is dismissed with prejudice. That Judgment shall enter in favor of dfts and against plainiotff as to all claims for relief. Defendants are awarded their costs to be taxed by the Clerk. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/11/05. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/14/05. (dlb, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 201 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [124] MOTION by dfts, Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds. That this case is dismissed with prejudice. That Judgment shall enter in favor of dfts and against plainiotff as to all claims for relief. Defendants are awarded their costs to be taxed by the Clerk. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/11/05. (dlb, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 200 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER DEEMING MOOT [120] MOTION by plaintiffs to strike redundant, cumulative experts and request for oral argment; [137] MOTION by plaintiff to strike the name of Milton V. DeJean as witness for dfts and/or for leave to take discovery out of time and memorandum in support and request for oral argument ; [146] MOTION by defendants to strike "Rebuttal and Suppelmental Report of Richard B. Adams"; [198] MOTION for Leave to File a sur-reply to dfts' mtn to compel expert disclosure by Plaintiffs by Magistrate Judge O. Edward Schlatter on 1/21/05. (dlb, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 199 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                            RESPONSE [198] MOTION for Leave to File a sur-reply to dfts' mtn to compel expert disclosure by Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc., Schlage Lock Company, Inc.. (dlb, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 198 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Motion for Leave
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File a sur-reply to dfts' mtn to compel expert disclosure by Plaintiffs.(dlb, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 197 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Objections
                                                                                Dfts' OBJECTIONS to pla's [185] Corrected Trial EXHIBIT list by plaintiff (dlb, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 196 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Objections
                                                                                  Plas' OBJECTIONS to dft's [194] Trial Exhibit List by Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc., Schlage Lock Company, Inc. (dlb, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Tendered Document
                                                                                    TENDERED Sur-Reply to Dfts' mtn to compel to [198] MOTION for Leave to File by Plaintiffs Fountain Valley Environmental Mediation Trust, Jim Stulb. (dlb, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 194 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                      Trial Exhibit List by Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc., Schlage Lock Company, Inc... (dlb, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 195 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge O. Edward Schlatter : Settlement Conference held on 11/16/2004 (Court Reporter No record made.) (dlb, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 193 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                          ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT re [192] Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc., Schlage Lock Company, Inc.. (dlb, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 192 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            Dft's REPLY in support of Motion re [187] Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Ingersoll-Rand Company, Inc., Schlage Lock Company, Inc.. (dlb, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Memorandum BRIEF by plaintiff in opposition to motion to compel expert disclosure [187-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 190 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [187-1] dft's motion to compel expert disclosure, pla shall have to 10/21/04 to respond (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/13/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 189 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Designation of Non-Party
                                                                                                  Supplemental DESIGNATION of Non-Party by defendant (dlb)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 188 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the Dfts motion to compel expert disclosure [187-1] (erv)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 187 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                      MOTION by defendants to compel expert disclosure (dlb)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 186 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf set for 1:30 11/16/04 [03-RB-0002, 02-RB-1188 and 03-RB-1437] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/7/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 185 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                          Corrected Trial EXHIBIT list by plaintiff (dlb)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 184 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting dfts Schlage Lock Co. and Intersoll-Rand's motion to dismiss third claim for relief [14-1] regarding [41-1] amended complaint, pla's claim for strict liability is dismissed with prejudice (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/22/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 183 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn denying motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of pre-jgm interest [126-1], denying motion for partial summary judgment on the liability of dft's for pymt of the cost of remediation and punitive dmgs [127-1], denying motion for sanctions against dfts [175-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/22/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 182 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Objections
                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS by defendant to pla's trial exhibits (dlb)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 181 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend ddl for objecting to exhibits to 11/19/04 [179-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 180 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to extend ddl for objecting to exhibits to 11/19/04 [179-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/20/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 179 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004, Terminated: 9/17/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION by plaintiffs to extend ddl for objecting to exhibits to 11/19/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn denying motion to expedite hrg and oral argument on pla's mtn for sanctions [176-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/23/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 176 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff to expedite hrg and oral argument on pla's mtn for sanctions (dlb)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 176 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004, Terminated: 