Dudek v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-10178
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 2:37 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carol Dudek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian Barry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James I. Meyerson +1 212 513 1006 jimeyerson@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Bruce Smolka, Defendant
No Logo Captain "Joe" Tracey, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
TERMINATED: 06/16/2010 Jeffrey Charles Brooks +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 0376 jbrooks@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Jay Alan Kranis +1 212 788 8683 +1 212 788 9776 jkranis@law.nyc.gov
Space Raju Sundaran +1 212 788 0467 +1 212 788 9776 rsundara@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jed Matthew Weiss +1 212 908 1210 +1 866 832 7206 jmweiss@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rutherford & Christie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald Stephen Smith, Jr. +1 212 599 5799 +1 212 599 5162 gss@rutherfordchristie.com
No Logo Gerald Dieckmann, Defendant
No Logo James Essig, Defendant
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo John J. Colgan, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Esposito, Defendant
No Logo Lieutenant "Joe" Franzo, Defendant
No Logo N. Perez, Defendant
No Logo NYC P.O. Quimby, Defendant
No Logo NYC P.O. Sergeant Fackler, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Sally Rowes, Defendant
No Logo Terrence Monahan, Defendant
No Logo Thomas, Graham, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (185) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: (Docket in all Related cases): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all motions for reconsideration pending in the Consolidated RNC Cases are dismissed without prejudice, subject to renewal at any party's request. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court by September 9, 2013 advising it of the status of any efforts to resolve these actions without further litigation. In light of this Order, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the following motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/09/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ama) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/4/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/4/2013 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/11/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 177 MOTION for Reconsideration.. Document filed by City of New York. (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 182 MOTION for Reconsideration.. Document filed by City of New York. (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S SEPTEMBER 30, 2012 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE PLAINTIFFS' NO-SUMMONS POLICY CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 54(B) AS TO THAT CLAIM. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that upon the accompanying Memorandum of Law dated November 14, 2012, and upon all prior proceedings and submissions to date, the MacNamara, Portera, and Retchshaffer Plaintiffs will move the Court before the Honorable Richard J. Sullivan, at the United States Courthouse for the Southern District of New York, located at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, on a date and time to be determined by the Court, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.3 of the United States District Courts of the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York for an order reconsidering the portion of the Court's September 30, 2012 Opinion and Order granting the defendants' motion for summary judgment on the plaintiffs' No-Summons Policy claim and, upon reconsideration, modifying the September 30 Opinion and Order; or in the alternative, for the Court to direct entry of final judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) as to the plaintiffs' No-Summons Policy claim if it decides not to grant reconsideration; and for such other relief as the Court deems appropriate. Pursuant to Local Rule 6.3(b), any answering memoranda shall be served within fourteen days after service of the moving papers. (Pertains to Motion Doc. No. 516 for Reconsideration of Doc. No. 507 in Case No. 04cv9216). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Entry made pursuant to Order Doc. No. 636 in Case No. 04cv7922. (rjm) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Raju Sundaran dated 11/16/12 re: Counsel writes on behalf of the parties to propose the following schedule concerning the motions for reconsideration: oppositions due on Wednesday, December 12, 2012; and Replies due on Friday, December 21, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Responses due by 12/12/2012. Replies due by 12/21/2012.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Entry made pursuant to Order Doc. No. 636 in Case No. 04cv7922. (rjm). (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants shall respond to Mr. Meyerson's letter proposing that the Court set trials for his clients' cases by December 12, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties in Dudek v. City of New York, et al., No. 04 Civ. 10178 (RJS), Bell v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 3705 (RJS), Starin v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5152 (RJS), Lahn Sheen Lee v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5528 (RJS), and Cohen v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 6780 (RJS) shall appear for a pretrial conference on Friday, January 4, 2013 at 4:15 p.m. Mr. Meyerson also requests that the Court make specific findings concerning the circumstances of Plaintiffs Carol Dudek, Julia Cohen and Jennifer Lahn Sheen Lee. the Court denied the parties' summary judgment cross-motions as further set forth in this order. Thus, Mr. Meyerson's requests are HEREBY DENIED. Finally, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to docket the motion for reconsideration submitted in case No. 04 Civ. 9216 (RJS) in the following cases: Dudek v. City of New York, et al., No. 04 Civ. 10178, Bell v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 3705, Starin v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5152, Lahn Sheen Lee v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5528, Meehan, et al., v. Stanich, et al., No. 05 Civ. 5268, Cohen v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 6780, Pagoda v. Caban, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7546, Coburn, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7623, Phillips, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7624, Sloan, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7688, Galitzer v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7699, Bastidas, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7670, Xu, et al., v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7672, Sikelianos v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7673, Drescher v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 7541, Abdell v. City of New York, No. 05 Civ. 8453, Concepcion v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 8501, Eastwood v. City of New York, No. 05 Civ. 9483, Adams v. City of New York, No. 05 Civ. 9484, Araneda v. City of New York, No. 05 Civ. 9738, Tikkun v. City of New York, et al., No. 05 Civ. 9901, Kennedy v. City of New York, No. 07 Civ. 7678, Manders, et al. v. City of New York, et al., No. 07 Civ. 7752, Jusick, et al. v. City of New York, et al., No. 07 Civ. 7683, and Rigby v. City of New York, et al., No. 07 Civ. 7751. In addition, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to docket the scheduling order issued in the above-captioned action as Doc. No. 635 in all related RNC actions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/4/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 177 MOTION for Reconsideration.. Document filed by City of New York. (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 177 MOTION for Reconsideration.. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey.(Beck, Curt) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from 173 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curt Peter Beck on behalf of City of New York (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: To avoid the need to issue separate extensions in the many consolidated actions, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties in all related RNC cases shall have until November 7, 2012 to submit motions for reconsideration. ( Motions due by 11/7/2012.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above,Defendants motions for summary judgment with respect to the false arrest claims at Fulton Street are HEREBY DENIED, and Plaintiffs motions for summary judgmentwith respect to the false arrest claims at Fulton Street are GRANTED. With respect to the false arrest claims at East 16th Street, Defendants and Plaintiffs cross-motions for summary judgment are DENIED. Defendants motions for summary judgment with respect to the constitutionality of the No-Summons and Fingerprinting Policies are GRANTED. Plaintiffs motions for summary judgment with respect to their state law fingerprinting claims are GRANTED, and Defendants motions are DENIED. Plaintiffs motion to strike is DENIED. re: (107 in 1:05-cv-05152-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Elizabeth Starin, (214 in 1:05-cv-01563-RJS-JCF, 81 in 1:05-cv-07575-RJS-JCF, 88 in 1:05-cv-07548-RJS-JCF, 80 in 1:05-cv-07536-RJS-JCF, 267 in 1:04-cv-07921-RJS-JCF, 129 in 1:05-cv-09930-RJS -JCF, 180 in 1:05-cv-07624-RJS-JCF, 193 in 1:05-cv-07623-RJS-JCF, 202 in 1:05-cv-01571-RJS-JCF, 85 in 1:05-cv-01574-RJS-JCF, 146 in 1:05-cv-07672-RJS-JCF, 176 in 1:05-cv-09484-RJS-JCF, 57 in 1:07-cv-07741-RJS-JCF, 134 in 1:05-cv-09483-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-05268-RJS-JCF, 74 in 1:07-cv-07752-RJS-JCF, 211 in 1:05-cv-06780-RJS-JCF, 184 in 1:05-cv-01567-RJS-JCF, 178 in 1:05-cv-07673-RJS-JCF, 169 in 1:05-cv-01562-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-09985-RJS-JCF, 83 in 1:05-cv-02927-RJS-JCF, 181 in 1:05-cv-07670-RJS-JCF, 81 in 1:05-cv-05150-RJS-JCF, 204 in 1:05-cv-05080-RJS-JCF, 118 in 1:05-cv-03705-RJS-JCF, 175 in 1:05-cv-07579-RJS-JCF, 62 in 1:05-cv-09940-RJS-JCF, 214 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF, 68 in 1:05-cv-10010-RJS-JCF, 135 in 1:04-cv-10178-RJS-JCF, 88 in 1:05-cv-03616-RJS-JCF, 50 in 1:05-cv-09987-RJS-JCF, 43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF, 77 in 1:05-cv-07025-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-07546-RJS-JCF, 72 in 1:07-cv-07751-RJS-JCF, 578 in 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF, 97 in 1:05-cv-07626-RJS-JCF, 167 in 1:05-cv-01568-RJS-JCF, 79 in 1:05-cv-06193-RJS-JCF, 124 in 1:05-cv-07026-RJS-JCF, 66 in 1:05-cv-10024-RJS-JCF, 94 in 1:07-cv-07683-RJS-JCF, 181 in 1:05-cv-01565-RJS-JCF, 98 in 1:05-cv-01573-RJS-JCF, 56 in 1:06-cv-01779-RJS-JCF, 74 in 1:05-cv-06918-RJS-JCF, 450 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF, 131 in 1:05-cv-04949-RJS-JCF, 51 in 1:05-cv-07789-RJS-JCF, 84 in 1:05-cv-07625-RJS-JCF, 82 in 1:07-cv-07678-RJS-JCF, 109 in 1:05-cv-07541-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:06-cv-00433-RJS-JCF, 109 in 1:05-cv-09738-RJS-JCF, 96 in 1:05-cv-01569-RJS-JCF, 78 in 1:05-cv-03478-RJS-JCF, 267 in 1:05-cv-08453-RJS-JCF, 86 in 1:05-cv-09974-RJS-JCF, 146 in 1:05-cv-07668-RJS-JCF, 87 in 1:05-cv-07547-RJS-JCF, 119 in 1:05-cv-05528-RJS-JCF, 111 in 1:05-cv-05152-RJS-JCF, 193 in 1:05-cv-01566-RJS-JCF, 87 in 1:05-cv-02910-RJS-JCF, 204 in 1:05-cv-01570-RJS-JCF, 138 in 1:05-cv-07669-RJS-JCF, 150 in 1:05-cv-07580-RJS-JCF, 208 in 1:05-cv-01564-RJS-JCF, 191 in 1:05-cv-01572-RJS-JCF, 51 in 1:07-cv-07583-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy. filed by The City of New York, (101 in 1:05-cv-05268-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims at Church/Fulton Streets. filed by The City of New York, (262 in 1:05-cv-08453-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims at Church/Fulton Streets. filed by The City of New York, (565 in 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims At Church/Fulton Streets. filed by All Defendants, (178 in 1:05-cv-09484-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Joseph Lamendola, David Cohen, James Essig, Thomas Doepfner, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Kerry