Ortega v. Birds Landing
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC07-00966

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Donald Ortega, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
v.
No Logo Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Marc Zamczyk +1 415 362 6000 +1 415 834 9070 bzamczyk@hinshawlaw.com
No Logo Stephen Stifford, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Marc Zamczyk +1 415 362 6000 +1 415 834 9070 bzamczyk@hinshawlaw.com
No Logo Donald Ortega, Plaintiff-minor

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonsalves, Martin T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin T Gonsalves +1 925 757 8300
No Logo Michael Ortega, Plaintiff-minor

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Esterkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan E Gertler +1 415 381 5599 +1 415 381 5572 jon@chavezgertler.com
Complaint 1 Type Complaint
Complaint 1 Filing Date 5/8/2007
Complaint 1 Status Dismiss W/o Prej. 03/19/2009
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 110 Filed: 12/18/2010, Entered: 12/18/2010
Jury Fees Forfeited By (depositor): Jonathan E Gertler
    Blank 109 Filed: 12/18/2010, Entered: 12/18/2010
    Jury Fees Forfeited Pursuant To Ccp 631.3
      Blank 108
      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
        Blank 107
        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
          Blank 106
          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
            Blank 105 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009
            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
              Blank 104 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009
              Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Donald Ortega
                Blank 103 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009
                Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudiceas To Entire Action
                  Blank 102
                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                    Blank 101
                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                      Blank 100 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009
                      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
                        Blank 99 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009
                        Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Donald Ortega
                          Blank 98 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009
                          Notice Of Entry Of Order (entered And Conformed On 01/23/09) Filed
                            Blank 97 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009
                            Order Approving Compromise Of Minor`s Claim Filed
                              Blank 96
                              Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                Blank 95 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009
                                Minor`s Compromise Hearing Was Set For 1/23/09 At 8:30 Updated To 8:31 In Dept. 16
                                  Blank 94
                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                    Blank 93 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009
                                    Notice Of/to Order Setting Hrg On Petn For Order Filed On Behalf Of Michael Ortega
                                      Blank 92 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009
                                      Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Ntc Of Order Setting Hrg On Petn; Petn To Apprv Compromise Of Pending Action Of Minor; Decl; Svd To:
                                        Blank 91 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009
                                        Declaration Of Jonathan E. Gertler Filed Re: In Support Of Petition For Approval Of Compromise Of Minors Claim
                                          Blank 90 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009
                                          Order Setting Hearing On Petn For Order Approving Compro Ise Of Pending Action Of Minor
                                            Blank 89 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009
                                            Minor`s Compromise Hearing Was Set For 1/23/09 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                              Blank 88 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009
                                              Petition To Compromise Minor`s Claim Filed By Michael Ortega
                                                Blank 87
                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                  Blank 86
                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/2/2008
                                                    Special Set Hearing Was Set For 12/19/08 At 13:30 In Dept. 16
                                                      Blank 84
                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: 10/8/2008
                                                        Notice Of/to Order Continuing Trial Date Filed On Behalf Of Michael Ortega
                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008
                                                          Order Upon Ex Parte Application By Stipulation For Order Continuing Trial Date Filed
                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008
                                                            Proof Of Service By Fax Of See List Of Documents On See Service List Filed; Served On 10/06/08
                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008
                                                              Declaration Of Joseph R. Igelmund Filed Re: In Support Of Ex Parte App By Stipulation For Order Continuing Trial
                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008
                                                                Declaration Of Jonathan E. Gertler Filed Re: In Support Of Ex Parte App By Stipulation For Order Continuing Trial
                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008
                                                                  Ex-parte Application By Stipulation For Order Continuing Trial Date Filed By Michael Ortega
                                                                    Blank 77
                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: 10/3/2008
                                                                      Stipulation For Order Continuing Trial Date (no Order) Filed
                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008
                                                                        Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Settlement Statement Srvd On: See Svs List On: 09/19/08
                                                                          Blank 74
                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008
                                                                            Opposition To Mil # 1 To Xclud Evidence Of Moving Of Safe Filed By Defts Birds Landing & S Sifford.
                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008
                                                                              Pltf Michael Ortegas Oppos To Defts Mot In Limine Nos 1-6
                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                Received Defendants Juror Questionnaire
                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                  Settlement Conference Statement Received From Attorney For Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc, Stephen Stifford
                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                    Issue Conference Statement Filed By Attorney For Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc, Stephen Stifford
                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                      Plaintiff D. Ortegas Oppo To Defs Mtn In Lim No. 5
                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                        Plaintiff D. Ortegas Oppo To Defs Mtn In Lim No. 4 Re: Other Sales & Deliveries Filed
                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                          Issue Conference Statement Filed By Attorney For Donald Ortega
                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                            Issue Conference Statement Filed By Attorney For Michael Ortega
                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                              Received Settlement Statement Of Plaintiff Michael Ortega
                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Motions In Limine #1-6 Srvd On: See Srvs List On: 09/15/08
