Armentero v. Pratt, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00784-EWN-BNB
District Judge Edward W. Nottingham, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Luis Lorenzo Armentero, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roxane J. Perruso +1 303 454 0127 +1 303 454 0404 Roxane.Perruso@usdoj.gov
No Logo Sam L. Pratt, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roxane J. Perruso +1 303 454 0127 +1 303 454 0404 Roxane.Perruso@usdoj.gov
Office Denver
Filed 5/1/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Arapahoe
Terminated 12/11/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Mail Returned
MAIL Returned order [21-2] addressed to petitioner Luis Lorenzo Armentero (pap)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Edward W. Nottingham accepting [20-1] - Magistrate's Recommendation, application is dismissed as moot, all pending motions (none) are denied as moot; dismissing case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/12/03 (pap)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Mail Returned
      MAIL Returned report and recommendation motion MAGISTRATE'S RECOMMENDATION that application be dismissed as moot [20-1] addressed to petitioner Luis Lorenzo Armentero (pap)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
        MAGISTRATE'S RECOMMENDATION that application be dismissed as moot by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland concerning ; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/23/03 (pap)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Mail Returned
          MAIL Returned order to show cause order [19-1] addressed to petitioner Luis Lorenzo Armentero (pap)
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland returnable 10/20/03 by Petitioner why the application should not be dismissed (cc: all counsel) (pap)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Mail Returned
              MAIL Returned minute order [18-1] addressed to petitioner Luis Lorenzo Armentero (pap)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland; applicant has to and including 9/29/03 to file a traverse; (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/10/03 (pap)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM by Judge Edward W. Nottingham referring [16-1] answer response to Magistrate Judge Boland (pap)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                    Return in RESPONSE by respondents to habeas corpus petition [3-1] ; order to show cause ddl satisfied (pap)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                      RETURN OF SERVICE by certified mail of Summons and Complaint upon US Attorney General on 5/19/03 by leaving with: WD Vedder (pap)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Mail Returned
                        MAIL Returned order to show cause order [9-1] addressed to petitioner Luis Lorenzo Armentero (pap)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Letter
                          LETTER to court from petitioner Luis Lorenzo Armentero re: referral order [12-1], re: executed service [11-1], re: executed service [10-1] (pap)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Mail Returned
                            MAIL Returned order [5-1] addressed to petitioner Luis Lorenzo Armentero (pap)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Letter
                              LETTER to court from petitioner Luis Lorenzo Armentero re: letter [8-1] (pap)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,mtnrec,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland (including dispositive motions) by Judge Edward W. Nottingham; mag rec or status report due on or before 11/12/03 (cc: to counsel) (pap)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE by certified mail of Summons and Complaint upon respondent INS received by Michael Comfort on 5/15/03 (pap)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Acknowledgment of Service
                                    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE by CO Attorney General signed on 5/15/03 signature illegible; (pap)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Judge Edward W. Nottingham returnable within 30 days by Respondents why the application for writ of habeas corpus should not be granted (cc: all counsel) (pap)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 LetterCourt Filing
                                        LETTER to pla from Clerk re: Case reassigned to Judge Edward W. Nottingham [0-0] (pap)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Statement
                                          Letter and Inmate Trust Fund Account STATEMENT by petitioner Luis Lorenzo Armentero re: order [5-1] (pap)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter directing assignment of case by random draw to a judge and a magistrate judge (bpm)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting Applicant's motion to proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 [1-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/9/03 (pap)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Statement
                                                STATEMENT by petitioner re: in ability to pay $5.00 filing fee with copy of account stmt. re: order [2-1] (gms)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                  APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by a person in federal custody (bpm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter directing clerk to commence civil action and directing applicant to cure deficiencies within 30 days. 28 USC 1915 motion and affidavit is missing certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement for the 6-month period immediately preceding this filing (account statement submitted is not certified by a prison official) regarding [1-1] motion to proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/1/03 (bpm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003, Terminated: 5/8/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                      MOTION by petitioner to proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (bpm)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?