Sweet, Jeremiah Malone, Stephen Hammerman, Jonathan Quimby, John Colgan, Cuong Nguyen, Gerald Dieckmann, John and Jane Does, The City of New York, Remy Randall, Victor Perez, Daniel Ryan, James Rufle, (178 in 1:05-cv-07670-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Betty Bastidas, Gregg Ross, Lauren Caspar, Jerel Walden, (262 in 1:04-cv-07921-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by James Essig, Raymond Kelly, City of New York, (76 in 1:07-cv-07678-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Janine Altongy, Debasri Ghosh, Megan Kennedy, Carre Adams, (187 in 1:05-cv-01572-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims at Church/Fulton Streets. filed by All Defendants, (258 in 1:05-cv-08453-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Katharine Krassan, Adam Richins, John M. Miller, Barrett Z. Gross, Thomas Catchpole, Susan D'Ornellas, Selma Spritzer, Jeffrey A. Paterson, Adam Feinstein, Nathaniel Parry, Jennifer Janney, Jay Marx, Daniel Burns, Ruth Benn, Daniel W. Parrott, Ann Trudell, Susan Crane, Thomas Ivors, Frantz Walker, Sarah Kanouse, Tristan Migliore, Raissa Wu, Devon Rueckner, John Trinkl, Bruce Renwick, Stephen Gamboa, Lois A. Doggett, James J. White, Kathleen Burick, Joan Cavanagh, Christine Pardew, Oren Goldenberg, Edward F. Kinane, James Flynn, Lawrence Paris, Felton Davis, Patricia Debruhl, Gary Ashbeck, Kimberly Kern, Steven Scofield, Alexander Holley Drummond, David Barrows, Ellen Grady, Raymond Robinson, Howard J. Gale, John Behling, Andrew St. Laurent, Katherine Poe, Sarah Tepsic, Jonothan Logan, Ed Hedemann, Gordon William Sensiba, Teran Wilson, Benjamin Bernard, Diane Beeny, James Williamson, Jason Dorais, Anais Sensiba, David Gordon, Roger Hill, Chris G. Murray, Calla Evans, Shana Rigby, Edward Hotchkiss, Linnea Capps, Ryan D. Hottle, John Larson, Blossom Nicinski, Walter Ditman, James Wilson, Mark Colville, Matthew Wright, Tobiah Gaster, Daniel O'Reilly-Rowe, Ronald W. San Marchi, John Theodore Glick, Ellen Barfield, Michael Palmer, Steven Ekberg, Jay Kantor, Arun Bhalla, Edward Gibbons, Marc F. Church, Benjamin Hunt, Kathleen D. Hernandez, Joshua Knapp, Thomas Zambeck, Zachary Vreeland, Matthew Dietzen, Jennifer Wong, James Noonan, Laura Kressly, Richard Hardie, Tessa M. Lalonde, Stephen Petrick, Marielle Lovecchio, Laura Raymond, Pepper Judd, Theresa Swink, Dewayne Dickerson, Jared Lanctot, Lambert Rochfort, Dwight Jenkins, Janet S. Howe, Tarasik Abdell, Shannon Petrello, Joseph Amato, Colleen Cook, Matthew Kocek, Gabriel Gaster, Michael Joseph, Brian Kavanagh, Robert J. Siegel, Polly A. Davies, Deborah Riverbend, Ryan McGee, Barbara Ann Meisinger, Andrew Laken, Zachary C. Miller, Mora MI-OK Stephens, Charles Goldberg, Jeffery J. Cohen, Ronald E. Rosenberg, Frank Sanchez, III, Michael Becker, Mark Nechay, Theodore Glick, Christy Ann Turner, William Conwell, (210 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by All Defendants, (442 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing False Arrest Claims at Church/Fulton Streets. filed by City of New York, (568 in 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Francesca Firoentini, Robert Curely, Michael Schiller, Neal Curley, (114 in 1:05-cv-03705-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion. filed by William Tracey, Terrence Monahan, Matthew Delguadio, John J. Colgan, Raymond Kelly, New York City Police Officer Jose Perez, The City of New York, Bruce Smolka, James Franzo, James Essig, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, Michael Bloomberg, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, (127 in 1:04-cv-10178-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Carol Dudek, (209 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by All Defendants, (206 in 1:05-cv-05080-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion. filed by Abdiel Anderson, Mark E. Keegan, Timothy Rogers, Kerry R. Sweet, Francisco Alcantara, John J. Colgan, Jane and John Does, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Eunpa Chun, Jessica Knatz, Linda Holmes, Charles Chaplar, Cynthia Rosario, Jorge Encarnacion, Sulman Zaheer, John Weiser, Stephen Hammerman, James Essig, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Joseph Esposito, David Cohen, Prince Williams, Thomas Doepfner, Darren Rock, Derrick Baity, Gregory Bell, Frank Marousek, Steven Ricca, Michael Bloomberg, Diane Hayes, Thomas Galati, Nicholas Gravino, Jack McManus, James Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, Julio Calle, (206 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (E. 16th Street). filed by All Plaintiffs, (174 in 1:05-cv-09484-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Brian Hurley, Rue Sakayama, Gabriel Cohn, Clifford Kaplan, Jaie Bosse, Robert Pietri, Althea Lewis, Haideen Anderson, James Steitz, Daniel Perry, David Zalk, Naimah Fowler, Michael Reilly, Nadgia Lara, Daniel Zarrella, Seth Wessler, Erica Mitrano, David Hill, David Maddox, Erik Henriksen, Nancy Diamond, Denise Rubinfeld, Emily Paine, Jesse Rosemoore, Scott O'Dierno, Benjamin Cody, Ryan Doxtader, Jessica Taft, Zachary Goldstein, Sada Stipe, Courtney Lee Adams, John Flanigan, Barbara Jane Harden Jones, Kristin Kojis, Michael Fix, Scott Beibin, Miho Schutzenhofer, Richard Lovejoy, Eric Corley, Adrianne Wilcox, Sarah Palmer, Sandor Katz, Edward Codel, Marlene Flaton, Trevor Giuliani, Dominick Sassone, Michelle Kaye, Greg Griffith, Nazie Shekarchi, Rebecca Sutton, Christopher Shortridge, Michael Gindi, Steven Black, David Geocos, Christina Argyros, Alexis Shotwell, Juanpablo Juarez, Jeffrey Parrott, Thomas Adamson, Daniel Gingold, Cynthia Rosin, Brian Lucrezia, Lily Hughes-Dunn, Yasmine Farhang, Aisha Jabour, Ellen Tuzzolo, Sidney Vault, Jennifer Lahn, Rebecca Wood, Daniel Reed, Thomas Bacon, Robert Ponce, Chris Agnese, Dana Pryor, Lisa Martin, Noah Weiss, Roger Vilanova Marques, Aaron Maret, Sabine Aronowsky, Eugeni Averbakh, Christina Benson, Angel Rivera, James Graham, Marian Geocos, Arielle Soloff, Jennifer Giles, Joel Viertel, (117 in 1:05-cv-09901-RJS-JCF) FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Kaitlyn Tikkun, (186 in 1:05-cv-07670-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Richard Roes, John J. Colgan, Hudson River Park Trust, Perez, Lorenzo Johnson, Raymond Kelly, The City of New York, Daniel Albano, Kevin Sam, Bruce Smolka, Salvatore DiMaggio, Stephen Hammerman, James Essig, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Mark Keegan, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Kerry Sweet, Derrick Baity, Michael Bloomberg, Patrick Cortright, James Rufle, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Jack McManus, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Beatty, (136 in 1:05-cv-08501-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment To Dismiss The False Arrest Claims Of Plaintiffs Arrested On East 16th Street. filed by John Fernandez, The Republican National Committee, John Does 1-15, The City of New York, Jane Fernandez, Alexis Fernandez, (447 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Erika Biddle, Sonia Chandra, Deepa Majmudar, Celine Malanum, Danielle Walsh and Emily Friedman. filed by Erika Biddle, (201 in 1:05-cv-05080-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Noel Grosso, (184 in 1:05-cv-01572-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Fulton Street). filed by Aubryn Sidle, (133 in 1:05-cv-08501-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Jody Concepcion, (256 in 1:04-cv-07921-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Ann Maurer, Ashley Waters, Hacer Dinler, (78 in 1:07-cv-07678-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by The City of New York, John Colgan, Stephen Hammerman, James Essig, Ruby Marin-Jordan, David Cohen, Thomas Doepfner, Kerry Sweet, Gerald Dieckmann, (116 in 1:05-cv-05152-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment To Dimiss The False Arrest Claims Of Plaintiffs Arrested On East 16th Street. filed by New York City Police Officer Abdiel Anderson, William Tracey, John J. Colgan, Raymond Kelly, Joseph Delguardo, The City of New York, Bruce Smolka, Matthew Delgaudio, James Franzo, James Essig, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, Michael Bloomberg, Terence Monahan, Thomas Galati, Gerald Dieckmann, (463 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Simon Harak, Diana Raimondi and William Steyert and all others similarly situated. filed by Simon Harak, (114 in 1:05-cv-09901-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Richard Roes, Hernandez, Ann Rubio, Diane Edwards, Works, Felice Sims, James Does, James Doe, Robert N. Davoren, John J. Colgan, Julie Does, Nicholas Estavillo, Raymond Kelly, Debra Stremel, Deborah Jacques, Alexander Laera, The City of New York, Daniel Albano, Giovannia Cancel, Bruce Smolka, Martin F. Horn, Sheila Veerapen, Autuam Carr, Saldo, Constance Blakeney, Jane Does, Stephen Hammerman, Williams-Anderson, Thomas Purtell, Sonia Pagan, James Essig, Williams-Robinson, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Mark Keegan, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, Joseph Lamendola, Patrick Devlin, Gelinda Gethers, Chandra Barnes, Cheri Gatling, Paul Deentremont, Thomas Doepfner, Pamela Harris, Kerry Sweet, Evelyn Rivera, Willa Campbell, Michael Bloomberg, Patrick Cortright, Terence Monahan, Robert Roes, Thomas Galati, Anthony Johnson, Sharon Feaggins, John Connolly, Jacqueline Harrison, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, (110 in 1:05-cv-03705-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Cathie L. Bell, (131 in 1:04-cv-10178-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Terrence Monahan, John J. Colgan, Raymond Kelly, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Franzo, Fackler, James Essig, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Thomas Graham, Quimby, "Joe" Tracey, N. Perez, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does. By October 31, 2012, the parties shall submit a joint letter regarding the proposed next steps in these actions. In doing so, the parties should take this opportunity to reflect on this litigation and the prospects for a fair resolution of the remaining claims. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/30/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ago) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: Plaintiffs shall open with argument on their summary judgment motions concerning mass arrests at Fulton Street and East 16th Street. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs arguments and present argument regarding their motion for summary judgment on the no summons policy. Plaintiffs may then use their remaining time to reply. Finally, Defendants may use their remaining time to reply regarding the no summons policy. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (pl) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER: It is hereby Ordered that the oral argument is adjourned to 5/31/12 at 3:30 p.m. ( Oral Argument set for 5/31/2012 at 03:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for oral argument regarding the parties' cross-motions on May 14, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. Each side will have one hour to argue. Plaintiffs in the related cases shall consult among themselves to determine who will argue on behalf of Plaintiffs, and submit a letter no later than May 7, 2012 advising the Court as to that determination. ( Oral Argument set for 5/14/2012 at 03:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated 12/6/2011 re: Accordingly, Defendants respectfully request that Your Honor "so order" the Clerk of Court to accept and file discs "under seal" containing Defendants' rely papers regarding their motion for summary judgment consisting of: (1) Defendants' Reply Brief; (2) Defendants' Reply 56.1 Statement; and (3) the Declaration of Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated November 23, 2011 in each of the forty-three RNC Consolidated Cases listed in Appendix A. annexed hereto. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(djc) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                        DVD of Fulton Street Video by Jon Fine dated 8/31/04. ***Accepted for filing by the Honorable Richard J. Sullivan on 12/14/11, document #619. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(mro) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER: no later than December 19, 2011, all Plaintiffs in related RNC cases shall submit a joint letter to the Court definitively setting forth which Plaintiffs join which motions and briefing. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cd) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' motion is deemed made. The Court reserves judgment on the motion and will rule on it when it rules on Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the no-summons and fingerprinting policies. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cd) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs may physically file the DVD described in their letter with the Clerk of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall file any documents in support of disputed facts in their Rule 56.1 Statements no later than December 21, 2011. As stated in the Court's November 22, 2011 Order, Plaintiffs are directed to limit such exhibits to provide only the relevant and necessary portions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/14/2011) Copies Mailed By ChambersFiled In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 164 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                  EXHIBIT submitted on CD-R. ***See Endorsed Letter dated 12/5/2011, document #162, permitting the filing of this Exhibit on CD-R. Document filed by Carol Dudek.(tro) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from James I. Meyerson dated 12/2/2011 re: Counsel for the Plaintiffs writes to request leave to file substantial exhibits via a disc rather than by electronic filing. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/4/2011) (ab) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of Jeffrey Dougherty in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to C, # 2 Exhibit D, E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit F Continued, # 5 Exhibit G, H, # 6 Exhibit I to N, # 7 Exhibit O to S, # 8 Exhibit T to V)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                        RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York, The City of New York, The City of New York, The City of New York, The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 127 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Meyerson, James) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 127 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Meyerson, James) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Gerald S. Smith in Support re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J)(Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the following submissions: (1) a letter from Defendants, dated November 18, 2011, requesting that the Court permit Defendants to file enlarged submissions in their forthcoming reply briefing; and (2) a letter from Plaintiffs, dated November 21, 2011, consenting to Defendants' request and also requesting leave to file expanded submissions. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT each side shall submit reply briefs totaling no more than seventy-five (75) pages. For the sake of clarification, this means that all Plaintiffs, collectively, shall submit no more than 75 pages of briefing in total. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, to the extent that the parties file exhibits not previously submitted to support facts in their Rule 56.1 Statements that an opposing party has disputed, the limits on the number and length of exhibits do not apply. However, the parties are directed to limit such exhibits to provide only the relevant and necessary portions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. ***as per Chambers. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 127 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            COUNTER STATEMENT TO 130 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              DECLARATION of Gerald S. Smith in Opposition re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-H, # 5 Exhibit I-L, # 6 Exhibit M-N, # 7 Exhibit O-T, # 8 Exhibit U-V, # 9 Exhibit W, # 10 Exhibit X-Y, # 11 Exhibit Z-DD, # 12 Exhibit DD (cont) - HH, # 13 Exhibit HH (cont) - JJ, # 14 Exhibit JJ (cont) - MM, # 15 Exhibit NN- UU, # 16 Exhibit UU (cont) - XX, # 17 Exhibit YY- CCC, # 18 Exhibit CCC (cont) - FFF, # 19 Exhibit GGG - HHH)(Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - OPPOSITION BRIEF To Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey.(Smith, Gerald) Modified on 11/4/2011 (ka). (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment. And in Support of the Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Meyerson, James) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO 133 Rule 56.1 Statement,. Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Meyerson, James) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Meyerson, James) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        DECLARATION of James I. Meyerson in Opposition re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Albano Deposition Testimonies)(Meyerson, James) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants' request to prevent Plaintiffs from relying on documents not submitted to the Court is denied. To the extent that Defendants dispute facts set forth in Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statements, they may require Plaintiffs to produce supportive documents. Because enlarged briefing is likely necessary to allow the parties to respond to one another's voluminous submissions accompanying the summary judgment motions, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties may file opposition submissions consistent with the limitations set forth in the Court's September 30, 2011 Order. However, because the briefing schedule has been in place since July, and the Court sees no need for an extension of time, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' request for an extension of the briefing schedule is denied. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION of David Cohen in Support re: (214 in 1:05-cv-01563-RJS-JCF, 81 in 1:05-cv-07575-RJS-JCF, 88 in 1:05-cv-07548-RJS-JCF, 80 in 1:05-cv-07536-RJS-JCF, 267 in 1:04-cv-07921-RJS-JCF, 129 in 1:05-cv-09930-RJS -JCF, 180 in 1:05-cv-07624-RJS-JCF, 193 in 1:05-cv-07623-RJS-JCF, 202 in 1:05-cv-01571-RJS-JCF, 85 in 1:05-cv-01574-RJS-JCF, 146 in 1:05-cv-07672-RJS-JCF, 176 in 1:05-cv-09484-RJS-JCF, 57 in 1:07-cv-07741-RJS-JCF, 134 in 1:05-cv-09483-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-05268-RJS-JCF, 74 in 1:07-cv-07752-RJS-JCF, 211 in 1:05-cv-06780-RJS-JCF, 184 in 1:05-cv-01567-RJS-JCF, 178 in 1:05-cv-07673-RJS-JCF, 169 in 1:05-cv-01562-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-09985-RJS-JCF, 83 in 1:05-cv-02927-RJS-JCF, 181 in 1:05-cv-07670-RJS-JCF, 81 in 1:05-cv-05150-RJS-JCF, 204 in 1:05-cv-05080-RJS-JCF, 118 in 1:05-cv-03705-RJS-JCF, 175 in 1:05-cv-07579-RJS-JCF, 62 in 1:05-cv-09940-RJS-JCF, 214 in 1:05-cv-07577-RJS-JCF, 68 in 1:05-cv-10010-RJS-JCF, 135 in 1:04-cv-10178-RJS-JCF, 88 in 1:05-cv-03616-RJS-JCF, 50 in 1:05-cv-09987-RJS-JCF, 43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF, 77 in 1:05-cv-07025-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:05-cv-07546-RJS-JCF, 72 in 1:07-cv-07751-RJS-JCF, 578 in 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF, 97 in 1:05-cv-07626-RJS-JCF, 167 in 1:05-cv-01568-RJS-JCF, 79 in 1:05-cv-06193-RJS-JCF, 124 in 1:05-cv-07026-RJS-JCF, 66 in 1:05-cv-10024-RJS-JCF, 94 in 1:07-cv-07683-RJS-JCF, 181 in 1:05-cv-01565-RJS-JCF, 98 in 1:05-cv-01573-RJS-JCF, 56 in 1:06-cv-01779-RJS-JCF, 74 in 1:05-cv-06918-RJS-JCF, 450 in 1:04-cv-09216-RJS -JCF, 131 in 1:05-cv-04949-RJS-JCF, 51 in 1:05-cv-07789-RJS-JCF, 84 in 1:05-cv-07625-RJS-JCF, 82 in 1:07-cv-07678-RJS-JCF, 109 in 1:05-cv-07541-RJS-JCF, 105 in 1:06-cv-00433-RJS-JCF, 109 in 1:05-cv-09738-RJS-JCF, 96 in 1:05-cv-01569-RJS-JCF, 78 in 1:05-cv-03478-RJS-JCF, 267 in 1:05-cv-08453-RJS-JCF, 86 in 1:05-cv-09974-RJS-JCF, 146 in 1:05-cv-07668-RJS-JCF, 87 in 1:05-cv-07547-RJS-JCF, 119 in 1:05-cv-05528-RJS-JCF, 111 in 1:05-cv-05152-RJS-JCF, 193 in 1:05-cv-01566-RJS-JCF, 87 in 1:05-cv-02910-RJS-JCF, 204 in 1:05-cv-01570-RJS-JCF, 138 in 1:05-cv-07669-RJS-JCF, 150 in 1:05-cv-07580-RJS-JCF, 208 in 1:05-cv-01564-RJS-JCF, 191 in 1:05-cv-01572-RJS-JCF, 51 in 1:07-cv-07583-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Dougherty in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B, # 2 Exhibit B (cont.) - D, # 3 Exhibit D (cont.) - E, # 4 Exhibit E (Cont.) - F, # 5 Exhibit G - H, # 6 Exhibit H (cont.) - J, # 7 Exhibit K - L, # 8 Exhibit L (cont.) - N, # 9 Exhibit N (cont.), # 10 Exhibit N (cont.) - O, # 11 Exhibit O (cont.), # 12 Exhibit P, # 13 Exhibit Q, # 14 Exhibit Q (cont.) - R)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of David Cohen in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Brian M. Jenkins in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Carl R. Holmberg in Support re: (43 in 1:08-cv-09098-RJS-JCF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy.. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding No Summons Policy & Fingerprinting Policy. Document filed by The City of New York. Responses due by 11/3/2011Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(Dougherty, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Gerald S. Smith in Support re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB)(Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey. (Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by City of New York, John J. Colgan, Gerald Dieckmann, John Does, Joseph Esposito, James Essig, Fackler, "Joe" Franzo, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, N. Perez, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka, "Joe" Tracey.(Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Meyerson, James) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 127 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Meyerson, James) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of James I. Meyerson in Support re: 127 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Meyerson, James) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Carol Dudek.(Meyerson, James) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER: Accordingly, It is hereby ordered that the parties shall submit Rule 56.1 Statements of Undisputed Facts and Declarations with citations but with only select supporting documents within the limit articulated in the Court's earlier September 30, 2011 Order. In the event that a fact is disputed by an opposing party, the party asserting the fact shall have an opportunity to produce the relevant document. Additionally, parties may refer to documents already in the record without providing them again. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/30/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (js) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ordered that each side shall submit briefs totaling no more than one hundred and fifty (150) pages. For the sake of clarification, this means that all Plaintiffs, collectively, shall submit no more than 150 pages of briefing in total. It is further ordered that each side (as defined above) shall submit with their briefs no more than a total of 100 exhibits and 25 affidavits or declarations. No exhibit shall exceed 30 pages, and no declaration shall exceed 20 pages. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/30/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (js) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall submit a joint letter to the Court no later than Friday, September 30, 2011 indicating: (1) whether they consent to Defendants' request, and (2) the number, and expected length, of briefs Plaintiffs expect to file in connection with the summary judgment motions. