Barber v. Gemisys Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00007-REB-CBS
District Judge Robert E. Blackburn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kathleen A. Barber, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward Tuddenham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna E. Dell'Olio +1 719 475 1204 +1 719 475 1264 ddellolio@cornishanddellolio.com
v.
No Logo Gemisys Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman & Howard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Wayne Newcom +1 303 299 8246 +1 303 298 0940 cnewcom@sah.com
Space Heather Fox Vickles +1 303 299 8194 +1 303 298 0940 hvickles@sah.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Arapahoe
Terminated 8/20/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting stipulation and jt motion to dismiss [18-1]; dismissing case with prej , each party to pay own atty fees and costs (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/21/03 (lam)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003, Terminated: 8/20/2003 Motion to Dismiss
    Stipulation and Jt MOTION by plaintiff Kathleen A. Barber, defendant Gemisys Corporation to dismiss (lam)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn granting pla's motion to dismiss w/prej first cause of action (age discrimination) [14-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/7/03 (pap)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        COURTROOM MINUTES (Settlement Agreement placed on the Record) by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer; stip mtn of dismissal and proposed order to be submitted by 8/20/03, all further settings and ddls in this case will be vacated ; entry date : 8/6/03 Court Reporter: Tpae 03-140 (lam)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; settlement conf held 8/5/03 ; dsm papers ddl set for 8/20/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/6/03 (lam)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003, Terminated: 8/6/2003 Motion to Dismiss
            Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Kathleen A. Barber to dismiss w/prej first cause of action (age discrimination) (lam)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Protective OrderCourt Filing
              Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer : governing the exchange and handling of sensitive and confidential information (cc: all counsel) (pap)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; settlement conf reset for 10:00 8/5/03 at req of parties (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/22/03 (lam)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; rule 16 conf held on 4/9/03 ; discovery ddl set 10/15/03 ; disp mtn ddl set 11/14/03 ; settlement conf set for 2:00 6/16/03 ; pretrial conf set for 9:30 2/16/04 ; entry date : 4/10/03 Court Reporter: Tape 03-50 (lam)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Answer
                      ANSWER by defendant Gemisys Corporation to complaint [1-1] (lam)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Statement
                        Disclosure STATEMENT by defendant Gemisys Corporation (lam)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting parties' motion to reset scheduling conf set 3/17/03 [5-1] ; rule 16 conference reset for 9:30 4/9/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/30/03 (lam)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to reset scheduling conf set 3/17/03 [5-1] (lam)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003, Terminated: 1/29/2003 Motion to Reset
                              MOTION by plaintiff Kathleen A. Barber to reset scheduling conf set 3/17/03 (lam)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                                WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Gemisys Corporation on 1/9/02 (1/9/03) by Charles Newcomb (lam)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                  ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; Rule 16 conference set for 10:00 3/17/03 (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn (cc: to counsel) (lam)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued); jury demand (bpm)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                        FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240361. (bpm)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 399 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?