Pearson v. S & A Restr Corp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00003-MSK-PAC
District Judge Marcia S. Krieger, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID PEARSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fisher & Phillips LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Merrily S. Archer +1 303 218 3650 +1 303 218 3651 marcher@laborlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by rs3legal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary W. Truman +1 303 623 1131 +1 303 623 1141 gtruman@rs3legal.com
v.
No Logo S&a Restaurant Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "S & A Restaurant Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Bagby +1 540 983 7766 +9837 983 983 7714

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather Carson Perkins +1 303 607 3500 +1 303 607 3600 hperkins@faegre.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 83 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Stipulation
STIPULATION re: Dismissal with Prejudice by plaintiff David Pearson, defendant S & A Restr Corp (erv)
    LREF
    Blank 82 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
    NOTICE OF Stipulated DISMISSAL OF CASE by plaintiff, defendant ; entry date : 7/13/04 (erv)
      LREF
      Blank 81 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Motion to Vacate
      Joint Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff David Pearson, defendant S & A Restr Corp to vacate 7/12/04 trial (erv)
        LREF
        Blank 80 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger denying Pla's motion for order for testimony by telephone of one of Pla's witnesses [73-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/8/04 (erv)
          LREF
          Blank 79 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger; No later than 7/7/04, the parties shall submit to the court by electronic mail or diskette a revised witness list. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/7/04 (erv)
            LREF
            Blank 78 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE in Opposition by defendant S & A Restr Corp to motion for order for testimony by telephone of one of Pla's witnesses [73-1] (erv) Modified on 07/01/2004
              LREF
              Blank 77 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger granting motion for substitute witness with attached exhibits [71-1]; If Dft desires to take the deposition of Mr Kitzmiller, the Pla shall pay the transcription costs of that deposition as well as any travel expenses incurred by the Dft solely because of the depotion (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/30/04 (erv)
                LREF
                Blank 76 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE in Opposition by plaintiff David Pearson to motion for substitute witness with attached exhibits [71-1] (erv) Modified on 07/07/2004
                  LREF
                  Blank 75 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE in Opposition by defendant S & A Restr Corp to motion for substitute witness with attached exhibits [71-1] (erv) Modified on 07/07/2004
                    LREF
                    Blank 74 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Certificate
                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff David Pearson re: Motion for testimony by telephone (erv)
                      LREF
                      Blank 73 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004, Terminated: 7/7/2004 Motion for Order
                      MOTION by plaintiff David Pearson for order for testimony by telephone of one of Pla's witnesses (erv)
                        LREF
                        Blank 72 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger regarding Pla's [71-1] motion for substitute witness with attached exhibits; Dft shall file a response no later than 6/25/04; Pla may file a reply no later than 7/2/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/15/04 (erv)
                          LREF
                          Blank 71 Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004, Terminated: 6/29/2004 Motion to Substitute Party
                          AMENDED MOTION by plaintiff David Pearson for substitute witness with attached exhibits Terminating prior motion for substitute Witness [70-1] (erv) Modified on 07/07/2004
                            LREF
                            Blank 70 Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Motion to Substitute Party
                            MOTION by plaintiff David Pearson for substitute witness (erv) Modified on 07/07/2004
                              LREF
                              Blank 69 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger granting motion to vacate hrg set 5/24/04 [68-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/17/04 (erv)
                                LREF
                                Blank 68 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004, Terminated: 5/17/2004 Motion to Vacate
                                Joint Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff, defendant to vacate hrg set 5/24/04 (erv)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 67 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; settlement conf held 5/7/04 No settlement was reached (erv)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 66 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    COURTROOM MINUTES of Final Trial Prep Conf by Judge Marcia S. Krieger ; jury trial reset for 1:00 7/12/04 ; Trial prep conference held on 5/5/04 denying motion in limine to exclude evidence related to any alleged failure to accommodate [44-1] granting motion in limine to exclude certain irrelevant and unfairly prejudicial evidence which dft intends to present at trial [49-1] denying motion in limine to exclude evidence of alleged discrimination that occurred prior to Pla's entry into Dft's manager in training program because any such evidence is time-barred [43-1] denying motion in limine to exclude witnesses not disclosed dueing the discovery period herein [46-1] ; entry date : 5/6/04 Court Reporter: Kara Spitler (erv)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 65 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger granting Joint Stipulated motion to extend time to submit Jury Trial Materials to and incl 4/16/04 [64-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/16/04 (erv)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 64 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004, Terminated: 4/16/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Joint Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff, defendants' to extend time to submit Jury Trial Materials to and incl 4/16/04 (erv)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 63 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          REPLY by defendant S & A Restr Corp to response to motion in limine to exclude witnesses not disclosed dueing the discovery period herein [46-1] (erv)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 62 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY by defendant S & A Restr Corp to response to motion in limine to exclude evidence of alleged discrimination that occurred prior to Pla's entry into Dft's manager in training program because any such evidence is time-barred [43-1] (erv)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 61 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                              REPLY by defendant S & A Restr Corp to response to motion in limine to exclude evidence related to any alleged failure to accommodate [44-1] (erv)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 60 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Trial Brief
