Krantz v. Unum Life Ins Co
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00004-JLK-BNB
District Judge John L. Kane, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stephanie Krantz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Scott Krieger +1 800 671 2322 +1 303 781 1349 m.krieger@comcast.net
Space James L. Noel +1 800 671 2322 +1 303 781 1349 jlnoel@comcast.net
v.
No Logo Unum Life Insurance Company of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack M. Englert, Jr. +1 303 290 1087 +1 303 290 1606 jenglert@hollandhart.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Denver
Terminated 6/27/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 02CV8477[Denver Cty Dist Ct]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Stipulation (NOTICE) OF DISMISSAL OF CASE with prej by plaintiff Stephanie Krantz, defendant Unum Life Ins Co ; entry date : 6/30/03 (dlb)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; settlement conf set for 3:00 6/26/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/12/03 (lam)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
      ORDER stlmt Case referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge John L. Kane (cc: to counsel) (bpm)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER Judge John L. Kane ; Discovery cutoff 8/31/03 ;dispositive motions due 9/30/03 (cc: all counsel) (bpm)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          COURTROOM MINUTES by Judge John L. Kane ; rule 16 conf held on 3/7/03 . An order of reference will issue. Answer/response brief due w/in 20 days of filing of motion and brief. Reply briefs due w/in 10 days after filing. 30 days after closure of discovery, proposed PTO due. Jury instructions due w/ proposed PTO. entry date : 3/10/03 Court Reporter: Geneva Mattei, ECR (gms)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge John L. Kane ; rule 16 conference set for 10:00 3/7/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/6/03 (dlb)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
              ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Judge John L. Kane ; Rule 16 conference set for 10:00 3/5/03 (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Answer
                ANSWER by defendant Unum Life Ins Co to removal complaint [1-1] (dlb)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Notice of Removal
                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Denver Cty Dist Ct Case Number: 02CV8477 (bpm)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Filing Fee Received
                    FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240354. (bpm)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 124 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?