Tegal Corporation v. Raines Technologies, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-00073-EHC
District Judge Earl H. Carroll, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Tegal Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fliesler Meyer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KIRK J. DENIRO, +1 415 362 3800
Space William J. Harmon, III +1 415 362 3800
Space Sheldon R. Meyer +1 415 362 3800 +1 415 362 2928 srm@fdml.com
Space Sarah Barone Schwartz +1 415 362 3800

Toggle Switch Represented by JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Farrell +1 602 262 5900 +1 602 495 2618 mfarrell@jsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip R Wooten PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H Christian Bode +1 480 355 5020 +1 480 355 5021 hcbode@webmail.azbar.org
v.
No Logo Dorman Raines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BROENING OBERG WOODS & WILSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hope Nancy Kirsch +1 602 271 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon D Schneider +1 602 200 1288 +1 602 230 8985 jschneider@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Edeltraut Theis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeConcini McDonald Yetwin & Lacy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Cordier +1 602 282 0500 +1 602 282 0520 MCordier@dmylphx.com
Space Ira M. Schwartz +1 602 282 0500 +1 602 282 0520 ischwartz@dmylphx.com
No Logo Karl Theis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeConcini McDonald Yetwin & Lacy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Cordier +1 602 282 0500 +1 602 282 0520 MCordier@dmylphx.com
Space Ira M. Schwartz +1 602 282 0500 +1 602 282 0520 ischwartz@dmylphx.com
No Logo Raines Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BROENING OBERG WOODS & WILSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hope Nancy Kirsch +1 602 271 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon D Schneider +1 602 200 1288 +1 602 230 8985 jschneider@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Theis Enterprises Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip R Wooten PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LEE ALLEN JOHNSON +1 602 748 1402 +1 602 748 1365 lee.johnson@azbar.org
No Logo Vivian Raines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BROENING OBERG WOODS & WILSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hope Nancy Kirsch +1 602 271 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon D Schneider +1 602 200 1288 +1 602 230 8985 jschneider@soarizonalaw.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/14/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 11/13/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 53 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000, Terminated: 2/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation to dismiss case ; ORDERED granting the parties' stipulation for dismissal (of this case) with prejudice (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
    LREF
    Blank 52 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Stipulation
    STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice by pla, dfts (LAD)
      LREF
      Blank 51 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
      MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to notification of the parties that the case has settled, IT IS ORDERED vacating the status hearing set for 11/6/00 at 9:00 a.m. (cc: all counsel) [51-2] (TCA)
        LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll vacating the hearing on pla's motion for preliminary injunction set on 8/15/00 at 1:30 pm; denying without prejudice to refiling if settlement negotiations fail the motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1], granting motion to continue continue hearing on motion for preliminary injunction (set for 8/15/00) by pla Tegal Corporation, dfts Raines Technologies, Dorman Raines, Raines, Karl Theis, Edeltraut Theis [49-1] status hearing set for 9:00 11/6/00 (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 Motion to Continue
          STIPULATED MOTION to continue continue hearing on motion for preliminary injunction (set for 8/15/00) by pla Tegal Corporation, dfts Raines Technologies, Dorman Raines, Vivian Raines, Karl Theis, Edeltraut Theis [49-1] (3rd request) (LAD)
            LREF
            Blank 48 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation resetting motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] at 1:30 8/15/00 (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
              LREF
              Blank 47 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Stipulation
              STIPULATION by pla, dfts to continue hearing on motion for preliminary injunction [9-1] (LAD)
                LREF
                Blank 46 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Notice of Attorney Substitution
                ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating Lee Allen Johnson and substituting attorneys Ira M Schwartz and Michael A Cordier (LAD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion for substitution of counsel by dft Karl Theis, dft Linda (Edeltraut) Theis [44-1] (Ira M Schwartz, Michael A Cordier of Robbins & Green in place of Lee Allen Johnson of Lee Allen Johnson PC); terminating attorney Lee Allen Johnson for Edeltraut Theis and Karl Theis and substituting attorney Ira M Schwartz, Michael Andrew (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 44 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000, Terminated: 5/19/2000 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                    EX PARTE MOTION for substitution of counsel by dft Karl Theis, dft Linda (Edeltraut) Theis [44-1] (Ira M Schwartz, Michael A Cordier of Robbins & Green in place of Lee Allen Johnson of Lee Allen Johnson PC) (LAD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation resetting motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] at 1:30 6/13/00 (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Stipulation
                        STIPULATION by pla, dfts (to continue hearing on motion for preliminary injunction [9-1] to a date no sooner thatn 6/6/00) (LAD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 41 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll resetting motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] at 1:30 5/16/00 (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 40 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Earl H. Carroll Crt Rptr: Bridget Brittan Hearing begins and is recessed until until 2:30 p.m. Later, the parties request further time to explore a possible settlement of the matter. IT IS ORDERED continuing the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] to 1:30 5/16/00. Appearances: Sheldon Meyer, Christian Bode, Lee Johnson. [40-1] (BAH)
                              LREF
