In Re: World Port, LLC, et al v. Tower 88 Company LLP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00009-JLK-PAC
District Judge John L. Kane, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tower 88 Company, LLP, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Berenbaum Weinshienk & Eason, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise S. Maes +1 303 825 0800 +1 303 629 7610 dmaes@bw-legal.com
No Logo World Port, LLC, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fairfield & Woods, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caroline C. Fuller +1 303 830 2400 +1 303 830 1033 cfuller@fwlaw.com
No Logo World Port, LLC, Debtor
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 6/2/2003
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
103-cv-00009-JLK-PAC None
Related Case
Other Court Case 02-20076ABC[Bankruptcy Court]
Def Custody Status
Flags BKAPP, LEAD, TERMED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge John L. Kane granting motion to dismiss appeals (BK) [18-1] in 1:03-cv-00009, 1:03-cv-00011 The parties to bear their own costs and atty fees. dismissing case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/3/03 (gms)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003, Terminated: 6/2/2003 Motion to Dismiss Appeal
    MOTION by appellant in 1:03-cv-00009, appellant in 1:03-cv-00011 to dismiss appeals (BK) (gms)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Designation of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal
      DESIGNATION of record on appeal and statement of issues by appellant in 1:03-cv-00009,1:03-cv-00011 (Copy - original filed in USBC on 2/14/03) (gms)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan. upon filing of record, briefing schedule will be set pursuant to BR 8009 and a minute order will issue (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/18/03 (gms)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; mag pre-briefing/settlement conference held 2/18/03 . Upon filing of the record, the briefing schedule will be set by minute order pursuant to BR 8009 ; entry date : 2/18/03 Court Reporter: None (gms)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Notice of Change of Address
            NOTICE of Change of addres of csl for Compass Bank, Douglass M. Tisdale of the law firm Tisdale & Associates LLC (lam)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge John L. Kane discharging the [11-1] order to show cause in 1:03-cv-00009, 1:03-cv-00011 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/3/03 (gms) Modified on 02/03/2003
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Response to Order to Show Cause
                Response to ORDER to show cause by appellant in 1:03-cv-00009,1:03-cv-00011 [11-1] (gms) Modified on 02/03/2003
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Judge John L. Kane returnable within 10 days in 1:03-cv-00009, in 1:03-cv-00011 by appellant why appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute (cc: all counsel) (gms)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting unopposed motion to continue Pre-Briefing and Settlement Conference set 1/28/03 [8-1] in 1:03-cv-00009, 1:03-cv-00011 ; mag pre-briefing/settlement conference rset for 9:00 2/18/03 in 1:03-cv-00009, in 1:03-cv-00011 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/28/03 (gms)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Letter re Bankruptcy Appeal
                      LETTER from USBC advising that appellant has failed to file designation of record & statement of issues due 1/9/03 re bankruptcy appeal [1-1] in 1:03-cv-00009, [1-1] in 1:03-cv-00011 (gms)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003, Terminated: 1/28/2003 Motion to Continue
                        Unopposed MOTION by appellant in 1:03-cv-00009 & 1:03-cv-00011 to continue Pre-Briefing and Settlement Conference set 1/28/03 (gms) Modified on 01/28/2003
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe granting motion to consolidate appeals 03-AP-9 and 03-AP-11 [6-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/22/03 (gms)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003, Terminated: 1/22/2003 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                            Renewed MOTION by appellant to consolidate appeals 03-AP-9 and 03-AP-11 (gms)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan denying appellant's motion to consolidate cases 03-AP-9 and 03-AP-11 and for extension of time to file designation of record & statement of issues until 10 days after bk ct rules on Henrichsen Motion [4-1] for failure to comply w/ LR 7.1 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/9/03 (gms)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003, Terminated: 1/9/2003 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                MOTION by appellant to consolidate cases 03-AP-9 and 03-AP-11 and for extension of time to file designation of record & statement of issues until 10 days after bk ct rules on Henrichsen Motion (gms)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; mag pre-briefing/settlement conference set for 9:00 1/28/03 , Case referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/3/03 (gms)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Letter re Bankruptcy Appeal
                                    LETTER re bankruptcy appeal ; Appellant's dsgntn/stmt of iss due 1/9/03 ; Appellee may file addtl documents by 1/21/03 [1-1] (gms)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Bankruptcy Appeal
                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by World Port, LLC in re Order and Judgment of 12/20/02 (Copy - original filed in U. S. Bankruptcy Court 12/30/02) (Copy of USBC Docket Sheet) (gms)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?