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/29/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Curt P. Beck dated 8/5/2011 re: Counsel for the Defendants writes to request an Order precluding plaintiffs from relying upon in any fashion the document (or the information contained therein) attached as Exhibit A and bates stamped DM 3000-3003. ENDORSEMENT: Docket and file in 04 Civ. 7922(RJS) and all related cases. Application granted. The document at issue was created in 2004 and yet was not disclosed to defendants' counsel until well after the fact discovery period has closed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 8/19/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. (ab) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated 8/11/11 re: counsel for defendants request that Your Honor "so order" the parties agreement that the RNC Plaintiff's identified in Appendix A, will provide responses to Defendants' contention interrogatories on or before August 19, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. Docket & file in all related cases. ( Answer to Interrogatories due by 8/19/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 8/11/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(pl) Modified on 8/12/2011 (pl). (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Michael L. Spiegel dated 7/12/11 re: counsel for plaintiff writes re Your Honor's July 5, 2011, Order, which states that counsel "who intend to proffer any liability expert and who have not previously produced an expert report for any such expert shall notify the Court in writing by July 8, 2011. (With respect to the deadline set, I respectfully request that the Court accept this tardy notification-I was out of my office for the past week.) Plaintiffs read this Court's July S, 2011, Order, however, to require the production by August 1, 2011, of disclosures under F.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2)(C), i.e., a "summary of the facts and opinions to which the witness is expected to testify." ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Kahl will not be excluded from testifying based on the minimal delay in responding to my July 5, 2010 order, since the defendants have already deposed him and have suffered no prejudice. However, prior to the August 1, 2011 deadline for submission of expert material, plaintiffs should reconsider whether they wish to proffer him as an expert, since it appears unlikely that he will pass muster under Daubert. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/15/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(pl) Modified on 7/18/2011 (pl). (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ordered that, 1. Any counsel other than the New York City Law Department I the New York Civil Liberties Union, Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP, and Jeffrey A. Rothman who intend to proffer any liability expert and who have not previously produced an expert report for any such expert shall notify the Court in writing by July 8, 2011; 2. With respect to the issues of group probable cause, the "no summons" policy, and blanket fingerprinting, plaintiffs have represented that they will not proffer expert evidence on their case in chief. The defendants shall therefore produce their expert reports and related materials for these issues by August 1, 2011. Plaintiffs shall produce any rebuttal expert reports and related materials by August 24, 2011. All expert discovery shall be completed by September 16, 2011; 3. With respect to the issues of conditions of confinement and excessive detention, the plaintiffs have represented that they will proffer expert evidence on their case in chief. The plaintiffs shall therefore produce their expert reports and related materials for these issues by August 1, 2011. Defendants shall produce any rebuttal expert reports and related materials by August 24, 2011. All expert discovery shall be completed by September 16, 2011. ( Discovery due by 9/16/2011., Request for Production of Documents due by 8/1/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/5/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (laq) Modified on 7/15/2011 (laq). (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER. The Court HEREBY ORDERS that the deadline to complete all expert discovery is adjourned to September 16, 2011. However, the parties are advised that the briefing schedule set forth in the Court's Order dated June 20, 2011 remains unchanged: Opening Briefs: October 3, 2011. Opposition Briefs: November 3, 2011. Reply Briefs: November 23, 2011. No further extensions will be granted. (All Expert Discovery due by 9/16/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/1/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm) Modified on 7/5/2011 (rjm). (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiffs' counsel in Schiller v. City of New York, 04 Civ. 7922 (RJS), and Dinler v. City of New York, 04 Civ. 7921 (RJS), dated June 27, 2011, proposing the following expert discovery schedule: (1) initial expert disclosures by all parties by July 15, 2011; (2) rebuttal expert disclosures by August 12, 2011; and (3) completion of all expert discovery by September 1, 2011. The Court is also in receipt of a letter from Defendants dated June 28, 2011, opposing Plaintiffs' proposal and suggesting the following expert discovery schedule: (1) Plaintiffs' expert disclosures by July 15, 2011; (2) Defendants' expert disclosures by August 12, 2011; and (3) completion of all expert discovery by September 1, 2011. The Court is also in receipt of a letter from class counsel in MacNamara v. City of New York, 04 Civ. 9216 (RJS), dated June 28, 2011, concurring with the request for rebuttal experts but opposing the schedule proposed by Plaintiffs' counsel in Schiller and Dinler. Since the related RNC cases remain referred to Magistrate Judge Francis for discovery purposes, the parties are advised to consult Judge Francis with respect to the sequencing of expert discovery, which shall in any event be completed no later than September 1, 2011 pursuant to the Court's Orders dated June 20, 2011 and June 27, 2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The request to defer expert discovery with respect to the excessive detention and conditions claims is HEREBY DENIED. As set forth in the Court's Order dated 6/20/2011, the deadline to complete all expert discovery with respect to liability is 9/1/2011. (Discovery due by 9/1/2011.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/27/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER The parties shall make a joint submission no later than 7/1/11, confirming the two mass arrest locations to be briefed on summary judgment with respect to the issue of group probable cause. Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2011. Contention interrogatories to be completed by 9/1/11. Motions for summary judgment due by 10/3/2011. Responses due by 11/3/2011, Replies due by 11/23/2011. Class counsel in MacNamara v City of NY, 04cv9216 shall submit a revised version of the proposed class notice no later than 7/1/11. The request to amend the complaints in Coburn v City of NY, 05cv7623 and Phillips v City of NY, 05cv7624, is denied as untimely, since the time to amend expired on 6/30/09. Plaintiffs shall collaborate int he choice of their two additional representatives, and counsel to attend the conference shall contact the Court to confirm a conference date no later than 6/24/11. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/20/11) Copy mailed by ChambersFiled In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) Modified on 6/22/2011 (ad). (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Conference set for 6/15/2011 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/24/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, IV from Christopher Dunn dated May 3, 2011 re: I write to follow up on the telephone conference the Court had with the parties on April 21. Since that conference, a group of plaintiffs' counsel handling many of the pending RNC cases has met, and I have spoken with Mr. Farrell. Having conferred with Mr. Farrell and many of plaintiffs' counsel, it appears that the week of May 23 is the earliest reasonable time for the conference, and we therefore propose that you schedule a conference for that week. As for the status of fact discovery, we completed the deposition of Chief Esposito on April 22. On April 27 (the day after the meeting with other counsel), I sent to Mr. Farrell a list of requests for factual information bearing on the City's intelligence defense. ENDORSEMENT: The pretrial conference will be held May 26, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9-B. Counsel should be prepared to discuss scheduling of dispositive motion as well as completion of any residual discovery. SO ORDERED. ( Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 5/9/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jmi) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Odile M. Farrell dated 3/11/2011 re: Accordingly, the parties respectfully request that the deadline for completing Chief Devlin's deposition be extended to April 7, 2011. the parties also request permission to complete Chief McManus' deposition on 3/17/2011. ENDORSEMENT: The request to complete Chief McManus' deposition on March 17, 2011 is granted. The request to complete Chief Devlin's deposition on April 6-7 is denied. Counsel had no reason to expect that I would grant plaintiffs' request to delay other depositions until Chief Esposito's was completed. Counsel shall make arrangements to complete Chief Devlin's deposition forthwith. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(js) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to James C. Francis, IV from Jonathan Moore dated 2/14/11 re: counsel for plaintiff, and on behalf of plaintiffs' counsel in all RNC cases with an interest in the continued depositions of current or former NYPD Chiefs Esposito, Devlin, Colgan and Graham and the deposition of retired Chief McManus, we write to request an extension of the February 15, 2011 deadline for completing these depositions and a status conference to address scheduling. See 11/22/10 Endorsed Order attached hereto as Exhibit A (granting request to extend completion date for 60 days from December 17, 2010). ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. The November 22, 2010 Memorandum Endorsement does not reference Chief Esposito, and there is no basis for delaying other depositions until it is determined whether his has been completed. All remaining policy depositions shall be completed by March 15, 2011. ( Deposition due by 3/15/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/15/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(pl) Modified on 2/16/2011 (pl). (ENDORSEMENT: Docket in all RNC Cases. Docketed in lead case 04cv7922 as per instructions from Chambers). (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Peter G. Farrell dated 2/14/2011 re: request that the Court approve the briefing schedule agreen to by the parties to address the issues arising at the continued deposition of Chief of Department Joseph Esposito. Defendants will move by 2/18/2011. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Judge's Initials are to appear on all papers submited to this court. ( Motions due by 2/18/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/15/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jar) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, IV from Christopher Dunn, dated 11/19/2010, re: On behalf of the plaintiffs and defendants in these two cases arising out of the Republican National Convention, counsel writes: Following the Second Circuit's October 22, 2010 order denying the plaintiffs' petition for rehearing en banc, we notified the City on November 4 that we did not intend to pursue further appeals (and the plaintiffs in MacNamara served a similar notice on November 8). With the 30-day clock having started, the parties immediately started discussing dates for resuming Deputy Commissioner Cohen's deposition. Because of prior commitments of counsel in MacNamara, however, the first available date turns out to be December 17. I therefore request that you modify your order to allow the policy depositions to resume by December 17, 2010. I also request that you extend the completion date to 60 days after that date, as the current cut-off of early January is simply unrealistic, given the upcoming holidays and that other high-level witnesses will need to be deposed whom we cannot even settle upon until we have deposed Deputy Commissioner Cohen. ENDORSEMENT: DOCKET AND FILE IN ALL RELATED CASES. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/22/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. (lnl) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Defendants' application is granted. Assuming that Deputy Commissioner Browne's deposition was noticed in a timely fashion, defendants reserved their right to object to it. Because Deputy Commissioner Browne has not been shown to possess unique, relevant information, he may avoid deposition as a high-ranking government official. Plaintiffs' application for an award of costs in connection with the instant application is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/2/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jpo) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the defendants' application for imposition of time limits on depositions is denied without prejudice to the defendants' moving for a protective order if the questioning becomes abusive. In addition, prior to questioning a witness, each plaintiff's attorney shall represent that he or she is familiar with that witness' prior testimony. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cd) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Alexis L. Leist dated 7/22/2010 re: Counsel requests an extension until 7/30/2010 to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' 7/15/2010 letter motion concerning fact witness depositions in the RNC Cases. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/22/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(tro) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Michael Spiegel dated 7/16/2010 re: Counsel writes on behalf of both parties to respectfully propose a briefing schedule concerning defendants' 7/15/2010, application for a protective order barring the deposition of NYPD Commissioner of Public Information Paul Browne. With the Court's permission, plaintiff will submit their opposition on or before 8/20/2010, and defendants will reply by 8/31/2010. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Responses due by 8/20/2010, Replies due by 8/31/2010.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/19/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(tro) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The parties shall commence or continue the remaining policy depositions (witnesses Cohen, Esposito, Graham, Colgan, Devlin, Brown, and McManus) within 30 days of the date that all appeals of the intelligence document ("Field Reports") issue is resolved and shall complete those depositions within 60 days thereafter. By July 15, 2010, counsel shall advise the Court whether there are any disputes regarding the scope or duration of the remaining policy depositions, and, if so, defendants shall submit a letter motion requesting any appropriate relief. Pursuant to the mandate of the Second Circuit in In re City of New York, No. 10-0237, plaintiffs' motion to compel production of the Field Reports is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(rjm) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Counsel's (Jeffrey C. Brooks) request to withdraw is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/16/10). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(djc) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Pretrial Conference adjourned 6/21/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/14/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tve) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Pretrial Conference for all Republican National Convention cases set for 6/16/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/10/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: For reasons further set forth in said Order, and on the record during the May 6, 2009 conference, the Court finds that Magistrate Judge Francis' February 20 Order quashing the Subpoena was not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Accordingly, the Court affirms the February 20 Order and denies Defendants' Objections. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the following docket entries: No. 04 Civ. 7921, Doc. Nos. 153, 154, and 161. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/3/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(db) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER...A pretrial conference having been held on June 5, 2009, it is hereby ORDERED that any plaintiff whose motion to amend the complaint was granted by my Memorandum and Order dated January 23, 2008 (Schiller v. City of New York, 2008 WL 200021), and who has not filed an amended pleading conforming to that order, may do so pursuant to a stipulation with defendants no later than June 30, 2009 or, if defendants do not agree to amendment, may serve and file a motion to amend by that date. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on June 5, 2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ad) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Deborah Hrbek dated 5/7/09 re: As requested, I write to confirm the NLG-NYC's consent to the cover letter dated February I, 2008 that accompanied the in camera submission to Judge Francis being placed in the court file. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ae) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Deborah Hrbek dated 2/1/08, Re: Further to this court's Order dated January 18, 2008, the non-party New York City Chapter of the National Lawyers Guild (NLG-NYC) respectfully submits the enclosed 574 pages of documents that are responsive to the above referenced subpoena duces tecum, as modified by the City of New York in Mr. Beck's letter dated September 13, 2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ae) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket the attached letters dated February 1, 2008 and May 7, 2009. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/11/09) (tro) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during the conference that was held on May 6, 2009, Defendants' motion for reconsideration of the Court's February 26, 2009 order is denied. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to terminate the following motions set forth within. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/8/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/24/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(js) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, Carol Dudek, City of New York, Gerald Dieckmann, Fackler, James Essig, "Joe" Tracey, Quimby, "Joe" Franzo, N. Perez, Joseph Esposito.(Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 92 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 91 Order,.. Document filed by City of New York. (Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re; 91 Order,. Document filed by City of New York.(Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court concludes that the January 23 Order is extremely thorough and well-reasoned. The Court, having found no clear error in either Judge Francis's analysis or his conclusions, rejects Defendants Objections and affirms the January 23 Order in its entirety. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/26/2009) (rw) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ordered as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' counsel in all RNC cases who have identified non-party witnesses who are to be deposed pursuant to Court order shall, by October 17, 2008, provide defendants' counsel with each witness' address so that subpoenas may be served. 2. By October 17, 2008, plaintiffs' counsel in MacNamara shall advise defendants' counsel of the specific RNC arrestees interviewed on "Democracy Now" and the specific Legal Aid or National Lawyers Guild attorneys involved in the RNC state court proceedings upon whom plaintiffs intend to rely. 3. With respect to the Court-ordered non-party depositions, defendants' counsel need not provide advance notice to plaintiffs' counsel before serving subpoenas that calls for the production of documents, defendants' counsel shall give plaintiffs' counsel three days' notice prior to serving the subpoena. So Ordered, ( Deposition due by 10/17/2008.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/10/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(js) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: It is hereby Ordered that defendant's application is granted as to Elizabeth Fink, Daniel Myers, and James Davis (plaintiff's husband). These individuals were designated for deposition by defendants' counsel on January 22, 2008, consistent with my Order dated November 26, 2007. Their depositions shall be completed by October 31, 2008. Defendants' application as to Ferdinand Ceserano is denied as moot as plaintiff has disavowed any intention of calling this person as a witness. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/6/2008) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jfe) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Alexis L. Leist dated 8/15/08 re: As discussed at the court conference before Your Honor on Friday, 8/8/08, defendants respectfully request that the Court enter an order permitting defendants to file their letter applications and replies regarding non-party witnesses in all twenty of the above-captioned cases via ECF. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 9/2/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(tro) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Take Deposition from Various Non-Party Witnesses. Document filed by City of New York.(Brooks, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/7/2008 (db). (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Tonya Jenerette dated 6/30/2008 re: Counsel respectfully request that the Court grant this application so that the non party deposition consented to by the parties may proceed. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. There depositions shall be completed by September 30, 2008. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/11/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jfe) Modified on 7/21/2008 (jfe). (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Jeffrey C. Brooks dated 6/3/2008; counsel writes to request that Your Honor enter an Order permitting defendants to file their 1/22/2008 case-specific motions and any replies thereto under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Any letters related to these applications may be filed under seal. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 6/3/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(kkc) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 71 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raju Sundaran with Exhibits)(Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that defendants' reply brief is rejected due to defendants' failure to comply with this Court's directives regarding both the length of the reply brief and defendants' obligation to seek permission to file oversized briefs well in advance of the due date. By April 11, 2008, defendants shall file a reply that complies with the page limit of fifteen pages previously imposed by this Court. Defendants are not permitted to add any substantive material-including new arguments, or case or record citations-to the revised reply brief; this prohibition will be strictly enforced. Finally, the Court advises defendants that, pursuant to Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, violations of pre-trial orders may be redressed with "any just orders" that the Court deems appropriate, including, but not limited to, the imposition of fees and costs. Fed.R.Civ.P.16(f)(1). Here, defendants have clearly failed to heed the Court's order regarding their obligation to seek an enlargement of page limits in advance of the due date. Repeated failures by defendants to abide by this instruction, or any other pre-trial order, will require this Court to consider the imposition of sanctions under Rule 16(f). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/8/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jmi) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of RAJU SUNDARAN in Support. Document filed by City of New York. (Weiler, Fred) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support. Document filed by City of New York. (Weiler, Fred) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from James Mirro dated 4/2/08 re: Defendants request that the Court permit them to file a brief of up to 20 pages in length, if necessary, in further support of their appeal of the 1/23/08 order of Magistrate Francis. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' reply brief shall not exceed 15 pages. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/3/08) (tro) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 3/31/08 re: Defendants request that the Court permit all parties until Friday, April 4, 2008 to serve the information required by Your Honor's order. Plaintiffs' counsel Jeffrey Rothman, James Meyerson, Daniel Alterman, Brian Raum, Beldock Levine, Stehpan Peskin, Michael Spiegel, Alan Levine and Alan D. Levine consent to this request. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/31/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(djc) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Raju Sundaran dated 3/12/2008 re: Defendants request permission to file one hard copy set of exhibits with Clerk's office in connection with their Rule 72 objections to the January 23, 2008 Order of Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV. Defendants have already filed and served their Memorandum of Law and Declaration in support via ECF in each of these 35 cases. Defendants request that this single set exhibits be docketed in all RNC case listed on the attached appendix in order to have a complete record in the event of an appeal. Due to their bulk, Your Honor previously excused defendants from filing their exhibits vis ECF by order dated March 3, 2008. A copy of that order (and appendix) is attached for the convenience of Your Honor and the Clerk's office. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request is Granted.Defendants shall also submit a set of the exhibits as courtesy copies to chambers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/14/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(jmi) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION BRIEF. Document filed by Carol Dudek.(Meyerson, James) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Defendants having applied by letter dated 1/22/08 for an order dismissing plaintiff's emotional distress claims due to her failure to execute releases for medical service providers, it is hereby ORDERED that the application is denied. Defendants failed to meet and confer prior to submitting their application in this long-dormant case. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/19/08) Copies Mailed by Chambers.(db) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: It is hereby ordered as follows: 1. By March 31, 2008, counsel for all parties shall identify all non-party fact witnesses that they reasonably expect to testify at trial on behalf of their respective clients. 2. Absent exceptional circumstances, depositions of fact witnesses are concluded in all RNC cases, consistent with the case management orders. While some of the case management orders were extended de facto by the master deposition scheduling order, there was no basis for assuming that they had been abandoned altogether. This order does not preclude depositions necessitated by Judge Sullivan's determination of issues no pending before him. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/19/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(js) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Raju Sundaran in Support of defendants' memorandum of law in support of defendants' appeal from the order of Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV's, dated 1/23/08, granting plaintiff's motion to amend in part. Document filed by All Defendants, All Plaintiffs. (this document relates to Case #04cv7922, document #267 Objection., MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(pl) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Raju Sundaran in Support re: 71 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by City of New York. (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from James Mirro dated 2/25/2008 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court permit the Brief in its current form. This appeal consolidates the arguments relating to some 37 separate cases. In addition, many of the issues discussed in the Brief, including the issues relating to the Deputy Commissioner for Intelligence David Cohen, are substantive issues that are of vital importance to defendants. In addition, due to the bulk of the Exhibits, defendants request permission not to file the Sundaran Declaration and Exhibits via ECF. Defendants have served these materials on opposing counsel in electronic form (on disks). ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' brief is accepted for filing. However the Court reminds defendants that requests to file over sized briefs should be filed well in advance of relevant due dates. Failure to do so in the future well result in rejection of the brief in this entirety. Defendants need not file the exhibits referenced herein via ECF. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/3/2008) (jmi) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Gerald Dieckmann, Fackler, James Essig, "Joe" Tracey, Quimby, "Joe" Franzo, N. Perez, John Does, Joseph Esposito. (Sundaran, Raju) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 2/19/08 re: Defendants request that the Court permit defendants twenty (20) days until 3/17/08 in which to serve answer to any amended complaint as to which not objections are filed. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/20/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(tro) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from James Mirro dated 2/4/08 re: Defendants request that the Court adjourn the defendants' time to answer the amended complaints until 20 days after Judge Sullivan's order on any appeal of the Order. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted only with respect to any case in which the amended complaint actually raises issues that are the subject of obections presented to Judge Sullivan. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 2/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(ae) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Gerald Dieckmann, Fackler, James Essig, "Joe" Tracey, Quimby, "Joe" Franzo, N. Perez, John Does, Sally Rowes, Joseph Esposito. Document filed by Carol Dudek. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Carol Dudek.(db) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiffs' Motion (Amend/Correct) are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as further set forth in said Order. Within 10 days, the plaintiffs shall serve and file amended complaints that conform with this Order (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/23/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed by Chambers. (db) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER; that Non-Party New York City Chapter of the National Lawyers Guild (NLG-NYC) having moved to quash defendants subpoena on the grounds that the information sought is subject to the attorney-client privilege; and NLG-NYC having represented that a preliminary search identified approximately 500 responsive documents, it is hereby ORDERED that NLG-NYC promptly submit these responsive documents to the Court for in camera review. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/18/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. Copies Mailed By Chambers.(pl) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated 1/14/08 re: Defendants request one additional week in which to comply with the deadline imposed by the November 26, 2007 Order, which would require submission of motions and service of non-party deposition notices on or before 1/22/08. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. No further extensions. Any motion filed without compliance with the meet and confer requirement will be summarily denied. ( Motions due by 1/22/2008.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(tro) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ordered as follows: 1. Any motion relating to a party deposition shall be submitted by Jauary 15, 2008. 2. Notices of deposition for any non-party witnesses identified as a result of party depositions shall be served by January 15, 2008. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/26/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al.(js) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Raju Sundaran in Support re: 61 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by City of New York. (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Document filed by City of New York. (Brooks, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Raju Sundaran dated 10/19/2007 re: Defendants request permission to file a 50 page memorandum of law in opposition. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted upon the representation that the proposed motion present varying issues and arguments. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/22/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF et al. (jar) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(fk) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER any party receiving documents form a non-party pursuant to subpoena shall maintain those documents on an attorneys' -eyes-only basis except insofar as the provisions of this Order permit disclosure. Counsel wishing to disseminate a document subpoenaed from a non-party shall provide notice to counsel for any party identified in the document. Counsel for the party identified in the document shall have 10 business days to deem the document (or a portion of it) confidential, in which case it shall be treated as such under the protective order. Until the ten days has elapsed or until the party identified in the document has otherwise consented to disclosure, the document shall be maintained on an attorneys'-eyes-only basis. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 9/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(jco)"Copies Mailed By Chambers" (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 9/19/07 re: a request by defendants to respond to all plaintiffs' motions on a consolidated basis by 10/19/2007. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. In addition reply papers are due 11/19/2007. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 9/27/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(kco) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas' White Plains Docket. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(fk) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James I. Meyerson on behalf of Carol Dudek. New Address: James I. Meyerson, Esq., 64 Fulton Street @ Suite # 502, New York City, New York, United States 10038, 212 226-3310. (Meyerson, James) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER; regarding the Court Issued Memorandum and Order requiring the dft's to produce certain documents as to which they had asserted the law enforcement privilege, it is hereby ordered as follows: 1. The order shall be stayed for ten days to permit the parties to submit any objections pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the F.R.C.P. 2. The stay shall not apply to hose documents that the defendants had agreed to produce in redacted form (except for those listed in footnote 18 of the Order, as to which I have directed that the redactions be modified). (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 8/6/07) (pl) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Alan Levine dated 8/3/07 re: a request for an order in advance of the depositions scheduled for the week of 8/13/2007 that the memo books be produced at those and other NYPD depositions. ENDORSEMENT: Non-arresting officer witnesses shall bring the relevant memo books to their depositions and defendants shall use their best efforts to produce copies one week in advance of each deposition. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 8/8/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(kco) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER; regarding the Court Issued Memorandum and Order requiring the dft's to produce certain documents as to which they had asserted the law enforcement privilege, it is hereby ordered as follows: 1. The order shall be stayed for ten days to permit the parties to submit any objections pursuant to Rule 72(a) of the F.R.C.P. 2. The stay shall not apply to hose documents that the defendants had agreed to produce in redacted form (except for those listed in footnote 18 of the Order, as to which I have directed that the redactions be modified) (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 8/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(pl) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Cheryl L. Shammas dated 7/24/2007 re: request protective order pursuant to FRCP 26(c), barring the deposition of: (1) Stephen Hammerman, Esq., former Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters (2) three other members of the NYPD Legal Bureau whose depositions have been noticed by various plts. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. At least some of these deponents had direct involvement in audits in ways that would not implicate any privilege. For example, Mr. Hammerman is alleged to have participated directly in plt Kyne's audit. Moreover, plts are entitled to test the assertion of the atty-client privilege, particularly in light of the disturbing testimony by Sergeant Cai. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/31/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(jar) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; Depositions shall be conducted in accordance with the schedule set forth in the Appendix to this order. Counsel may deviate from that schedule only upon written stipulation or further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 7/5/07) (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 7/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(djc) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that defense witnesses scheduled to be deposed on dates on or after 6/19/07...shal appear on the dates indicated in those letters. Counsel shall have until 6/29/07 to agree on specific deposition dates for any other defense witnesses identified by then and for all plaintiffs. The agreed upon dates shall not extend beyond 11/16/07, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 6/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al. copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Counsel in the consolidated RNC cases having failed to cooperate in the scheduling of depositions as anticipated by Discovery Order #2, it is hereby ordered as follows: The defense witnesses scheduled to be deposed on dates on or after June 19, 2007 as set forth in the letters of Jeffrey A. Rothman dated May 14, 2007, Michael L. Spiegel dated May 23, 2007, and Jonathan Moore and Clare Norins dated June 7, 2007 shall appear on the dates indicated in those letters. Counsel shall have until June 29, 2007 to agree on specific deposition dates for any other defense witnesses identified by then and for all plaintiffs. the agreed upon dates shall not extend beyond November 16, 2007. After June 29, 2007, no additional fact witnesses shall be noticed for deposition absent: (a) agreement of the parties or (b) a showing that the witness could not reasonably have been identified prior to that date. On July 2, 2007, counsel for each party noticing depositions shall provide a letter to the Court listing all dates agreed upon pursuant to paragraph 2 of this order, which letters shall be "So Ordered." On July 2, 2007, counsel for each party noticing depositions shall also provide a separate letter identifying all witnesses for whom no date has been agreed upon. i will then schedule all such depositions. That schedule shall, by necessity, be arbitrary and inflexible. Following the pretrial conference scheduled for June 29, 2007, counsel may utilize my Courtroom to discuss the master deposition schedule among themselves. This order applies to all RNC cases consolidated for discovery. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 6/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF, 1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF Copies Mailed By Chambers (js) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re letters concerning disputes over the depositions of David Norcorss and William Harris: defts' request that the depositions of Mr. Norcorss and Mr. Harris be conducted at the deponents' respective places of business is denied, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/25/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al. copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Liora Jacobi dated 5/15/07 re: counsel for dfts request that any disclosure and use of the documents set forth herein be subject to an "attorneys eyes only" protective order. application granted without prejudice to any future challenge to the designation. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/16/07) (dle) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 5/1/07 re: Application GRANTED. In addition, Ms. McNamara shall appear for deposition on 5/17/07. The delay in producing her treatment records does not warrant sanctions; defendants' cancellation of her previously scheduled deposition is not a waiver of their right to depose her. the deponents shall bring the clothing and footwear worn when they were arrested, regardless of its current condition. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/3/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(db) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Peter G. Farrell dated 5/4/07 re: Application GRANTED. I not however, that the decision issued today is no way based on Mr. Dunn's 5/3/07 letter. The City is still free to respond to that letter in connection with its application for sanctions in connection with the disclosure of (then) confidential documents. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 5/4/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(db) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that defts may continue to produce arresting officer memo books in redacted form provided, however, that notations concerning duties related to the RNC are not redacted. Individualized verifications of discovery respones by arresting officers shall not be required. Disciplinary files of arresting officers shall be produced in ocnformity with my 12/2/05 order in Dudek v Cityof NY 04-10178. Charges of 'discourtesy" are not covered by that order. By 4/15/07 defts shall identify the drivers of the vehicles that transported the plntfs in the Coburn case. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 4/9/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al. copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Francis from Michael Spiegel dated 3/27/07 re 3/23/07 letter from Jeffrey Dougherty re defts' production of documents: based on the parties' representations, the DANY and DCJS documents previously in defts' possession should have been produced by now. Going forward, these documents shall be produced to plntfs on disc within two weeks of receipt by defts except under exceptional circumstances. Plntfs' application for costs and fees in connection with reopened depositions is denied without prejudice to renewal in connection with specific depositions. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 4/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(cd) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that defts may continue to produce arresting officer memo books in unredacted form provided, however, that notiations concerning duties related to the RNC are not redacted. Individualized verifcations of discovery responses by arresting officers shall not be required. This issue, however, shall be revisited if it appears through deposition that the written discovery responses have been inaccurate. Disciplinary files of arresting officers shall be produced in conformity with my 12/2/05 order in Dudek v City of NY, 04-10178. Charges of "discourtesy" are not covered by that order. By 4/15/07 defts shall identify the drivers of the vehicles that transported the plntfs in the Coburn case. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 4/3/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al. copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Peter G. Farrell dated 1/10/07 re: Attorney for defendants request an order that the documents shall be subject to attorneys eyes only designation and shall be used in the litigation of the RNC cases consolidated before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 1/12/07) (js) (Entered: 01/16/2007)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-7922-KMK-JCF et al.(rag) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge James C. Francis IV from Curt P. Beck dated 1/18/07 re: that the parties have agreed to the following briefing schedule as follows:Dft's will file moving papers by 1/26/2007, NYCLU responses due by 2/14/2007, Dft's replies due by 2/23/2007. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 1/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF et al.(pl) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Jeffrey A. Dougherty dated 12/18/06 re: As an alternative to destroying the confidential records of a setting plaintiff at the time of settlement, defendants may return them to counsel for that plaintiff, to be maintained by that attorney until the completion of all RNC cases. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 12/21/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07575-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-09974-KMK-JCF(db, ) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: re: Missing Documents - if the defendants are unable to produce a specific document of a type which they have agreed to produce, or have been ordered to produce, counsel for defendants shall provide a written sattement concerning the inability to produce the document ("statement"). The statement shall set forth the details further elaborated in this order as items 1-4. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 12/21/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-8453-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07575-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-09974-KMK-JCF(db, ) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY ORDER #2: It is hereby ordered as follows: counsel for any party seeking to take a deposition may serve a notice on counsel for the party to be deposed at any time in advance of the deadline for doing so as set forth in the case management order governing each individual action. All other rulings as set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/13/2006) Copies Mailed By Chambers(lb, ) (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/20/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Emails produced by defendants shall be provided to all RNC plaintiffs as Bates Stamped tiff images on CD-ROM disccs. The emails on shall be labeled to corrsponed to the Bates Numbers of the tiff images contained therein. The tiff images shall contain the following feilds: subject line, from,to, date,and time, where applicable. Plaintiffs shall produce emails in the manner described in paragraphs 1-3 above or as printed hard copy documents containing the same fields set forth in paragraph 3 above. Neither party is required to produce compardin emails meaning that the parties shall produce a single copy of an email to respresent both the sent and received emails. The parties shall provide an email production index which shall list the email's Bates Number, subject line, to field, from field, and the date/time fields. All email addresses produced by the parties shall be kept confidential and shall be restricted to attorney's eyes only and the staff of their respective offices. This Order shall govern all Consolidated RNC Actions, which are individually listed in Appendix A, and any further actons filed by sny of the current RNC plaintiff's Counsel. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/10/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07575-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-09974-KMK-JCF(jmi, ) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald Stephen Smith, Jr on behalf of Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Gerald Dieckmann, Freckler, James Essig, "Joe" Tracey, Quimby, "Joe" Franzo, N. Perez, Joseph Esposito (Smith, Gerald) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate defendants' 23 Motion for discovery relief pursuant to FRCP 72. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/31/06) (db, ) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/15/2006 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (jar, ) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER; Defendants will produce CCRB complaint summaries for all CCRB complaints made against defendants Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, James Essig, Gerald Dieckmann, James Franzo, William Tracey, Nelson Perez, and Jonathan Quimby, for False Arrest, Excessive Force, Denial of Medical, etc.. The information outlined in this Order will be produced no later than 4/10/06. This Stipulation is not without prejudice for either party to seek leave to amend the Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/18/06) (sac, ) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Motion Argument 23 MOTION for Discovery Relief Purusant to F.R.C.P. 72.: Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2006 02:30 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/18/06) (jco, ) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 23 MOTION for Discovery Relief Purusant to F.R.C.P. 72.