Mayme Brown v. Mortgage Electronic, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 12-3494

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 11:10 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 3240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802330381 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the Originating Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion.. DIANA E. MURPHY, MICHAEL J. MELLOY and BOBBY E. SHEPHERD Hrg Sep 2013 [4110011] [12-3494] (SRD)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802330367 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
    OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Diana E. Murphy, Michael J. Melloy and Bobby E. Shepherd AUTHORING JUDGE:Bobby E. Shepherd (PUBLISHED) [4110005] [12-3494] (SRD)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802315863 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
      28(j) citation filed by Appellees Bank of America, Countrywide Home Loans and Wells Fargo w/service 12/05/2013 - FOR CAL [4103016] [12-3494] (JY)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802313594 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
        LETTER from Appellees MERSCORP and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems regarding Disassociation of A. Boese. w/service 12/03/2013 [4101898] [12-3494] (RMB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802312081 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
          28(j) citation filed by Appellees Bank of America, Countrywide Home Loans and Wells Fargo w/service 12/02/2013 - FOR CAL [4101204] [12-3494] (JY)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802312070 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
            28(j) citation filed by Appellees Bank of America, Countrywide Home Loans and Wells Fargo w/service 12/02/2013 - FOR CAL [4101199] [12-3494] (JY)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802258037 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
              ARGUMENT STATUS CHANGED - Argument to No Argument [12-3494] (KAS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802252863 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Thomas Hefferon for Countrywide Home Loans, Bank of America and Wells Fargo for argument in September, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. [4072899] [12-3494] (TH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802248921 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                  ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Joseph Russell Falasco for PHH Mortgage Corporation for argument in September, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. [4070975] [12-3494] (JRF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802137250 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                    BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF filed by Ms. Mayme Brown, w/service 03/21/2013, Length: 3,280 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Mayme Brown due 03/26/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs [4016805] [12-3494] (LAB)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802137090 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                      REPLY brief of Ms. Mayme Brown submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4016750] [12-3494] (LOS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802127287 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                        CLERK ORDER:Granting [4011971-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Luther Oneal Sutter. Reply brief of Mayme Brown due 03/20/2013 [4012104] [12-3494] (LAB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802127016 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                          MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 03/20/2013 at 06:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Luther Oneal Sutter for Appellant Ms. Mayme Brown w/service 03/06/2013. [4011971] [12-3494] (LOS)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802115651 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                            ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellees Bank of America, Bank of England, Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Citimortgage, Countrywide Home Loans, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, HSBC Mortgage Services, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, National City Bank, National City Mortgage and National City Corp., Novastar Mortgage, PHH Mortgage Corporation, PNC Financial Services Group and Wells Fargo. w/service 02/20/2013 [4006375] [12-3494] (LAB)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802115648 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                              BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Bank of America, Bank of England, Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Citimortgage, Countrywide Home Loans, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, HSBC Mortgage Services, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, National City Bank, National City Mortgage and National City Corp., Novastar Mortgage, PHH Mortgage Corporation, PNC Financial Services Group and Wells Fargo, w/service 02/20/2013 , Length: 11,516 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Bank of America, Bank of England, Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Citimortgage, Countrywide Home Loans, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, HSBC Mortgage Services, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, National City Bank, National City Mortgage and National City Corp., Novastar Mortgage, PHH Mortgage Corporation, PNC Financial Services Group and Wells Fargo due 02/25/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Reply brief of Mayme Brown due on 03/06/2013. [4006374] [12-3494] (LAB)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802115578 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                Addendum of APPELLEE submitted for review by Bank of America, Bank of England, Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Citimortgage, Countrywide Home Loans, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, HSBC Mortgage Services, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, National City Bank, National City Mortgage and National City Corp., Novastar Mortgage, PHH Mortgage Corporation, PNC Financial Services Group and Wells Fargo [4006347] [12-3494] (MF)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802115575 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                  APPELLEE brief of Bank of America, Bank of England, Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Citimortgage, Countrywide Home Loans, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, HSBC Mortgage Services, MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, National City Bank, National City Mortgage and National City Corp., Novastar Mortgage, PHH Mortgage Corporation, PNC Financial Services Group and Wells