Brown v. Guzetti
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC06-02088

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Venus Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
v.
No Logo Dana M Hooser-guzetti, Defendant
No Logo Case Evaluator, Mediator/evaluator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Starr,., John M. +1 925 685 9000
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 10/23/2006
Complaint 1 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 01/30/2008
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 59
Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
    Blank 58 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
    Request Filed And Dismissal Entered Without Prejudice As To Entire Action
      Blank 57
      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
        Blank 56 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
        Response To Courts Order To Show Cause Re Request For Dismissal Filed By Venus Brown
          Blank 55 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
          Hearing On Osc Re: Failure To File Dismissal Was Set For 2/06/08 At 8:30 In Dept. 07
            Blank 54
            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
              Blank 53 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007
              Conditional Settlement/dismissal Filed
                Blank 52 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007
                Clerks Tickler For Dismissal Was Set For 12/27/07 At 7:00 On 30
                  Blank 51 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007
                  Return To Court Control
                    Blank 50 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007
                    Civil Sad Before Trial - Req. Dism. - No Adr
                      Blank 49 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007
                      Case Dispositioned - Settled Conditional Settlement
                        Blank 48 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007
                        Stipulation Between The Parties Regarding Settlement Filed Filed
                          Blank 47
                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                            Blank 46 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007
                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Venus Brown
                              Blank 45
                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                Blank 44 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007
                                Order Granting Leave To Amend Complaint Filed 10/23/2006 Of Venus Brown Within 10 Days Filed
                                  Blank 43 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007
                                  Order After Hg. On Mtn For Leave To File 1st Amend Sent To The Clerks Office For Filing
                                    Blank 42
                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                      Blank 41 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007
                                      Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Notice Of Motion; Motion For Leave Of Court To File First Amended Complaint
                                        Blank 40 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007
                                        Clerk`s Certificate Of Mailing Of Notice Of Further Case Management Conf Sent To All Parties
                                          Blank 39
                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                            Blank 38
                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                              Blank 37 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
                                              Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Substitution Of Attorney
                                                Blank 36 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
                                                Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Case Management Statement
                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
                                                  Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Notice Of Motion; Motion For Leave Of Court To File First Amended Complaint
                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007
                                                    Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Not Of Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint
                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                      Hearing On Motion Was Set For 7/12/07 At 8:30 In Dept. 30
                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                        Motion To/for Leave To File First Amended Complaint Filed By Venus Brown
                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Venus Brown
                                                            Blank 30
                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                              Order Filed On Waiver Of Fees As To Venus Brown Is Granted
                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                                Substitution Of Attorney Filed. Pro/per Substitutes Out As Attorney For Venus Brown And Is Replaced By Martin T. Gonsalves
                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                                  Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Filed By Venus Brown
                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007
                                                                    Notice Of Date, Time & Place Of Neutral Case Evaluation Filed/received. Hearing Set For 04/17/07 At 10:00 Filed/received 04/17/07.
                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
                                                                      Notice Of Assignment Of Neutral Case Evaluator
                                                                        Blank 24
                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
                                                                          Case Evaluator Added As A Party
                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                                            Parties Granted Permission To Go With Neutral Case Eval. Instead Of Mediation.
                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                              Return From Neutral Case Evaluation Set For 6/11/07
                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                Return From Mediation Set For 6/11/07
                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                  Notice Of/to Change Of Address Filed On Behalf Of Dana M Hooser-guzetti
                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                    Updated Case To Change Pro Per Updated Of Party Dana M Hooser-guzetti
                                                                                      Blank 17
                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007
                                                                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Venus Brown
                                                                                          Blank 15
                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                                                                                            Copies
                                                                                              Blank 13
                                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006
                                                                                                (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 10/23/2006 Of Venus Brown Filed By Dana M Hooser-guzetti
                                                                                                  Blank 11
                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
                                                                                                    Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 10/23/2006 Of Venus Brown As To Dana M Hooser-guzetti With Service Date Of 11/08/06
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                      Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 30
                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Was Set For 3/12/07 At 8:30 In Dept. 30
                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                          Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 12/27/06 At 7:00 In Dept. 30
                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                            Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                              Case Entry Complete
                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                                Original Summons On Complaint Filed 10/23/2006 Of Venus Brown Filed
                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                                  Color Of File Is Yellow
                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                                    Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Filed By Venus Brown
                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                                      Order Filed On Waiver Of Fees As To Venus Brown Is Granted

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?