Padilla v. Maersk Line, Limited
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 12-834

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 10/10/2013 receipt, RETURNED.[1067164] [12-834]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
    CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 10/10/2013, to SDNY, ISSUED.[1062769] [12-834]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
      STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee John Padilla, FILED.[1062761] [12-834]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1053391] [12-834]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
          ORDER, petition for rehearing/ petition for rehearing en banc denied, FILED.[1046936] [12-834]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
            ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 06/25/2013, by BDP, FILED.[999426] [12-834]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
              JUDGMENT, FILED.[985783] [12-834]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Maersk Line, Limited, FILED. Service date 07/09/2013 by CM/ECF.[984736] [12-834]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                  ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 06/25/2013, by BDP, FILED.[979711] [12-834]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                    ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee John Padilla, FILED. Service date 06/26/2013 by CM/ECF.[975777] [12-834]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 36 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?