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Gerald Dieckmann, Freckler, James Essig, "Joe" Tracey, Quimby, "Joe" Franzo, N. Perez, Joseph Esposito. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Weiss, Jed) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jed M. Weiss dated 1/9/06, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 23 MOTION for Discovery Relief Purusant to F.R.C.P. 72 : Replies due by 1/17/2006. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/10/06) (sac, ) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Francis from Jed Weiss dated 1/6/06: granting defts request for a stay of the 12/2/05 order. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 1/6/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 23 MOTION for Discovery Relief Purusant to F.R.C.P. 72.. Document filed by Carol Dudek. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Meyerson, James) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Discovery Relief Purusant to F.R.C.P. 72. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Gerald Dieckmann, Freckler, James Essig, "Joe" Tracey, Quimby, "Joe" Franzo, N. Perez, Joseph Esposito. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Weiss, Jed) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that plntf is ordered to respond to deft's Motion for relief re FRCP 72 by 1/3/06 and defts are ordered to reply by 1/10/06. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/20/05) (cd, ) (Entered: 12/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Karas from James I. Meyerson dated 12/19/05 re: counsel requests the opportunity to submit opposition to motion by January 11, 2006. Mr. Meyerson is granted until January 9, 2006 to file his response to Defendants' appeal of Magistrate Judge Francis' discovery ruling. The Court wishes to move these cases along as expeditiously as possible. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/21/05) (djc, ) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Alan Kranis on behalf of City of New York (Kranis, Jay) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: All Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2006.All Dispositive Motions shall be served by 2/1/2007. Responses due by 3/1/2007. Replies due by 4/1/2007. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/17/2005) (lb, ) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that dfts shall produce all CCRB and IAB materials as further set forth in this order; dfts shall produce all records in the possession, custody, or control of the NYPD relating to the arrest of any person at the same location and on the same date as plaintiff's arrest. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 12/2/05) (dle, ) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Gerald Dieckmann, Freckler, James Essig, "Joe" Tracey, Quimby, "Joe" Franzo, N. Perez, Joseph Esposito.(Weiss, Jed) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCOVERY ORDER #1: regarding procedures to be followed during this actions discovery procedures and deadlines. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/3/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF(db, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/4/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF(jco, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute - Discovery Disputes Only. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. Original document filed in 04cv7922, document # 36. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/28/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-10178-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01562-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01563-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01564-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01565-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01566-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01567-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01568-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01569-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01570-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01571-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-01572-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01573-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-01574-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-02910-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-02927-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03478-KMK-MDF,1:05-cv-03616-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-03705-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-04949-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05080-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05150-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05152-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-05268-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-05528-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06193-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-06780-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-06918-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07025-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07026-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07536-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07546-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07547-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07548-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07577-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07579-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07580-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07623-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07624-KMK-JCF, 1:05-cv-07625-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07626-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07670-KMK-JCF,1:05-cv-07673-KMK-JCF(db, ) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; this action 04cv7922 (Lead Case) is consolidated with 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK,1:04-cv-10178-KMK,1:05-cv-01562-KMK,1:05-cv-01563-KMK, 1:05-cv-01564-KMK,1:05-cv-01565-KMK,1:05-cv-01566-KMK,1:05-cv-01567-KMK,1:05-cv-01568-KMK, 1:05-cv-01569-KMK,1:05-cv-01570-KMK,1:05-cv-01571-KMK,1:05-cv-01572-KMK,1:05-cv-01573-KMK, 1:05-cv-01574-KMK,1:05-cv-02910-KMK,1:05-cv-02927-KMK,1:05-cv-03616-KMK,1:05-cv-03705-KMK, 1:05-cv-04949-KMK,1:05-cv-05080-KMK,1:05-cv-05150-KMK,1:05-cv-05152-KMK,1:05-cv-05268-KMK, 1:05-cv-05528-KMK,1:05-cv-06193-KMK,1:05-cv-06780-KMK,1:05-cv-06918-KMK,1:05-cv-07025-KMK, 1:05-cv-07026-KMK,1:05-cv-07536-KMK,1:05-cv-07546-KMK,1:05-cv-07547-KMK,1:05-cv-07548-KMK, 1:05-cv-07577-KMK,1:05-cv-07579-KMK,1:05-cv-07580-KMK,1:05-cv-07623-KMK,1:05-cv-07624-KMK, 1:05-cv-07625-KMK,1:05-cv-07626-KMK,1:05-cv-07670-KMK,1:05-cv-07673-KMK(Member Cases) for discovery purposes and any other case that is pending or will be filed before the undersigned and which is designated as related to the protest and arrest activity at the 2004 Republican National Convention in New York City. This caption will be the master file. These consolidated cases are referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis for discovery purposes. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/20/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-KMK-JCF,1:04-cv-09216-KMK,1:04-cv-10178-KMK,1:05-cv-01562-KMK,1:05-cv-01563-KMK, 1:05-cv-01564-KMK,1:05-cv-01565-KMK,1:05-cv-01566-KMK,1:05-cv-01567-KMK,1:05-cv-01568-KMK, 1:05-cv-01569-KMK,1:05-cv-01570-KMK,1:05-cv-01571-KMK,1:05-cv-01572-KMK,1:05-cv-01573-KMK, 1:05-cv-01574-KMK,1:05-cv-02910-KMK,1:05-cv-02927-KMK,1:05-cv-03616-KMK,1:05-cv-03705-KMK, 1:05-cv-04949-KMK,1:05-cv-05080-KMK,1:05-cv-05150-KMK,1:05-cv-05152-KMK,1:05-cv-05268-KMK, 1:05-cv-05528-KMK,1:05-cv-06193-KMK,1:05-cv-06780-KMK,1:05-cv-06918-KMK,1:05-cv-07025-KMK, 1:05-cv-07026-KMK,1:05-cv-07536-KMK,1:05-cv-07546-KMK,1:05-cv-07547-KMK,1:05-cv-07548-KMK, 1:05-cv-07577-KMK,1:05-cv-07579-KMK,1:05-cv-07580-KMK,1:05-cv-07623-KMK,1:05-cv-07624-KMK, 1:05-cv-07625-KMK,1:05-cv-07626-KMK,1:05-cv-07670-KMK,1:05-cv-07673-KMK(sac, ) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Victor Marrero no longer assigned to the case. (laq, ) (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against "Joe" Franzo, N. Perez, Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Gerald Dieckmann, Freckler, James Essig, "Joe" Tracey, Quimby, John Does, Sally Rowes, Joseph Esposito.Document filed by Carol Dudek. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Carol Dudek.(db, ) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against "Joe" Tracey, Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Gerald Dieckmann, Freckler, James Essig, Quimby, John Does, Sally Rowes, Joseph Esposito. Document filed by Carol Dudek. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Carol Dudek.(db, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2005 (db, ). (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Gerald Dieckmann, James Essig, Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Freckler, Quimby, John Does, Sally Rowes, Joseph Esposito.Document filed by Carol Dudek. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Carol Dudek,.(yv, ) (Entered: 07/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Amended Pleadings may be filed without leave of the Court until 7/29/2005. Joinder of additional parties to be accomplished by 7/29/2005. All fact discovery is to be completed within a period exceeding 120 days, with the Court's approval, if the case presents unique complexities or other exceptional circumstances, specifically by not later than 9/30/2005. Initial disclosure pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) to be completed within 14 days of the date of the parties' conference pursuant to Rule 26(f), specifically by not later than 4/21/05. Initial requests for production of documents to be served by 4/21/05. Interrogatories to be served by all party by 4/21/05 except for contention interrogatories. Fact depositions to be completed by 9/30/05. Requests to admit to be served no later than 10/31/05. All expert discovery including parties expert reports and depositions, witness lists and identification of documents pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2),(3), and 35(b), is to be completed by plaintiff 11/30/05, defendant 12/30/05. Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2005 at 10:00 AM (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/1/05) (yv, ) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Alan Kranis on behalf of City of New York (Kranis, Jay) (Entered: 04/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, John J. Colgan, Thomas Graham, Bruce Smolka, Terrence Monahan, City of New York, Freckler, Quimby, Joseph Esposito.(Weiss, Jed) (Entered: 04/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Marrero from Jay Kranis dated 3/14/05: that the time for deft to answer the complaint is extended to 4/1/05. No further extensiosn swill be considered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/15/05) (cd, ) (Entered: 03/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jed M. Weiss on behalf of City of New York (Weiss, Jed) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Victor Marrero. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jjm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2005 (jjm, ). (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:04-cv-9216. Document filed by Carol Dudek.(gf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2004 (gf, ). (Entered: 12/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against City of New York, John J. Colgan, John Does, Joseph Esposito, Freckler, Thomas Graham, Raymond Kelly, Terrence Monahan, Quimby, Sally Rowes, Bruce Smolka. (Filing Fee $ 150.00, Receipt Number 529687)Document filed by Carol Dudek.(gf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2004 (gf, ). (Entered: 12/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 232 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?