Fortunee Massuda v. Panda Express, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 13-2818

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 11:11 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Posner. The motions to seal the settlement agreement in these two appeals are consolidated. The request in Goesel is DENIED; in Massuda it is DISMISSED. [6526611-2] [12] Richard A. Posner, Circuit Judge. [30] [6540828] [13-2434, 13-2818] (CD)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
    Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellant Fortunee Massuda. Paper copies due on 12/04/2013 Electronically Transmitted. [29] [6534301] [13-2818] (CO)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
      Submitted appellant reply brief by Robert S. Grabemann for Appellant Fortunee Massuda. [28] [6534286] [13-2818] (Grabemann, Robert)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
        Argument set for Wednesday, January 22, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 10 minutes. [27] [6533972] [13-2818] (AB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
          Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. for Appellees Andrew Cherng, Peggy Cherng, Citadel Panda Express Incorporated, Panda Express Incorporated and Panda Restaurant Group Incorporated. [26] [6532404] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [13-2818] (Miari, Tanya)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
            Filed Appendix by Appellees Andrew Cherng, Peggy Cherng, Citadel Panda Express Incorporated, Panda Express Incorporated and Panda Restaurant Group Incorporated. [25] [6530411] Paper copies due on 11/20/2013 [13-2818] (LJ)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
              Appellee's brief filed by Appellees Andrew Cherng, Peggy Cherng, Citadel Panda Express Incorporated, Panda Express Incorporated and Panda Restaurant Group Incorporated. Paper copies due on 11/20/2013 Electronically Transmitted. [24] [6530410] [13-2818] (LJ)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                Submitted appellee brief by Christopher D. Dusseault for Appellees Andrew Cherng, Peggy Cherng, Citadel Panda Express Incorporated, Panda Express Incorporated and Panda Restaurant Group Incorporated. [23] [6530363] [13-2818] (Dusseault, Christopher)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                  Filed Response by Appellees Andrew Cherng, Peggy Cherng, Citadel Panda Express Incorporated, Panda Express Incorporated and Panda Restaurant Group Incorporated Attorney Christopher D. Dusseault to October 28, 2013 Order Regarding Motion to Maintain Documents Under Seal. [22][6528483] [13-2818] (Dusseault, Christopher)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                    ORDER re: Motion to maintain documents under seal. Filed clerk's notice to parties to file a response. The parties are directed to explain why, given the extensive redaction of document 28, the redacted settlement agreement should remain under seal in this court. See In re Specht, 622 F.3d 697, 701 (7th Cir. 2010). BDM [21] [6526618] [13-2818] (AM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 169 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?