                                                Trial brief submitted by defendant S & A Restr Corp (erv)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Supplement/Amendment
                                                  Correction (SUPPLEMENT) by plaintiff David Pearson to motion in limine to exclude certain irrelevant and unfairly prejudicial which dft intends to present at trial [49-1] (erv)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                    REPLY by plaintiff David Pearson to Dfts response in Opposition to motion in limine to exclude certain irrelevant and unfairly prejudicial evidence which dft intends to present at trial [49-1] (erv)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger ; Trial prep conference Reset for 2:00 5/5/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/12/04 (erv)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Response to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE by plaintiff David Pearson to motion in limine to exclude witnesses not disclosed dueing the discovery period herein [46-1] (erv)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Response to Motion
                                                          RESPONSE by plaintiff David Pearson to motion in limine to exclude evidence related to any alleged failure to accommodate [44-1] (erv)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Response to Motion
                                                            RESPONSE by plaintiff David Pearson to motion in limine to exclude evidence of alleged discrimination that occurred prior to Pla's entry into Dft's manager in training program because any such evidence is time-barred [43-1] (erv)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Response to Motion
                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by defendant S & A Restr Corp to motion in limine to exclude certain irrelevant and unfairly prejudicial evidence which dft intends to present at trial [49-1] (erv)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Objections
                                                                OBJECTIONS by defendant S & A Restr Corp to Pla's Trial Exhibits (erv)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Objections
                                                                  OBJECTIONS by plaintiff David Pearson to Dfts' Exhibits in the Final PTO (erv)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Trial Exhibit
                                                                    EXHIBITS by defendant S & A Restr Corp to motion in limine to exclude witnesses not disclosed dueing the discovery period herein [46-1] (erv)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff David Pearson in limine to exclude certain irrelevant and unfairly prejudicial evidence which dft intends to present at trial (erv)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                        BRIEF by defendant S & A Restr Corp in support of motion in limine to exclude evidence of alleged discrimination that occurred prior to Pla's entry into Dft's manager in training program because any such evidence is time-barred [43-1] (erv)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                          BRIEF by defendant S & A Restr Corp in support of motion in limine to exclude witnesses not disclosed during the discovery period herein [46-1] (erv)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                            MOTION by defendant S & A Restr Corp in limine to exclude witnesses not disclosed dueing the discovery period herein (erv)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                              BRIEF by defendant S & A Restr Corp in support of motion in limine to exclude evidence related to any alleged failure to accommodate [44-1] (erv)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                                MOTION by defendant S & A Restr Corp in limine to exclude evidence related to any alleged failure to accommodate (erv)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                                  MOTION by defendant S & A Restr Corp in limine to exclude evidence of alleged discrimination that occurred prior to Pla's entry into Dft's manager in training program because any such evidence is time-barred (erv)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger denying Dft's motion for summary adjudication on disability claims pursuant to the American with Disabilities Act [25-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/12/04 (erv)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      PRE-TRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan; a ruling is pending on Dft's Motion for Sum Adjudication, the parties anticipate filing motions in limine pursuant to the Ct's instructions and deadline for doing so; Discovery has been completed; Trial will be to the court and a jury estimated at three days commencing 6/1/04 (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
                                                                                        COURTROOM MINUTES of Final Pre-Trial Conf by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan , ; settlement conf set for 3:00 5/7/04 ; pretrial conf held 3/8/04 ; entry date : 3/10/04 Court Reporter: FTR (erv)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting motion to vacate and reschedule final pretrial conference set 2/20/04 [36-1] ; pretrial conf reset for 10:00 3/8/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/26/04 (lam)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff by Gary W. Truman (bpm)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Marcia S. Krieger referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to vacate and reschedule final pretrial conference set 2/20/04 [36-1] (bpm)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004, Terminated: 1/23/2004 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                Joint Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff, defendant to vacate and reschedule final pretrial conference set 2/20/04 (gms)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger denying pla's renewed motion for leave to file sur-reply to dft's procedureal argument for summary judgment [33-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/20/04 (pap)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Response