Fargo submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4006346] [12-3494] (MF)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802103748 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                    CLERK ORDER:Granting [4000406-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellees Mortgage Electronic, et al. Brief of Appellees Mortgage Electronic, et al due 02/19/2013. [4000458] [12-3494] (LAB)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802103637 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/19/2013, filed by Mr. Jack Walls Allen for Appellee Bank of England, Mr. Justin T. Allen for Appellees Countrywide Home Loans and Bank of America, Mr. Robert M. Brochin for Appellees Countrywide Home Loans, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, National City Bank, Bank of America, Novastar Mortgage, Wells Fargo, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Citimortgage, HSBC Mortgage Services, PHH Mortgage Corporation, MERSCORP, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, Bank of England, PNC Financial Services Group, National City Mortgage and National City Corp. and Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Mr. Brandon Bradshaw Cate for Appellee PHH Mortgage Corporation, Mr. Charles Turner Coleman for Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Mr. David Michael Donovan for Appellees Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems and MERSCORP, Mr. Joseph Russell Falasco for Appellee PHH Mortgage Corporation, Ms. Marisa Fortunati for Appellees Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems and MERSCORP, Mr. Thomas Hefferon for Appellees Countrywide Home Loans, Bank of America and Wells Fargo, Mr. Gregory J. Marshall for Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services, Mr. David S Mitchell, Jr. for Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, Mr. Philip Montgomery for Appellee Novastar Mortgage, Ms. Lucia Nale for Appellees Citimortgage and Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Mr. Thomas V Panoff for Appellees Citimortgage and Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Ms. Kathryn Bennett Perkins for Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services, Mr. David H. Pittinsky for Appellees National City Bank, PNC Financial Services Group and National City Mortgage and National City Corp., Mr. James M. Simpson for Appellees Citimortgage and Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Ms. Amy Lee Stewart for Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services, Mr. Geoffrey B. Treece for Appellee PHH Mortgage Corporation, Ms. Kimberly Wood Tucker for Appellees Countrywide Home Loans and Bank of America, Mr. David L. Williams for Appellees National City Bank, Wells Fargo, PNC Financial Services Group and National City Mortgage and National City Corp. and Mr. Joseph Yenouskas for Appellees Countrywide Home Loans, Bank of America and Wells Fargo w/service 01/31/2013. [4000406] [12-3494] (MF)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802083770 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                        ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Ms. Mayme Brown. w/service 01/04/2013 [3990832] [12-3494] (LAB)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802083766 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                          BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Mayme Brown. w/service 01/04/2013 , Length: 23 pages 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Mayme Brown due 01/09/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Bank of America, Bank of England, Citifinancial Mortgage Company, Citimortgage, Countrywide Home Loans, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, HSBC Mortgage Services, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, John Does 1-100, MERSCORP, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, National City Bank, National City Mortgage and National City Corp., Novastar Mortgage, PHH Mortgage Corporation, PNC Financial Services Group and Wells Fargo due on 02/04/2013 [3990829] [12-3494] (LAB)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802083658 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                            Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Ms. Mayme Brown [3990760] [12-3494] (LOS)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802083646 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                              APPELLANT brief of Ms. Mayme Brown submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [3990757] [12-3494] (LOS)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802081108 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                CLERK ORDER:Granting [3989369-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Luther Oneal Sutter. Brief of Mayme Brown due 01/14/2013. Appendix due on 01/14/2013. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. [3989575] [12-3494] (LAB)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802080748 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 01/14/2013 at 05:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Luther Oneal Sutter for Appellant Ms. Mayme Brown w/service 12/28/2012. [3989369] [12-3494] (LOS)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802072414 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                    CLERK ORDER:Granting [3985577-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Luther Oneal Sutter. Brief of Mayme Brown due 12/28/2012. Appendix due on 12/28/2012. [3985616] [12-3494] (LAB)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802072331 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 12/28/2012 at 06:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Luther Oneal Sutter for Appellant Ms. Mayme Brown w/service 12/17/2012. [3985577] [12-3494] (LOS)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802061713 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                        CLERK ORDER:Granting [3980514-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Luther Oneal Sutter. Brief of Mayme Brown due 12/17/2012. Appendix due on 12/17/2012. [3980557] [12-3494] (LAB)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802061661 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 12/17/2012 at 06:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Luther Oneal Sutter for Appellant Ms. Mayme Brown w/service 12/03/2012. [3980514] [12-3494] (LOS)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802053998 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                            CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. - FOR CAL. [3976827] [12-3494] (DSM)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802043137 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Ms. Mayme Brown. No Transcript as No Hearings Held [3971645] [12-3494] (LOS)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802043079 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services. - FOR CAL. [3971623] [12-3494] (KBP)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802038284 