8/19/2004 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                            Motion and incorporated Memorandum (BRIEF) by plaintiff in support for expedited hrg and oral argument on pla's motion for sanctions against dfts [175-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by defendants to motion for sanctions against dfts [175-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiffs for sanctions against dfts (dlb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 174 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dft's submission of supplemental authority [170-1] re: motion for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds [124-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 173 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to vacate settlement conf set for 7/28/04 at 3:00 [171-1] ; settlement conf VACATED 7/19/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/20/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 172 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to vacate settlement conf set for 7/28/04 at 3:00 [171-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 171 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004, Terminated: 7/19/2004 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                        UNopposed MOTION by defendant Schlage Lock Co Inc, defendant Ingersoll-Rand Co In to vacate settlement conf set for 7/28/04 at 3:00 (erv)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 170 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT by defendants to dft's motion for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds [124-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 169 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend two deadlines in the PTO [167-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 168 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting joint motion to extend two deadlines in the PTO; the ddl for exchange of suppl lists and copies of non-demonstrative trial exh is 8/18/04; the ddl to serve and file written obj to exh is extended to 9/20/04 [167-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/21/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 167 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004, Terminated: 6/18/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION by plaintiff to extend two deadlines in the PTO (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 166 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; further settlement conf set for 3:00 7/28/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/9/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 165 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf held 6/3/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 164 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by plaintiffs to dft's combined response to pla's motion for partial summary judgment on the liability of dft's for pymt of the cost of remediation and punitive dmgs [127-1], motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of pre-jgm interest [126-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 163 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY Memorandum in support by defendant to response to dft's motion for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds [124-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 162 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by dfts Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In to response to motion to strike "Rebuttal and Suppelmental Report of Richard B. Adams" [146-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 161 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter vacating Scheduling order ; settlement conf set for 1:30 6/16/04 [160-1], vacating minute order [160-2] ; settlement conf set for 10:30 6/3/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/14/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 160 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf set for 1:30 6/16/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/13/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 159 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting joint motion to extend time to file reply briefs re: dispo mtns [158-1], regarding [146-1] motion to strike "Rebuttal and Suppelmental Report of Richard B. Adams", regarding [127-1] motion for partial summary judgment on the liability of dft's for pymt of the cost of remediation and punitive dmgs, regarding [126-1] motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of pre-jgm interest, regarding [124-1] motion for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds; reply briefs shall be filed by 5/28/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/11/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 158 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004, Terminated: 5/11/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION by plaintiff, defendant to extend time to file reply briefs re: dispo mtns (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 157 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Trial Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS by plaintiff Fountain Valley Env, plaintiff Jim Stulb to response [156-1], to motion to strike "Rebuttal and Suppelmental Report of Richard B. Adams" [146-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 156 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by plaintiff to motion to strike "Rebuttal and Suppelmental Report of Richard B. Adams" [146-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 155 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by plaintiff to response to motion to strike the name of Milton V. DeJean as witness for dfts [137-1], motion for leave to take discovery out of time [137-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 154 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Combined RESPONSE by defendants to pla's motion for partial summary judgment on the liability of dft's for pymt of the cost of remediation and punitive dmgs [127-1] and pla's motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of pre-jgm interest [126-1] *large document (dlb) Modified on 04/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 153 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dft's motion for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds [124-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Trial Preparation Conference ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn ; jury trial set for 10:30 8/1/05; anticipated for twenty-five (25) days; Trial prep conference set for 9:00 7/29/05 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/20/04 (dlb) Modified on 04/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Final PRE-TRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter; trial to a jury, estimated 3-5 weeks; *large document (cc: all counsel) (dlb) Modified on 04/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter pretrial conf held , ; pretrial conf held 4/19/04 ; entry date : 4/19/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Ctrm 6 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 149 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by defendant to motion to strike the name of Milton V. DeJean as witness for dfts [137-1], motion for leave to take discovery out of time [137-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 148 