Willett v. Level 3 Comm LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00006-RPM-OES
District Judge Richard P. Matsch, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas R. Willett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Olsen +1 303 652 1133 olsenbrown@comcast.net
v.
Level 3 Communications, LLC Level 3 Communications, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CH2M Hill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan David Schuchman +1 720 286 0231 +1 720 286 8049 alan.schuchman@ch2m.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Michael Mumaugh +1 303 290 1600 bmumaugh@hollandhart.com
Space Maureen Reidy Witt +1 303 290 1600 mwitt@hollandhart.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 10/17/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER of dismissal with prejudice by Judge Richard P. Matsch granting stipulation for dismissal with prejudice [40-1] dismissing case ; each party to pay its own fees and costs (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/20/03 (pap)
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003, Terminated: 10/17/2003 Motion to Dismiss
    Stipulation (MOTION) by plaintiff Thomas R. Willett, defendant Level 3 Comm LLC for dismissal with prejudice (lam)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter following the settlement conf, this case has been settled, dsm papers ddl set for 10/6/03 or this court shall recommend that this action be dismissed w/out any further ntc or hearing (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/23/03 (lam)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter resetting hearing on motion to compel discovery [24-1] 10:15 9/22/03 upon oral motion of counsel (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/12/03 (lam)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf held 8/27/03 (lam)
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter denying pla's motion for leave to attend settlement conf by telephone [34-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/27/03 (lam)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
              MEMORANDUM by Chambers referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for leave to attend settlement conf by telephone [34-1] (lam)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003, Terminated: 8/26/2003 Motion for Leave
                MOTION by plaintiff Thomas R. Willett for leave to attend settlement conf by telephone (lam)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Level 3 Comm LLC by Brian Michael Mumaugh (lam)
                    LREF
                    Blank 33 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                    NOTICE of change of address of Brian M. Mumaugh by defendant Level 3 Comm LLC (lam)
                      LREF
                      Blank 32 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by defendant Level 3 Comm LLC to response to motion to compel discovery [24-1] (lam)
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter setting hearing on dft's motion to compel discovery [24-1] 10:30 9/11/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/18/03 (lam)
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Response to Motion
                          Exhibits in RESPONSE by plaintiff Thomas R. Willett to motion to compel discovery [24-1] (lam)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by plaintiff Thomas R. Willett to motion to compel discovery [24-1] (lam)
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting pla's motion for enlargement of time to respond to dft's motion to compel to 8/12/03 [27-1] regarding [24-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/11/03 (lam)
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003, Terminated: 8/8/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                MOTION by plaintiff Thomas R. Willett for enlargement of time to respond to dft's motion to compel to and through 8/11/04 (pap)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [24-1] dft's motion to compel discovery, response ddl 8/5/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/25/03 (lam)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Richard P. Matsch referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to compel discovery [24-1] (pap)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003, Terminated: 10/17/2003 Motion to Compel
                                      MOTION by defendant Level 3 Comm LLC to compel discovery (lam)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Richard P. Matsch denying pla's motion for lv to file first amended complaint [1-1] [13-1], denying motion for sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 [10-1], granting motion to dismiss claim for compensatory and punitive damages under the ADEA [9-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/22/03 (pap)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          Amended REPLY by defendant Level 3 Comm LLC in support of motion to dismiss [9-1] and for sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 [10-1] (lam)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting dft's motion for leave to submit attached affidavit in support response to pla's mtn for lv to file first amd cmp [19-1] regarding [18-1], [13-1], [1-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/17/03 (lam) Modified on 07/17/2003
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                              REPLY by defendant Level 3 Comm LLC in support of motion to dismiss [9-1] and motion for sanctions (lam)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003, Terminated: 7/16/2003 Motion for Leave
                                                MOTION by defendant Level 3 Comm LLC for leave to submit attached affidavit in support of response to pla's mtn for lv to file first amd cmp (lam) Modified on 07/16/2003
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Response to Motion
                                                  RESPONSE by defendant Level 3 Comm LLC to plaintiff's motion for lv to file first amended complaint [1-1] [13-1] (lam)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf vacated and reset for 3:00 8/27/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/10/03 (pap)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [13-1] pla's motion for lv to file first amended complaint [1-1], dft's shall file a response to pla's mtn by 7/14/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/2/03 (lam)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM by Chambers referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion for lv to file first amended complaint [1-1] [13-1] (lam)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Response to Motion
                                                          RESPONSE by plaintiff Thomas R. Willett to dft's motion to dismiss [9-1] and motion for sanctions [10-1] (lam)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                            MOTION by plaintiff Thomas R. Willett for lv to file first amended complaint [1-1] (lam)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                              Tendered first amended cmp submitted by plaintiff Thomas R. Willett re: motion for lv to file first amended complaint [1-1] [13-1] (lam)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Richard P. Matsch granting motion by pla to extend time until 6/30/03 to file responses to dft's mtn to dismiss & for sanctions [11-1], [10-1], [9-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/27/03 (lam)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Thomas R. Willett to extend time 5 days to respond to dft's mtn to dismiss & for sanctions (lam)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                    MOTION by defendant for sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 (gms)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION by defendant to dismiss claim for compensatory and punitive damages under the ADEA (gms)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter that a settlement conf is set for 7/14/03 at 1:30 and a ptc is set for 1/15/04 at 9:15 regarding [6-2] minutes (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/25/03 (lam)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                            COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; rule 16 conf held on 4/23/03 ; discovery ddl set 10/31/03 ; disp mtn ddl set 12/5/03 ; settlement conf set for 1:30 7/14/03 ; pretrial conf set for 9:15 1/15/04 ; entry date : 4/25/03 Court Reporter: Tape 03-7 (lam)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; rule 16 conference reset for 9:15 4/23/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/11/03 (lam)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER by defendant Level 3 Comm LLC to complaint [1-1] (lam)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:45 4/15/03 (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pto referred to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter by Judge Richard P. Matsch (cc: to counsel) (lam)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003, Terminated: 7/21/2003 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued); jury demand (bpm)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                        FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240359. (bpm)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?