Re/Max International v. English, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00199-MSK-PAC
District Judge Marcia S. Krieger, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Remax International Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Lynn Dempsey +1 303 291 2600
v.
No Logo 1STOPHOMESHOP.NET LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by Moye White, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Laird +1 303 292 2900 +1 303 292 4510 david.laird@moyewhite.com
No Logo Anthony D. English, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by Moye White, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Laird +1 303 292 2900 +1 303 292 4510 david.laird@moyewhite.com
Office Denver
Filed 1/31/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Statistical Closing
County Arapahoe
Terminated 6/23/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Consent DecreeCourt Filing
Order and CONSENT DECREE by Judge Marcia S. Krieger granting motion for entry of consent judgment [14-1] dismissing case for Administrative purposes (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/24/03 (erv)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003, Terminated: 6/23/2003 ~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
    Revised Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff, defendants for entry of consent judgment (erv)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      COURTROOM MINUTES of Hrg on Motion for Final Jgm by Judge Marcia S. Krieger in court hrg held 6/2/03 on Motion for Final Jgm ; By 6/22/03, csl shall submit a revised proposed jgm or the ct will dismiss the case with prejudice ; entry : 6/3/03 Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman (erv)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER and Notice of Hrg on Law and Motin Calendar by Judge Marcia S. Krieger ; in court hrg set for 1:30 6/2/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/23/03 (erv)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Notice of Change of Address
          NOTICE of Change of address of Greennberg Traurig, LLP (erv)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Statement
            STATEMENT Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the FRCP by plaintiff Re/Max International (erv)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 ~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
              Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff, defendant for entry of Final judgment (erv)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Anthony D. English, defendant 1STOPHOMESHOP.NET by David A. Laird (erv)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                  ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan ; Rule 16 conference set for 8:30 5/22/03 (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER of Opportunity for Accelerated Service by Judge Marcia S. Krieger (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/24/03 (erv)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                      ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan by Judge Marcia S. Krieger (cc: to counsel) (erv)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Answer
                        ANSWER by defendant Anthony D. English to complaint [1-1] (erv)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                          RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant 1STOPHOMESHOP.NET on 2/6/03 by leaving with: Anthony English (erv)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                            RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Anthony D. English on 2/6/03 by leaving with: Anthony D. English (erv)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (gms)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                FILING FEE PAID: on 1/31/03 in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 241054. (gms)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?