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to extend time to file opp to mtns for sum jgm, memo in sup and req for exp consideration to 4/26/04 [144-1], regarding [124-1] dft's motion for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds, response due by 4/26/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/15/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 147 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to strike "Rebuttal and Suppelmental Report of Richard B. Adams" [146-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 146 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendants to strike "Rebuttal and Suppelmental Report of Richard B. Adams" (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 145 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Rebuttal Memorandum (REPLY) by plaintiff to dft's response to pla's motion to strike redundant, cumulative experts [120-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 144 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004, Terminated: 4/14/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to file opp to mtns for sum jgm, memo in sup and req for exp consideration to 4/26/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 143 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to extend time to resp to pla's 2 mtns for sum jgm [141-1], regarding [127-1] motion for partial summary judgment on the liability of dft's for pymt of the cost of remediation and punitive dmgs, regarding [124-1] motion for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/2/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 142 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting motion to extend time to file Opposition to Dfts' Motion for Sum Jgm, Memorandum in support to and incl 4/26/04 and expedited consideration [139-1], regarding [126-1] motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of pre-jgm interest, regarding [124-1] motion for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/2/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 141 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004, Terminated: 4/1/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Uncontested MOTION by defendants to extend time to resp to pla's 2 mtns for sum jgm (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004, Terminated: 4/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent (RESPONSE) by defendants to motion to extend time to file Opposition to Dfts' Motion for Sum Jgm, Memorandum in support to and incl 4/26/04 and expedited consideration [139-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [137-1] motion to strike the name of Milton V. DeJean as witness for dfts, regarding [137-2] motion for leave to take discovery out of time, dfts have to 4/14/04 to respond (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/31/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004, Terminated: 4/1/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff Fountain Valley Env, plaintiff Jim Stulb to extend time to file Opposition to Dfts' Motion for Sum Jgm, Memorandum in support to and incl 4/26/04 and expedited consideration (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to strike the name of Milton V. DeJean as witness for dfts [137-1], referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for leave to take discovery out of time [137-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff to strike the name of Milton V. DeJean as witness for dfts and/or for leave to take discovery out of time and memorandum in support and request for oral argument (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf set for 10:30 6/3/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/29/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting in part pla's motion for reconsideration minute order and for expedited consideration [116-2] [119-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/24/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [119-1] motion for reconsideration minute order and for expedited consideration [116-2] ; entry date : 3/25/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Ctrm 6 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In to motion to strike redundant, cumulative experts [120-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; pretrial conf set for 9:15 4/19/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/19/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting party dismissal [128-1] dismissing Eagle-Picher Industries Inc and Eagle-Picher Technologies, LLC with prejudice ; each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/17/04 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Trial Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cover Letter and EXHIBITS by plaintiff Fountain Valley Env, plaintiff Jim Stulb to motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of pre-jgm interest [126-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Trial Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Cover Letter and EXHIBITS by plaintiff Fountain Valley Env, plaintiff Jim Stulb to their motion for partial summary judgment on the liability of dft's for pymt of the cost of remediation and punitive dmgs [127-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DISMISSAL as to party Eagle-Picher Ind Inc with prejudice, each party to bear own costs; entry date : 3/16/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiffs for partial summary judgment on the liability of dft's for pymt of the cost of remediation and punitive dmgs (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004, Terminated: 9/21/2004 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiffs for partial summary judgment on the issue of pre-jgm interest and incorporated memo in support thereof (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn regarding [123-1] designation of non-parties (documents) (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004, Terminated: 3/11/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by dfts, Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In for summary judgment on res judicata and administrative preclusion grounds (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Designation of Non-Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DESIGNATION of Non-Parties wholly or partially at fault by dfts, Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter setting tele hearing on motion for reconsideration minute order and for expedited consideration [116-2] [119-1] 1:30 3/23/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/11/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for reconsideration minute order and for expedited consideration [116-2] [119-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiffs to strike redundant, cumulative experts and request for oral argment (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004, Terminated: 3/24/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff for reconsideration minute order and for expedited consideration [116-2] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to reschedule (reset) settlement conf [115-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition (RESPONSE) by plaintiff to motion to reschedule (reset) settlement conf [115-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to reschedule (reset) settlement conf [115-1] ; settlement conf set for 3:00 5/28/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/3/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2004 Motion to Reset
