Resurgence Financial v. Tony Nguyen
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo, Case No. CLJ455194

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Resurgence Financial, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Searles, Nathan A. +1 877 694 7500
v.
No Logo Tony Nguyen, Defendant
Complaint 1 0001 Com Complaint Of Resurgence Financial Llc
Complaint 1 Filing Date 5/24/2006
Complaint 1 Status Judgment 08/31/2006
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011
Notice Of Change Of Address Of Attorney Nathan A Searles Filed
    Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010
    Substitution Of Attorney Filed. Former Attorney Shannon Jacobson Removed As To Resurgence Financial, Llc And Replaced With Attorney Nathan A Searles.
      Blank 20 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009
      Writ Of Execution From San Mateo County Returned Un Satisfied.
        Blank 19 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009
        Writ Of Money From San Francisco County Returned Wholly Un Satisfied.
          Blank 18 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008
          Notice Of Change Of Address Of Attorney Shannon Jacobson Filed
            Blank 17 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
            --- Credits In The Amount Of $0.00.
              Blank 16 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
              Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Mateo County In The Amount Of $2,054.57
                Blank 15 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
                Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Resurgence Financial, Llc. Interest In The Amount Of $273.08, Costs In The Amount Of $60.00 ---
                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007
                  --- Credits In The Amount Of $0.00.
                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007
                    Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County In The Amount Of $1,876.49
                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007
                      Memorandum Of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment Of Credit & Declaration Of Accrued Interest Filed By Resurgence Financial, Llc. Interest In The Amount Of $140.00, Costs In The Amount Of $0.15 ---
                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006
                        Writ Of Execution For Money Issued To San Mateo County In The Amount Of $1,706.49
                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                          Declaration Pursuant To Ccp 1033(b) Filed By Resurgence Financial, Llc
                            Blank 9 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                            Judgment After Default By Clerk Entered On 08/31/06 As Follows:
                              Blank 8 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                              Proof Of Service By Mail Of Various Judgment Documents Served On Tony Nguyen Filed. Date Of Mailing 08/18/06.
                                Blank 7 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint Filed 05/24/2006 Of Resurgence Financial, Llc Without Prejudice Filed And Entered.
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                  Request For Default Filed And Default Entered On Complaint Filed 05/24/2006 Of Resurgence Financial, Llc As To Tony Nguyen.
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                    Default Entered As To Tony Nguyen
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                      Declaration In Lieu Of Testimony Filed By Resurgence Financial, Llc
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006
                                        Proof Of Service (sub-service) Of Summons And Complaint Filed 05/24/2006 Of Resurgence Financial, Llc As To Tony Nguyen, By Sub-serving Jane Doe, Co Occupant. Mailing Date Of 06/03/06.
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006
                                          30 Day Summons, Issued And Filed.
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006
                                            (l) Complaint Filed - Prayer Amount $10,000.00 Or Less.

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?