Mohammad Talaie v. Wells Fargo Bank
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-56314

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 3:36 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4371 - Truth in Lending
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
Filed clerk order: The reply brief [17] submitted by Mohammad Ali Talaie is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9008066] (WP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The appellant’s motion for leave to file a late reply brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the previously submitted reply brief. [9007243] (RT)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
      Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review and filed Motion to file a late brief. Submitted by Appellants Mohammad Ali Talaie and Rosa W. Talaie. Date of service: 03/05/2014. [9004076] (LA)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
        Filed clerk order: The answering brief [12] submitted by US Bank and Wells Fargo Bank, NA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [12] submitted by US Bank and Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8969134] (WP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellees US Bank and Wells Fargo Bank, NA Correspondence: Addendum of Primary Authorities. Date of service: 02/05/2014 [8968014] (KSA)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
            Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellees US Bank and Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Date of service: 02/05/2014. [8968010] (KSA)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
              Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): On October 16, 2013, a telephone conference was held with Circuit Mediator Lisa Jaye. The court has determined that this appeal will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the undersigned should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [8825361] (AF)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): On October 4, 2013, a telephone conference was held with Circuit Mediator Lisa Jaye. The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on October 16, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. Counsel are requested to contact the undersigned should circumstances develop that warrant further discussions prior to the next scheduled conference. [8812938] (AF)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                  Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): On September 18, 2013, a telephone conference was held with Circuit Mediator Lisa Jaye. The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on October 4, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. Counsel are requested to contact the undersigned should circumstances develop that warrant further discussions prior to the next scheduled conference. [8791409] (AF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                    Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a telephone settlement assessment conference, with counsel only, on September 18, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time to discuss whether this case is appropriate for participation in the Mediation Program. The Circuit Mediator will initiate the conference call by contacting each person on the attached list of participants at the telephone number listed. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [8757406] (AF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                      Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel for all parties to this appeal are requested to inform Circuit Mediator Ann Julius of their clients’ views on whether: (1) the case is appropriate for settlement discussions or mediation; (2) the court can accommodate ongoing settlement discussions or otherwise facilitate settlement of the dispute; and/or (3) the court should schedule a telephonic conference to discuss settlement. This communication may be sent in letter form by e-mail (ann_julius@ca9.uscourts.gov) or fax (415/355-8566). It will be kept confidential from the other parties, if requested. This communication shall not be served on the opposing party and shall not be filed with the court. For more detailed information Mediation Program and its procedures generally, please see Mediation Program web site: www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect pending the determination whether the case will be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [8737878] (AF)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Mohammad Ali Talaie and Rosa W. Talaie Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/05/2013. [8731735] (LA)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                          DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/05/2013. Transcript ordered by 08/28/2013. Transcript due 11/26/2013. Appellants Mohammad Ali Talaie and Rosa W. Talaie opening brief due 01/06/2014. Appellees US Bank and Wells Fargo Bank N.A. answering brief due 02/05/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8720967] (FB)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 45 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?