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Schlage Lock Co Inc to reschedule (reset) settlement conf (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to modify (amend) schedule order [24-1] [112-1] ; discovery ddl set 3/15/04 ; disp mtn ddl set 3/15/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/23/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to modify (amend) schedule order [24-1] [112-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION by defendant, plaintiff to modify (amend) schedule order [24-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter denying motion for reconsideration order granting dft's mtn for ext of time [103-1] and request for expedited consideration [106-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/11/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf set for 10:30 3/16/04 ; pretrial conf set for 9:00 4/6/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/6/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by dfts, Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In to pla's motion for reconsideration order granting dft's mtn for ext of time [103-1] and request for expedited consideration [106-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [105-1] amended to order dated 1/22/04; setting telephone hearing on motion for reconsideration order granting dft's mtn for ext of time [103-1] and request for expedited consideration [106-1] 11:00 2/5/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/29/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for reconsideration order granting dft's mtn for ext of time [103-1] and request for expedited consideration [106-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff Fountain Valley Env for reconsideration order granting dft's mtn for ext of time [103-1] and request for expedited consideration (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004, Terminated: 1/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting unopposed joint motion to stay proceedings pending settlement [101-1]; all discovery in this action is hereby stayed pending further order of court; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/23/04 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to stay proceedings pending settlement [101-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004, Terminated: 1/23/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting dfts motion to extend time to 2/27/04 to file certain expert reports and req for expedited consideration [99-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/22/04 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition (RESPONSE) by plaintiffs to motion to extend time to 2/27/04 to file certain expert reports and req for expedited consideration [99-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004, Terminated: 1/22/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed JOint MOTION by pla Fountain Valley Env, Jim Stulb and dft Eagle-Picher Ind Inc to stay proceedings pending settlement (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend time to 2/27/04 to file certain expert reports and req for expedited consideration [99-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004, Terminated: 1/20/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Fountain Valley Env, Ingersoll-Rand Co In to extend time to 2/27/04 to file certain expert reports and req for expedited consideration (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter denying without prej pla's motion to extend time to depose John Willian purs to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(d) [87-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/23/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter denying without prejudice pla's motion to extend time to depose John Willian purs to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(d) [87-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/19/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition (RESPONSE) of non-party John Willian and dft's to pla's motion to extend time to depose John Willian purs to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(d) [87-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to withdraw motion for protective order re: deposition be taken on a date on or subsequent to 11/19/03 [83-1], motion for protective order and obj to combined notice of depo and subpoena purs to FRCP 30(b)(6) [89-1] [94-1], withdrawing motion for protective order and obj to combined notice of depo and subpoena purs to FRCP 30(b)(6) [89-1], withdrawing motion for protective order re: deposition be taken on a date on or subsequent to 11/19/03 [83-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/24/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Motion to Withdraw Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation (MOTION) by plaintiff, defendant, plaintiff to withdraw motion for protective order re: deposition be taken on a date on or subsequent to 11/19/03 [83-1], motion for protective order and obj to combined notice of depo and subpoena purs to FRCP 30(b)(6) [89-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding Schlage's [89-1] motion for protective order and obj to combined notice of depo and subpoena purs to FRCP 30(b)(6); plas have to 11/24/03 to respond (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/19/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for protective order and obj to combined notice of depo and subpoena purs to FRCP 30(b)(6) [89-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [87-1] motion to extend time to depose John Willian purs to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(d), pla has to 11/24/03 to respond (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/18/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend time to depose John Willian purs to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(d) [87-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003, Terminated: 11/24/2003 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In for protective order and obj to combined notice of depo and subpoena purs to FRCP 30(b)(6) (dlb) Modified on 11/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiffs by Carl Ekendahl (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003, Terminated: 12/18/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to depose John Willian purs to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(d) *large document (dlb) Modified on 11/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiffs by John A. Jeansonne III (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding dft's [83-1] motion for protective order re: deposition be taken on a date on or subsequent to 11/19/03, pla has to 11/24/03 to file a response (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/12/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for protective order re: deposition be taken on a date on or subsequent to 11/19/03 [83-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003, Terminated: 11/24/2003 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by deponent Marvin Harrop for protective order re: deposition be taken on a date on or subsequent to 11/19/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter denying motion for "in camera review" (order) and the motion is ORDERED STRICKEN and returned to counsel for plaintiffs (together with documents for review [80-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/29/03 (dlb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for "in camera review" (order) [80-1] (dlb) Modified on 10/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003, Terminated: 10/28/2003 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiffs for "in camera review" (order) and memorandum in support *envelope placed in sealed area (dlb) Modified on 10/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Tendered Documents for "In Camera" Review submitted by plaintiff *manilla envelope placed in sealed area (dlb) Modified on 10/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn that the plas' obj to MJ's order is orverruled and denied [73-1]; that the pla's motion for expedited response and ruling is denied as moot [75-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/14/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff by John A. Jeansonne (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting joint motion for further amendment of scheduling order [24-1] [74-1] ; discovery ddl reset 3/8/04 ; disp mtn ddl reset 3/8/04 ; settlement conf vacated and reset for 1:30 2/19/04 (cc: all counsel) entry date : 10/9/03 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Chambers referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for further amendment of scheduling order [24-1] [74-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiffs Fountain Valley Env, Jim Stulb for order of district court judge to expedite response and ruling on pla's mtn for stay of MJ's 9/23/03 order granting dfts' mtn to compel (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JT MOTION by dfts for further amendment of scheduling order [24-1] (disc cutoff to 3/8/04 and dispo mtn ddl to 3/8/04) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003, Terminated: 10/10/2003 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 72(a) OBJECTION MJ non-dispo pto [73-1] by plas Jim Stulb, Fountain Valley Env concerning minutes [64-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing on 9/23/03 before MJ O. Edward Schlatter ( pages: 1-35) Prepared By: Avery/Woods Reporting Service, Inc. (certified copy) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter that plas' motion to compel is deemed withdrawn [59-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/30/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by plaintiffs of withdrawal of their motion to compel a nonparty to produce documents pur to a subpoena duces tecum [63-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [63-1] motion to compel, dfts have to 10/8/03 to respond to mtn (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/26/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of address of D. Robert Jones, P.C. counsel for the plaintiffs (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Chambers referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to compel a nonparty to produce documents pur to a subpoena duces tecum [63-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Fountain Valley Env, Jim Stulb by Robert John Frank and consent to withdrawal (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [64-1] minutes, granting dfts' motion to compel first set of written discovery [53-1]; due on or before 10/15/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/24/03 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003, Terminated: 9/23/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting dfts' motion to compel first set of written discovery [53-1]; pla is directed to provide the information requested on or before 10/15/03 ; entry date : 9/24/03 Court Reporter: FTR (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plas Fountain Valley Env, Jim Stulb to compel a nonparty to produce documents pur to a subpoena duces tecum (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter setting hearing on dfts' motion to compel first set of written discovery [53-1] 10:30 9/23/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/15/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by plaintiffs to defendants' motion to compel [53-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second SUPPLEMENTAL Reponses by plaintiff Fountain Valley Env, plaintiff Jim Stulb to Schlage Lock Company's and Ingersoll-Rand Company's first set of interrogatories, reqs for prod and reqs for admissions (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Eagle-Picher Ind Inc and Eagle-Picher Tech LLC, jointly to compel responses to first set of written disc (lam) Modified on 09/08/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting dfts' unopposed motion for enlargement of time to respond to discovery to 10/8/03 [52-1]; granting jt motion to amend scheduling order as set forth in this Minute Order [24-1], [51-1] ; iscovery ddl set 1/14/04 ; disp mtn ddl set 2/28/03 ; settlement conf set for 1:30 1/8/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/3/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to compel set of written discovery [53-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [53-1] dfts Schlage Lock Co's motion to compel, plas have to 9/12/03 to respond (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/3/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for of time to respond to discovery to 10/8/03 [52-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to amend scheduling order [24-1] (Discovery cutoff 1/14/04, disp mtn ddl 2/28/04, stlmt conf 1/04) [51-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In to compel first set of written discovery (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003, Terminated: 9/2/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION by dfts Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In for enlargement of time to respond to discovery to 10/8/03 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION by plaintiff, defendant to amend scheduling order [24-1] (Discovery cutoff 1/14/04, disp mtn ddl 2/28/04, stlmt conf 1/04) (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended CERTIFICATE MAILING BY CLERK OF minute order [47-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn finding the dft Eagle-Picher Industries, Inc. and Eagle-Picher Technologies, LLC's motion to deny as moot pla's conoslidated motion to strike defenses is denied as moot [48-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/18/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINDER by dfts Eagle-Picher Ind Inc and Eagle-Picher Technologis, LLC in motion to deny as moot [5-1] pla's consolidated motion to strike defenses [19-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn finding the motion to strike defenses and/or in the alternative mtn for a more definite statement [19-1] denied as moot; granting dfts motion to deny as moot "plaintiff's consolidated motion to strike defenses" [44-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/11/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure STATEMENT by defendant Eagle-Picher Technologies, LLC (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JT ANSWER by defendants Eagle-Picher Ind Inc & Eagle-Picher Tech, LLC to pla's amended complaint [41-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to deny as moot (RESPONSE) by dfts Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In to motion to strike defenses and/or in the alternative mtn for a more definite statement [19-1] (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by defendant Schlage Lock Co Inc, defendant Ingersoll-Rand Co In to amended complaint [41-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of firm names of pltfs' counsel of D. Robert Jones and John M. DiGiglia by pltfs Fountain Valley Env, Jim Stulb (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT [0-1] by plaintiff Fountain Valley Env; jury demand terminating plaintiff Samuel Bartholomew; adding plaintiff Jim Stulb (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter re all dcouments produced by a party to the protective order in this litigation: (cc: all counsel) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the Unopposed motion for protective order re produced documents [37-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting pla's unopposed motion to amend complaint to add parties [0-1] [35-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/23/03 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION by dfts Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In for protective order re produced documents (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER re: confidential information by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter : (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion for protective order re: confidentiality [32-1] all counsel) ; entry date : 5/22/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to amend complaint to add parties [0-1] [35-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION by plaintiffs to amend complaint to add parties [0-1] (to add Jim Stulb as trustee because currently named trustee, Samuel Bartholomew, died 4/28/03 and to add Eagle Picher Technologies Inc.) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Tendered amended complaint submitted by plaintiffs re: motion to amend complaint to add parties [0-1] [35-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003, Terminated: 5/22/2003 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Eagle-Picher Ind Inc for protective order re: confidentiality (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER re: confidential information by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter : [28-1] (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for protective order re: confidential information [28-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting pla's motion to extend time to amend pleadings and add parties to 5/16/03 [26-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/7/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION by Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In for protective order re: confidential information (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend time to amend pleadings and add parties to 5/16/03 [26-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003, Terminated: 5/6/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff Samuel Bartholomew, plaintiff Fountain Valley Env to extend time to amend pleadings and add parties to 5/16/03 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [24-1] scheduling order; settlement conf set 9/18/03 10:30; pretrial conf set 3/8/04 9:00 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/24/03 (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003, Terminated: 10/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; discovery cutoff 11/14/03 ;dispositive motions due 1/30/04 ; settlement conference 10:30 9/18/03 ;pretrial conference set 9:00 3/8/04 (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [10-1] order ; rule 16 conference set 3/10/03 is vacated and reset for 9:45 3/18/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/25/03 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by defendant Eagle-Picher Ind Inc to response to support its motion to dismiss fourth claim for relief [16-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY Brief by dfts Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co In in support of motion to dismiss third claim for relief [14-1] (strict liability) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum (BRIEF) by plaintiffs in support of motion to strike defenses and/or in the alternative mtn for a more definite statement [19-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003, Terminated: 6/10/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiffs to strike defenses and/or in the alternative mtn for a more definite statement (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dft Eagel-Picher's motion to dismiss [16-1] and alternative motion for lv to amd cmp (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by plaintiffs to dfts Schlage Lock and Ingersoll-Rand's motion to dismiss [14-1] and alternative motion for lv to amd cmp (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Eagle-Picher Ind Inc to dismiss fourth claim for relief (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by defendant Eagle-Picher Ind Inc to pla's first, second, third, fifth and sixth claims for relief re: complaint [0-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003, Terminated: 9/21/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Schlage Lock Co Inc to dismiss third claim for relief (strict liability) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by defendant Schlage Lock Co Inc to all but third claim for relief re: first amended complaint [0-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of filing original DECLARATION of Ronald G. Heller to replace copy by dfts Schlage Lock Co Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Co attached as Exhibit B to notice of removal re: complaint [1-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting dfts' unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead to January 17, 2003 [3-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/8/03 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:15 3/10/03 (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto referred to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter by Judge Robert E. Blackburn (cc: to counsel) (lam) Modified on 01/08/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead First Amended Complaint to January 17, 2003 [3-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Stipulation for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for extension of time to answer or respond to first amended cmp to 1/17/03 by defendant Eagle-Picher Ind Inc, plaintiff Fountain Valley Env (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure STATEMENT by defendant Eagle-Picher Ind Inc (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER by defendant Eagle-Picher Ind Inc in removal to federal court [1-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Certificate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of filing Notice of Filing of Removal to Federal Court by dfts schlage Lock Co and Ingersoll-Rand Company (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003, Terminated: 1/7/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION by defendant Schlage Lock Co Inc, defendant Ingersoll-Rand Co In to extend time to answer or otherwise plead First Amended Complaint to January 17, 2003 (bpm) Modified on 01/07/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure STATEMENT by defendant Schlage Lock Co Inc, defendant Ingersoll-Rand Co In re: removal complaint [1-1], re: complaint [0-1] (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from El Paso Cty Dist Ct Case Number: 02CV2952 (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240341. (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff; jury demand (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?