                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                  Motion In Limine Filed By Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc, Stephen Stifford Re: Mil#6. To Exclude Testimony From Retained Expert R Oger Mann, M.d.
                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                    Motion In Limine Filed By Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc, Stephen Stifford Re: Mil#4. Re: Other Sales And Deliveries
                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                      Motion In Limine Filed By Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc, Stephen Stifford Re: Mil#5. Re: Review Of The Circumstances Of The Deli Very
                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                        Motion In Limine Filed By Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc, Stephen Stifford Re: Mil#3. To Exclude Expert Testimony Based On Undis Closed Opinions And /or Testimony
                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                          Motion In Limine Filed By Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc, Stephen Stifford Re: Mil#2 To Exclude Evidence Not Disclosed In Discove Ry
                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                            Motion In Limine Filed By Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc, Stephen Stifford Re: Mil#1 Re: Subsequent Remedial Measures
                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                              Defs Index To Motions In Limine Filed: Birds Landing Hunting Pres &stephen Sifford
                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                                Motion In Limine Filed By Donald Ortega Re: No 2 To Exclude Evidence Of The Financial Conditio
                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                                  Motion In Limine Filed By Donald Ortega Re: To Exclude Evidence Of Sub Moving Of Safe (no 1)
                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                                                                                                                    Jury Fees Posted By Chavez & Gertler Llp On Behalf Of Michael Ortega
                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                                                                                                                      Receipt For Jury Fees Posted
                                                                                                                        Blank 51
                                                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008
                                                                                                                          Substitution Of Attorney Filed. Martin T. Gonsalves Substitutes Out As Attorney For Michael Ortega And Is Replaced By Jonathan E. Gertler
                                                                                                                            Blank 49
                                                                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008
                                                                                                                              Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Donald Ortega
                                                                                                                                Blank 47
                                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008
                                                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc
                                                                                                                                    Blank 45
                                                                                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                      Blank 44
                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                                                                                                                                        Order After 02/15/08 Hearing Re: Donald Ortega, Gal, Is Rescinded, Lara Heisler, Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem Filed
                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                                                                                                                                          Complaint Filed 05/08/2007 Of Donald Ortega As To Plaintiff Michael Ortega, Laraheisler Added As An Individual
                                                                                                                                            Blank 41
                                                                                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Order On Plaintiffs Exparte App To Accelerate, Mailed On 01/31/08, To See List
                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Order On Plaintiffs Exparte App To Accelerate, Etal, Mailed On 01/30/08, To See List
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service By Fax Filed Re: Ex Parte Appl To Accelerate Hrg Dt, Decl On 013008 See Svc List
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                    Decl
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                      Order On Ex Parte Appl To Accelerate Hrg On Pltfs Mtn F R Ct Approval To 2-15-08
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                        Ex-parte Application Accelerate Hrg Dt On Ptn For Ct Approval Filed By Donald Ortega
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34
                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of/to Motion For Court Approval And/or Instructions Filed On Behalf Of Donald Ortega
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                              Hearing On Motion Was Set For 2/29/08 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                Motion To/for Court Approval And/or Instructions Filed By Donald Ortega
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30
                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Donald Ortega Filed Re: In Support Of Petition
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Jonathan Gertler Filed Re: In Support Of Petition
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Michael Ortega Filed Re: In Support Of Petition
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26
                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25
                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                              (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 05/08/2007 Of Donald Ortega Filed By Stephen Stifford
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23
                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Donald Ortega, Michael Ortega
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Filed 05/08/2007 Of Donald Ortega Filed To Name Stephen Stifford As Doe 1
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Ntc/ntc Of Cmc/appl And Ord For Appt Of Gdn Ad Lit Birds Landing Hunting Preserve, Inc. 072007
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Substituted Service Of Complaint Filed 05/08/2007 Of Donald Ortega Re: Business Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc W/mailing On 07/20/07 Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                (u.j.) Answer To Complaint Filed 05/08/2007 Of Donald Ortega Filed By Birds Landing Hunting Prserve Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Complaint Filed 05/08/2007 Of Donald Ortega As To Plaintiff Michael Ortega, Donald Ortega Added As An Individual
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Petition/declaration To Appoint A Guardian Ad Litem For Michael Ortega Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Appointing Donald Ortega Guardian Ad Litem For Minor Michael Ortega Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                          On The Complaint Filed 05/08/2007 Of Donald Ortega, Donald Ortega Is Removed As A Plaintiff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Michael Ortega Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Entry Complete
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Original Summons On Complaint Filed 05/08/2007 Of Donald Ortega Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Color Of File Is Yellow
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minutes: You Are Not Authorized To View Minutes Prior To 12/31/2099
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Conference Was Set For 9/25/07 At 8:30 In Dept. 16
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 7/12/07 At 7:00 In Dept. 16

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?