In Re: Johanson, et al v. Weinman
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00010-EWN-PAC
District Judge Edward W. Nottingham, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeffrey A. Weinman, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by nnbpbllc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen C. Nicholls +1 303 329 9700 +1 303 329 6950 steve.nicholls@nnbpbllc.com
No Logo John S. Johanson, Debtor
No Logo Rodney Proffitt, Appellant
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition District Court Affirmed Decision in its Entirety
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 6/24/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 99-16886DEC[Bankruptcy Court]
Def Custody Status
Flags BKAPP, TERMED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Response
RESPONSE to Motion to Disallow Claim by Appellant Rodney Proffitt. (gms, )
    LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Response to Motion
    RESPONSE to Demand for Attorney's Fees ([22] Motion for Attorney Fees ) filed by Appellant Rodney Proffitt. (gms, )
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
      Final JUDGMENT: by Clerk Gregory C. Langham, approved by Judge Nottingham regarding [31-1] order Judgement entered against creditor/appellant Rodney Profitt in favor of trustee/appellee Jeffrey A. Weinman for $,982,75 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/1/04 (gms) Modified on 10/01/2004
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting trustee/appellee's motion for an award of attorney fees & expenses pursuant to BR 8020 [22-1]. Clerk to enter judgment against Profitt and in favor of Weinman for $4,982.75 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/1/04 (gms)
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT by appellee/trustee (gms)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham regarding [28-1] letter ; joint status report ddl set for 7/30/04 as to the status of the pending motion for award of atty fees (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/7/04 (gms)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Letter
              LETTER to court from appellant re: minute order [27-1] requesting status of this case. (gms)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Edward W. Nottingham granting appellant's motion for additional time to file responsive brief to appellee's motion for atty fees to 11/24/03 [25-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/12/04 (gms)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE by appellant to motion for an award of attorney fees & expenses pursuant to BR 8020 [22-1] (gms)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003, Terminated: 5/11/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                    Request (MOTION) by appellant for additional time to file responsive brief to appellee's motion for atty fees to 11/24/03 (gms)
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Receipt
                      RECEIPT for record on appeal by USBC on 9/23/03 (gms)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Transmittal of Documents
                        Record on Appeal, consisting of Volumes I and II, returned to USBC (gms)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Response to Motion
                          RESPONSE by appellant to motion for an award of attorney fees & expenses pursuant to BR 8020 [22-1] (gms)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003, Terminated: 9/30/2004 Motion for Attorney Fees
                            MOTION by appellee for an award of attorney fees & expenses pursuant to BR 8020 (gms)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
                              JUDGMENT: by Clerk Gregory C. Langham, approved by Judge Nottingham. regarding [20-1] order Bankruptcy court's 12/20/02 order granting approval of the settlement agreement betweeen trustee/appellee Weinman and Mrs.Johnson is affirmed. Trustee/Appellee's request for costs and atty fees based on Profitt's frivolous appeal is denied. Trustee/Appellee shall have his costs upon the proper filing of a bill of costs w/in 10 days. terminating case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/24/03 (gms)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER and Memorandum of Decision by Judge Edward W. Nottingham. Bankruptcy Court's 12/20/02 order granting approval of the settlement agreement between trustee/appellee Weinman and Mrs. Johnson is affirmed. Trustee/appellee's request for costs and atty fees based on Profitt's frivolous appeal is denied. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/23/03 (gms)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 LetterCourt Filing
                                  LETTER from clerk to counsel advising that case is now at issue and has been drawn to Judge Nottingham. (gms)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Appellee's Response Brief
                                    APPELLEE's response brief by appellee ; appellee's brief ddl held re: BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL [14-1] (gms)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Appellants Opening Brief
                                      APPELLANT's Brief by appellant ; appellant's brief ddl held bankruptcy motion BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL [14-1] (gms)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan , ; appellant's brief ddl set for 3/13/03 ; appellee's brief ddl set for 3/28/03 ; appellant's reply brief ddl set for 4/7/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/26/03 (gms)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Letter re Bankruptcy Appeal
                                          LETTER to all parties advising of date of docketing of record on appeal [14-1] (gms)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003, Terminated: 6/24/2003 Bankruptcy Record on AppealCourt Filing
                                            BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Vol I -- Pleadings Vol II -- Transcript of proceedings on 11/21/02 before Judge Cordova (gms)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan. Appellant's motion to withdraw counsel is granted. Upon filing of record on appeal, the briefing schedule will be set pursuant to BR 8009 and a minute order will issue. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/18/03 (gms)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; mag pre-briefing/settlement conference held 2/18/03 granting appellant's motion to withdraw attorney Sender & Wasserman as counsel for appellant [9-1] attorney Bonnie A. Bell for Rodney Proffitt. Upon filing of the record on appeal, the briefing schedule will be set pursuant to BR 8009 and a minute order will issue setting forth the briefing schedule. ; entry date : 2/18/03 Court Reporter: None (gms)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan Parties and mr. Proffit to respond to [9-1] motion to withdraw attorney Sender & Wasserman as counsel for appellant on or before 2/14/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/30/03 (gms)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTIFICATION Certificate to appellant pursuant to LR 83.5(D) re: motion to withdraw attorney Sender & Wasserman as counsel for appellant [9-1] (gms)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                      MOTION by appellant to withdraw attorney Sender & Wasserman as counsel for appellant (gms)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Designation of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal
                                                        Statement of issues by appellant (Copy) (gms)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Designation of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal
                                                          DESIGNATION of record on appeal by appellant (Copy - original filed in USBC on 1/9/03) (gms)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan granting appellee's motion to continue pre-briefing & settlement conference set 1/28/03 [5-1] ; mag pre-briefing/settlement conference reset for 9:00 2/18/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/13/03 (gms)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003, Terminated: 1/13/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                              MOTION by appellee to continue pre-briefing & settlement conference set 1/28/03 (gms)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                Amended MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan Correcting the case number to 03-AP-10(PAC) and the date of the pre-briefing/settlement conference to 1/28/03 at 9:00 a.m.(cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/3/03 (gms)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; mag pre-briefing/settlement conference set for 9:00 1/28/03 , Case referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/3/03 (gms)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Letter re Bankruptcy Appeal
                                                                    LETTER re bankruptcy appeal ; Appellant's dsgntn/stmt of iss due 1/9/03 ; Appellee may file addtl documents by 1/21/03 [1-1] (gms)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Bankruptcy Appeal
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Rodney Proffitt in re Judgment of 12/20/02 (Copy - original filed in U. S. Bankruptcy Court 12/30/02) (Copy of USBC Docket Sheet) (gms)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?