Wilhite et al v. Acell Investors Limited

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01421
District Judge Sidney A Fitzwater, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Sidney A Fitzwater
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 4:21 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Michael D Thompson, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael T Wilhite, Jr, Plaintiff

Represented by SCHEEF & STONE, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Kelly M Crawford +1 214 706 4200 +1 214 706 4242 kelly.crawford@solidcounsel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Charlene Cantrell Koonce +1 214 706 4200 +1 214 706 4242 charlene.koonce@solidcounsel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing C John Scheef, III +1 214 472 2114 + 214 706 4242 john.scheef@solidcounsel.com
No Logo Patrick J Thompson, Plaintiff
No Logo Stephen Jacobs, Plaintiff
No Logo Stephen Lasher, Plaintiff
No Logo The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo The Williamsburg Corp, Plaintiff
No Logo Acell Investors Limited, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Acell Investors Limited, Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Geoffrey Scott Harper +1 214 292 4004 harper@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing J Kristopher Long +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 klong@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Steven H Stodghill +1 214 292 4040 + 214 747 2091 stodghill@fr.com
No Logo Michael D Thompson, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Michael T Wilhite, Jr, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Patrick J Thompson, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Stephen Jacobs, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Stephen Lasher, Counter-Defendant
No Logo The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, Counter-Defendant
No Logo The Williamsburg Corp, Counter-Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 12 U.S.C. § 1819
Nature of Suit 150 - Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Timeline
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Plaintiffs'-Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
MOTION Plaintiffs' and Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
Second AMENDED ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Acell Investors Limited, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint against Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr filed by Acell Investors Limited (Harper, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Agreement to Extend Time for Defendant/Counterplaintiff to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 22 Plaintiffs-Counterdefendants' MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. No later than 28 days after the date this order is filed, Acell must file an amended answer and counterclaims (without a declaratory judgment counterclaim) that comply with Rules 8 and 9(b). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/22/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
REPLY filed by Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' and Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims (Koonce, Charlene) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Acell Investors Limited re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' and Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims (Harper, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant/CounterPlaintiff to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims by Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' and Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr (Koonce, Charlene) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2014. Discovery due by 4/14/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 10/25/2013. Motions due by 6/2/2014. Status Report due by 4/14/2014. The court will set the case for trial by separate order. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/29/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION (STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERDEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS) by Acell Investors Limited. (Harper, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Joint Report Regarding Scheduling Proposal) by Acell Investors Limited, Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. (Harper, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
(DEFENDANT ACELL INVESTORS LIMITED'S AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) AMENDED ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Acell Investors Limited, COUNTERCLAIM against Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr filed by Acell Investors Limited (Harper, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Scheduling Order Proposal due by 7/25/2013. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/25/2013) (chmb) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Acell Investors Limited. (Stodghill, Steven) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Acell Investors Limited. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Stodghill, Steven) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr re 13 Stipulation, Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond by Stephen Jacobs, Stephen Lasher, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
Summons Returned Executed as to Acell Investors Limited; served on on 04/25/2013. (Crawford, Kelly) Modified on 5/8/2013 (ykp). (Entered: 05/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Acell Investors Limited. (jrr) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action to Acell Investors Limited (Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint) filed by The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED DOCUMENT by The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. Amendment to 2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. Amended Certificate of Interested Persons. (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint against Acell Investors Limited filed by Michael T Wilhite, Jr, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-1, # 2 Exhibit(s) A-2, # 3 Exhibit(s) A-3, # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C-1, # 6 Exhibit(s) C-2, # 7 Exhibit(s) C-3, # 8 Exhibit(s) C-4, # 9 Exhibit(s) D, # 10 Exhibit(s) E-1, # 11 Exhibit(s) E-2, # 12 Exhibit(s) E-3, # 13 Exhibit(s) F-1, # 14 Exhibit(s) F-2, # 15 Exhibit(s) F-3, # 16 Exhibit(s) G, # 17 Exhibit(s) H, # 18 Exhibit(s) I) (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Plaintiffs' complaint, filed 4/9/2013 appears to predicate subject matter jurisdiction on diversity of citizenship, but it fails to allege properly the citizenship of plaintiff The Kenneth L. Schnitzer, Jr. 1989 Gift Trust (Gift Trust). Accordingly, no later than 21 days from the date this order is filed, plaintiffs must file an amended complaint that properly alleges the citizenship of each trustee of Gift Trust who is a real party in interest. If plaintiffs fail to do so, this action will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/18/2013) (ndt) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Acell Investors Limited. (ykp) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action to Acell Investors Limited filed by The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs The Kenneth L Schnitzer Jr 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp, Michael D Thompson, Patrick J Thompson, Michael T Wilhite, Jr. (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Fitzwater. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cea) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Kenneth L. Schnitzer, Jr. 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp., Michael D. Thompson, Patrick J. Thompson, Michael T. Wilhite, Jr. (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Acell Investors Limited filed by Michael T. Wilhite, Jr, Michael D. Thompson, Patrick J. Thompson, The Kenneth L. Schnitzer, Jr. 1989 Gift Trust, The Williamsburg Corp.. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-5232221) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-1, # 2 Exhibit(s) A-2, # 3 Exhibit(s) A-3, # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C-1, # 6 Exhibit(s) C-2, # 7 Exhibit(s) C-3, # 8 Exhibit(s) C-4, # 9 Exhibit(s) D, # 10 Exhibit(s) E-1, # 11 Exhibit(s) E-2, # 12 Exhibit(s) E-3, # 13 Exhibit(s) F-1, # 14 Exhibit(s) F-2, # 15 Exhibit(s) F-3, # 16 Exhibit(s) G, # 17 Exhibit(s) H, # 18 Exhibit(s) I) (Crawford, Kelly) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 308 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?