Jacquie Figg -v- Superior Court
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. CIVDS1008308

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jacquie A Figg, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Superior Court of California, Respondent
Complaint 1 0001 Mpu Misc Petition - Civil Unlimited Of Jacquie A Figg
Complaint 1 Filing Date 6/7/2010
Complaint 1 Status Completed 06/15/2010
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012
Service Copy Of Request For Production Of Documents Forwarded To Doc Control For Court File
    Blank 12 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012
    Recvd Service Copy Of Request For Production Of Documents Inappeals. Forwarded To Court File
      Blank 11 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011
      Case Number Changed From Civ/as1008308
        Blank 10 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011
        File Received And Sent To Dc For File Back
          Blank 9 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010
          Update Jurisdiction To Ds.
            Blank 8 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010
            Order Mailed To All Parties
              Blank 7 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010
              Order On Petition For Writ Of Mandate / Prohibition - Petition Is Denied Filed
                Blank 6
                Minutes: Minutesstage At Disposition: Petition Denied Case Closed.
                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010
                  Request For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Filed By Jacquie A Figg Is Granted
                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010
                    Petition Faxed To Legal Research For Review
                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010
                      Request For Waiver Of Court Fees & Costs Filed By Jacquie A Figg.
                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010
                        Superior Court Case # Udfs 1000587
                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010
                          Petition Filed (civil)

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 1,821 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?