Hahn v. Parallel Indus Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00005-RPM-BNB
District Judge Richard P. Matsch, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gary L. Hahn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Olsen +1 303 652 1133 olsenbrown@comcast.net
v.
No Logo Parallel Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Training and Support Specialists, Inc., Defendant
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Jefferson
Terminated 7/21/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags NDISPO, TERMED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Richard P. Matsch granting motion to dismiss case purs to Red.R.civ.P. 41 [16-1] dismissing case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/22/04 (dlb)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004, Terminated: 7/21/2004 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION by plaintiff Gary L. Hahn to dismiss case purs to Red.R.civ.P. 41 (dlb)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004, Terminated: 7/21/2004 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by plaintiff Gary L. Hahn (dlb)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Richard P. Matsch ; pla to file status report by 7/6/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/21/04 (lam)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Richard P. Matsch discharging order to show cause [12-1] upon considering motion to further stay proceedings and status report [13-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/2/04 (lam)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Motion to Stay
            MOTION by plaintiff Gary L. Hahn to further stay proceedings (dlb)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by plaintiff Gary L. Hahn re: Bankruptcy (dlb) Modified on 02/20/2004
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Judge Richard P. Matsch returnable 2/27/04 by pla why this action should not be dismissed re: dfts' bk proceeding (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT by plaintiff Gary L. Hahn re: Bankruptcy (pap)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; rule 16 conf set 5/7/03 vacated; pla to file status reports every six months beginning 7/1/03 purs to pla's suggestion of dfts' bankruptcy [8-2] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/2/03 (lam)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM by Chambers referring to Mag Judge Boland pla's suggestion of dfts' bankruptcy [8-1] (lam)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Suggestion of Bankruptcy
                        Suggestion (NOTICE) of defendants filing bankruptcy in USBK Eastern Dist of OK, Case No. 03-71447); CASE STAYED as to defendants filing Bankruptcy [8-1] (lam)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; rule 16 conference vacated and reset for 1:00 5/7/03 ; proposed scheduling order due on or before 4/30/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/16/03 (pap)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland granting pla's ex parte motion to continue 4/3/03 scheduling conf [5-1] ; rule 16 conference reset for 8:30 5/2/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/2/03 (lam)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003, Terminated: 4/1/2003 Motion to Continue
                              Ex Parte MOTION by plaintiff Gary L. Hahn to continue 4/3/03 scheduling conf (lam)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Parallel Indus Inc on 1/21/03 by leaving with: Connie Domiguez, The Corporation Company (lam) Modified on 01/24/2003
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Training Supp Sp Inc on 1/21/03 by leaving with: Connie Domiguez, the Corporation Company (lam)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland ; Rule 16 conference set for 8:45 4/3/03 (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Richard P. Matsch (cc: to counsel) (lam)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued); jury demand (bpm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                          FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240358. (bpm)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?