Vaughn v. Active Air Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00012-MSK-CBS
District Judge Marcia S. Krieger, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Deanna L. Vaughn, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Active Air Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark E. Nolan +1 303 407 0830 +4070 407 407 0837

Toggle Switch Represented by langhofflaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marilee E. Langhoff +1 303 795 1284 marilee@langhofflaw.com
No Logo Bruce J. Cardella, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by langhofflaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marilee E. Langhoff +1 303 795 1284 marilee@langhofflaw.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Denver
Terminated 5/5/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger granting Stipulated motion to dismiss this action with prejudice, with each party to pay their own fees and costs [14-1] dismissing case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/6/03 (erv)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003, Terminated: 5/5/2003 Motion to Dismiss
    Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff, defendants' to dismiss this action with prejudice, with each party to pay their own fees and costs (erv)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer; pursuant to the parties representation to the court, it is ORDERED that a joint stipulation for dismissal is due on or before 5/12/03 ; dsm papers ddl set for 5/12/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/1/03 (erv)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Answer
        ANSWER by defendant Active Air Inc. to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (erv)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Brief in Support of Motion
          BRIEF by defendant Bruce J. Cardella in support of motion to dismiss [10-1] (erv)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003, Terminated: 5/5/2003 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION by defendant Bruce J. Cardella to dismiss (erv)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Notice of Attorney Substitution
              Notice of ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Mark E. Nolan for Bruce J. Cardella and substituting attorney Marilee E. Langhoff (gms)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Bruce J. Cardella on 3/5/03 (erv)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Waiver of Service Executed
                  WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Active Air Inc. on 3/5/03 (erv)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM by Judge Marcia S. Krieger referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the Dfts Unopposed motion to continue Scheduling/Planning conf set for 3/12/03 [6-1] (erv)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting Dfts Unopposed motion to continue Scheduling/Planning conf set for 3/12/03 [6-1] ; rule 16 conference Reset for 10:30 5/1/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/10/03 (erv)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Motion to Continue
                        Unopposed MOTION by Dfts' to continue Scheduling/Planning conf set for 3/12/03 (erv)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003, Terminated: 3/6/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant by Mark E. Nolan (erv)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                            ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; Rule 16 conference set for 10:00 3/12/03 (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                              ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,mtnrec,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Marcia S. Krieger (cc: to counsel) (erv)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                Title VII COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (bpm)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                  FILING FEE PAID: on 1/2/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240364. (bpm)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 155 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?