Karoutas v. Bryant
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC07-00283

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo George Karoutas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
v.
No Logo Eva Black, Defendant
No Logo Julia Bryant, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Ray Johnson +1 225 356 3408 +1 225 356 4438 ronaldjohnson@bellsouth.net
No Logo New Life Style Mortgage, Defendant
No Logo R J Equity Solutions, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chen, Sean T. +1 925 932 7722
No Logo Richard Barekzia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chen, Sean T. +1 925 932 7722
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 2/9/2007
Complaint 1 Status Active
Complaint 2 Type Cross Complaint
Complaint 2 Filing Date 5/8/2007
Complaint 2 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 09/15/2008
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 81 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
Dismissal Filed/entered On The Cross-complaint Of Julia Bryant
    Blank 80
    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
      Blank 79 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
        Blank 78 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
        Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: F/e Copies Of Decl Of George Karoutas; Rqst For Ct Judgment; Judgmentl Ntc Of Stlmnt & Rqst For Dism
          Blank 77 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
          Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
            Blank 76
            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
              Blank 75
              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                Blank 74 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
                Judgment Filed/entered-before Trial On 09/05/08
                  Blank 73 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
                  Notice Of/to Settlement; Conditional Dismissal And Order Filed On Behalf Of George Karoutas
                    Blank 72
                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                      Blank 71 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
                      To 103-ntc Of Settlement And Judgment
                        Blank 70 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
                        Request Filed & Dismissal Entered Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas As To Defendant Julia Bryant With Prejudice
                          Blank 69 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
                          Request For Clerk/court Judgment Filed
                            Blank 68 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
                            Declaration Of George Karoutas Filed Re: In Support Of Money Judgment Upon Default Of Settlement Terms
                              Blank 67 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
                              Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Req For Ct Judgment/judgment/dec Of Karoutas See List 08/27/08
                                Blank 66 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
                                Request Filed & Dismissal Entered Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas As To Defendant Eva Black Without Prejudice
                                  Blank 65
                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                    Blank 64
                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                      Blank 63 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007
                                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By George Karoutas
                                        Blank 62
                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                          Blank 61
                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                            Blank 60
                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                              Blank 59 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007
                                              Declaration Of Gregory S. Redmond Filed Re: Order To Show Cause
                                                Blank 58 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007
                                                Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Attys Mot To Be Relieved Filed
                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007
                                                  Order Granting Attys Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Filed
                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007
                                                    Gregory S Redmond Changes Attorney For Eva Black And Is Replaced By Pro/per
                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007
                                                      Updated Case To Change Address Of Party Eva Black
                                                        Blank 54
                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                          Blank 53
                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007
                                                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Julia Bryant
                                                              Blank 51
                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                Blank 50
                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                  Blank 49
                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007
                                                                    Declaration Of Redmond Filed Re: In Support Of Attys Mtn To Be Relieve As Csl
                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007
                                                                      Hearing On Motion Was Set For 8/10/07 At 15:30 In Dept. 60
                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007
                                                                        Motion To/for Relieve As Csl Filed By Eva Black
                                                                          Blank 45
                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007
                                                                            Stipulation & Order Set Aside Default Of R/j Equity Solutions Inc Filed
                                                                              Blank 43
                                                                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007
                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Richard Barekzia, R J Equity Solutions, Inc
                                                                                  Blank 41
                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007
                                                                                    Stip & Order Setting Aside Default Sent To Rm 103 For Filing
                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007
                                                                                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By George Karoutas
                                                                                        Blank 38
                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
                                                                                          Notice Of Unavailability Of Attorney Martin T. Gonsalves For George Karoutas For Period 6-27-07 Thru 7-6-07 Filed
                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007
                                                                                            (u.j.) Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 05/08/2007 Of Julia Bryant Filed By George Karoutas
                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007
                                                                                              Default Set Aside On Richard Barekzia, R J Equity Solutions, Inc
                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007
                                                                                                (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Filed By Richard Barekzia, R J Equity Solutions, Inc
                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007
                                                                                                  (u.j.) First Appearance Fee Paid By Richard Barekzia, R J Equity Solutions, Inc
                                                                                                    Blank 32
                                                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                      Stipulation & Order Setting Aside Default Of Richard Barekzia Filed
                                                                                                        Blank 30
                                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                          No Summons Or Prf Of Service For Cross Compl Of Bryant
                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                            (u.j.) Cross-complaint Filed By Julia Bryant
                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                              (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Filed By Julia Bryant
                                                                                                                Blank 26
                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007
                                                                                                                  Stip & Ord Setting Aside Default Sent To Rm 103 Fo R Filing
                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007
                                                                                                                    (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Filed By Eva Black
                                                                                                                      Blank 23
                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007
                                                                                                                        Request To Enter Default On Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Filed As To New Life Style Mortgage
                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007
                                                                                                                          Default Entered On The Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Against Defendant New Life Style Mortgage By Clerk As Requested
                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007
                                                                                                                            Request To Enter Default On Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Filed As To R J Equity Solutions, Inc
                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007
                                                                                                                              Default Entered On The Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Against Defendant R J Equity Solutions, Inc By Clerk As Requested
                                                                                                                                Blank 18
                                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
                                                                                                                                  Default Entered On The Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Against Defendant Richard Barekzia By Clerk As Requested
                                                                                                                                    Blank 16
                                                                                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
                                                                                                                                      Request To Enter Default On Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Filed As To Richard Barekzia
                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                                                                                                                        Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Request For Entry Of Default Was Set For 5/14/07 At 7:00 In Dept. 09
                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas As To Julia Bryant With Service Date Of 02/26/07
                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas As To Eva Black With Service Date Of 02/26/07
                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas As To New Life Style Mortgage With Service Date Of 02/26/07
                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas As To R J Equity Solutions, Inc With Service Date Of 02/23/07
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas As To Richard Barekzia With Service Date Of 02/23/07
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                    Case Entry Complete
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                      Original Summons On Complaint Filed 02/09/2007 Of George Karoutas Filed
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                        Color Of File Is Green
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                          Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 4/25/07 At 7:00 In Dept. 09
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                            Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 09
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Conference Was Set For 6/29/07 At 8:30 In Dept. 09
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1
                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?