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee PHH Mortgage Corporation. - FOR CAL. [3969220] [12-3494] (BBC)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802038164 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Gregory J. Marshall for Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services w/service 10/30/2012 [3969169] [12-3494] (KBP)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802036935 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by Geoffrey B. Treece for Appellee PHH Mortgage Corporation w/service 10/29/2012 [3968590] [12-3494] (GBT)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802036920 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Joseph Russell Falasco for Appellee PHH Mortgage Corporation w/service 10/29/2012 [3968584] [12-3494] (JRF)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802036885 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Brandon B. Cate for Appellee PHH Mortgage Corporation w/service 10/29/2012 [3968571] [12-3494] (BBC)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802036778 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. PHH Mortgage as been added as an appellee. [3968519] [12-3494] (JMH)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802036458 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by David L. Williams for Appellees National City Bank, National City Mortgage and National City Corp. and PNC Financial Services Group w/service 10/26/2012 [3968369] [12-3494] (DLW)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802036070 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Kimberly Wood Tucker for Appellees Bank of America and Countrywide Home Loans w/service 10/26/2012 [3968201] [12-3494] (KWT)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802035959 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Kathryn Bennett Perkins for Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services w/service 10/26/2012 [3968162] [12-3494] (KBP)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802035440 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by David S. Mitchell, Jr. for Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank w/service 10/25/2012 [3967919] [12-3494] (DSM)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802035401 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by David L. Williams for Appellee PNC Financial Services Group w/service 10/25/2012 [3967902] [12-3494] (DLW)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802035398 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by David L. Williams for Appellee Wells Fargo w/service 10/25/2012 [3967901] [12-3494] (DLW)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802035378 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. - FOR CAL. [3967887] [12-3494] (CTC)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802035359 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Charles T. Coleman for Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company w/service 10/25/2012 [3967876] [12-3494] (CTC)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802034460 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees National City Bank, National City Mortgage and National City Corp. and PNC Financial Services Group. - FOR CAL. [3967454] [12-3494] (DHP)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802034285 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees MERSCORP and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems. - FOR CAL. [3967368] [12-3494] (MF)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802034279 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by David M. Donovan for Appellees MERSCORP and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems w/service 10/24/2012 [3967366] [12-3494] (DMD)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802034131 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Robert M. Brochin for Appellees MERSCORP and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems w/service 10/24/2012 [3967305] [12-3494] (RMB)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802034118 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by Marisa Fortunati for Appellees MERSCORP and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems w/service 10/24/2012 [3967300] [12-3494] (MF)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802034114 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Novastar Mortgage. - FOR CAL. [3967299] [12-3494] (PM)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802034095 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Philip B. Montgomery for Appellee Novastar Mortgage w/service 10/24/2012 [3967292] [12-3494] (PM)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802033972 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Citifinancial Mortgage Company and Citimortgage. - FOR CAL. [3967232] [12-3494] (TVP)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802033558 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Bank of America, Countrywide Home Loans and Wells Fargo. - FOR CAL. [3967048] [12-3494] (TH)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802033478 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by David H. Pittinsky for Appellees National City Bank, National City Mortgage and National City Corp. and PNC Financial Services Group w/service 10/24/2012 [3967009] [12-3494] (DHP)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802033472 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Thomas V. Panoff for Appellees Citifinancial Mortgage Company and Citimortgage w/service 10/24/2012 [3967006] [12-3494] (TVP)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802033438 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Lucia Nale for Appellees Citifinancial Mortgage Company and Citimortgage w/service 10/24/2012 [3966986] [12-3494] (LN)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802032769 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by Joseph F. Yenouskas for Appellees Bank of America, Countrywide Home Loans and Wells Fargo w/service 10/23/2012 [3966661] [12-3494] (JY)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802032757 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Thomas M. Hefferon for Appellees Bank of America, Countrywide Home Loans and Wells Fargo w/service 10/23/2012 [3966652] [12-3494] (TH)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802031806 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 12/03/2012. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Mayme Brown due 12/03/2012. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [3966187] [12-3494] (JMH)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802031799 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 10/16/12, Orders filed 2/14/12, 7/26/12, 9/17/12, 9/2612 & docket entries, [3966182] [12-3494] (JMH)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802031793 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Civil case docketed. [3966178] [12-3494] (JMH)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?