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by plaintiff David Pearson to dft's motion for summary adjudication on disability claims pursaunt to the American with Disabilities Act [25-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004, Terminated: 1/16/2004 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                      Renewed MOTION by plaintiff David Pearson for leave to file sur-reply to dft's procedureal argument for summary judgment (dlb)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                        Tendered Response to Dft's Motion for Summary Adjudication submitted by plaintiff David Pearson re: motion for leave to file sur-reply to dft's procedureal argument for summary judgment [33-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                          RESPONSE in opposition by defendant S & A Restr Corp to pla's motion for leave to file sur-reply to dft's procedural argument for sum jgm [30-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger denying pla's motion for leave to file sur-reply to dft's procedural argument for sum jgm [30-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/6/04 (dlb)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2004 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff David Pearson for leave to file sur-reply to dft's procedural argument for sum jgm (dlb)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003 Response
                                                                                                                RESPONSE by plaintiff David Pearson to dft's motion for summary adjudication on disability claims pursaunt to the American with Disabilities Act [25-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                  Tendered Pla's Sur-Reply submitted by plaintiff re: motion for leave to file sur-reply to dft's procedural argument for sum jgm [30-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY Memorandum by defendant S & A Restr Corp in response to pla's opposition to dft's motion for summary adjudication on disability claims pursaunt to the American with Disabilities Act [25-1] (dlb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by plaintiff David Pearson to motion for summary adjudication on disability claims pursaunt to the American with Disabilities Act [25-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM (BRIEF) by defendant S & A Restr Corp, and MRS Management Co in support of motion for summary adjudication on disability claims pursaunt to the American with Disabilities Act [25-1] **item is approximately 2" thick and was placed in the exhibit area (former empl) Modified on 11/18/2003
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant S & A Restr Corp, blank (space) MRS Management Co for summary adjudication on disability claims pursaunt to the American with Disabilities Act (former empl)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Trial Prep ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger ; three day jury trial set for 1:00 6/1/04 on a trailing docket in second position ; Trial prep conference set for 8:00 5/4/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/4/03 (erv)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting Stipulation to extend time to respond to Pla's Discovery requests [21-1] to and incl 9/12/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/15/03 (erv)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Judge Marcia S. Krieger referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the Stipulation (motion) to extend to respond to Pla's Discovery requests [21-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003, Terminated: 9/11/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                  Stipulation (MOTION) by defendant S & A Restr Corp to extend time to respond to Pla's Discovery requests (erv)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; settlement conf held 8/19/03 (erv)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan regarding [18-1] Stipulation and Protective Order with interlineation in paragraph 11, requiring the parties to move the court for permission to file documents under seal, the Protective Order of the Court this date (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/18/03 (erv)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan; the parties are required to move the court with permission to file documents under seal : (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan GRANTING Joint Unopposed motion to reset the 7/14/03 scheduling conference to the week of 8/18/03 [15-1] ; settlement conf set for 1:30 8/19/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/14/03 (erv)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Marcia S. Krieger referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the Joint Unopposed motion to reset the 7/14/03 scheduling conference to the week of 8/18/03 [15-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003, Terminated: 7/9/2003 Motion to Reset
                                                                                                                                              Joint Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff David Pearson, defendant S & A Restr Corp to reset the 7/14/03 scheduling conference to the week of 8/18/03 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Firm Name Change of Merrily S. Archer (erv)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address of Faegre & Benson LLP (erv)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting Joingt Unopposed motion to extend time to respond to Discovery requests no later than 5/23/03 [10-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/21/03 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Marcia S. Krieger referring to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan the motion to extend time to respond to Discovery requests [10-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003, Terminated: 5/20/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                        Joint Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff, defendant to extend time to respond to Discovery requests (erv)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            COURTROOM MINUTES of Scheduling Conf by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; rule 16 conf held on 4/24/03 ; discovery ddl set 10/17/03 ; disp mtn ddl set 11/17/03 ; settlement conf set for 3:00 7/14/03 ; pretrial conf set for 8:30 2/20/04 ; jury trial set for 1:00 6/1/04 ; Trial prep conference set for 8:00 5/4/04 ; entry date : 4/29/03 Court Reporter: PAC Civil Tape 2003-36 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; Rule 16 conference set for 8:30 4/24/03 (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure STATEMENT by defendant S & A Restr Corp (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by defendant S & A Restr Corp to complaint [1-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of Opportunity for Accelerated service by Judge Marcia S. Krieger (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/26/03 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan by Judge Marcia S. Krieger (cc: to counsel) (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of address of Merily S. Archer (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued); jury demand (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                            FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240342. (bpm)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 122 times.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?