WILLIS v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02061
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 3:59 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo MICHAEL L WILLIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meringolo and Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Williams Rucker +1 301 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 ruck92@aol.com
v.
District of Columbia District of Columbia, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Sealed Memorandum Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/5/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/7/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/7/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/6/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Continue
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/24/2015, Entered: None Continue
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (2) ISSUED as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Notice of Consent, # 3 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3577277) filed by MICHAEL L WILLIS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Rucker, Donna) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?