                              Blank 39 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/7/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                              AMENDED NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for dft Raines Technologies, dft Dorman Raines, dft Vivian Raines by Hope Nancy Kirsch, Jon D Schneider (LAD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 38 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll setting motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] at 10:00 4/10/00 (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 37 Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 Declaration
                                  NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DECLARATION OF Michael L Parodi by pla Tegal Corporation re motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] (LAD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 36 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Memorandum of Points an Authorities in REPLY by pla Tegal Corporation to response to motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 35 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE by dft Karl Theis, dft Linda Theis, dft Theis Enterprises to motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 34 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000 Answer
                                        ANSWER by dft Karl Theis, dft Linda Theis, dft Theis Enterprises to Plas First Amended Complaint (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 32 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation extending time to 2/23/00 for dfts to respond to motion for preliminary injunction and pla has to 3/6/00 to reply (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000, Terminated: 6/27/2001 Response to Motion
                                            RESPONSE by dft Raines Technologies, dft Dorman Raines, dft Vivian Raines to motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] (DMT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 31 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 Stipulation
                                              STIPULATION by pla, dfts to extend time to 2/23/00 for dfts to respond to motion for preliminary injunction re [9-1] and pla has to 3/6/00 to reply (DMT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 30 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 Answer
                                                ANSWER by dft Raines Technologies, dft Dorman Raines, dft Vivian Raines to first amended complaint (DMT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for dft Raines Technologies, dft Dorman Raines, dft Vivian Raines by Jon D Schneider (former emp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Ann Erickson for dft Raines Technologies, dft Dorman Raines, dft Vivian Raines, dft Theis Ent Inc on 2/4/00 re: amended summons and complaint (former emp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon John Schneider for dft Dorman Raines, dft Vivian Raines on 2/7/00 re: amended summons and complaint (former emp) Modified on 02/09/2000
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for dft Karl Theis, dft Linda Theis, dft Theis Ent Inc by Lee Allen Johnson (former emp) Modified on 02/09/2000
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla; jury demand [1-1] ;adding Theis Ent Inc (DMT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 Other Notice
                                                            NOTICE by pla Tegal Corporation of filing original signature page to declaration (of David Fredrickson) (LAD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: 1/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED of summons/complaint upon dft Dorman Raines, dft Vivian Raines by service upon Vivian Raines on 1/21/00 (LAD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED of summons/complaint upon dft Karl Theis personally on 1/20/00 (LAD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED of summons/complaint upon dft Linda Theis by service uppon Edeltraut Theis on 1/20/00 (LAD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/25/2000 Other Notice
                                                                    NOTICE by pla Tegal Corporation of filing original signature pages to declarations (of Stephen P DeOrnellas, Jim Apffel, Jim McKibben and Kate McCarthy) (LAD)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Sealed Document +
                                                                      SEALED Declaration by Pla (MAP)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion for confidentiality and filing under seal the Declaration of D Frederickson by pla Tegal Corporation [3-1] (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion for pro hac vice (atty Sarah Barone Schwartz) by pla Tegal Corporation [6-1] (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion for pro hac vice (atty Sheldon Meyer) by pla Tegal Corporation [5-1] (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion for pro hac vice (atty Kirk DeNiro) by pla Tegal Corporation [7-1] (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion for pro hac vice (atty William Harmon) by pla Tegal Corporation [4-1] (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Declaration
                                                                                  DECLARATION of Kate McCarthy re motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] (MAP)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Declaration
                                                                                    DECLARATION of Jim Apffel re motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] (MAP)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Declaration
                                                                                      DECLARATION of Jim McKibben re motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] (MAP)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Declaration
                                                                                        DECLARATION of Stephen DeOrnellas re motion for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] (MAP)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000, Terminated: 8/8/2000 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                          MOTION for preliminary injunction by pla Tegal Corporation [9-1] (MAP)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to exceed the page limit (motion for preliminary injunction) by pla Tegal Corporation [2-1] (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000, Terminated: 1/21/2000 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              MOTION for pro hac vice (atty Kirk DeNiro) by pla Tegal Corporation [7-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000, Terminated: 1/21/2000 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                MOTION for pro hac vice (atty Sarah Barone Schwartz) by pla Tegal Corporation [6-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000, Terminated: 1/21/2000 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  MOTION for pro hac vice (atty Sheldon Meyer) by pla Tegal Corporation [5-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000, Terminated: 1/21/2000 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    MOTION for pro hac vice (atty William Harmon) by pla Tegal Corporation [4-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000, Terminated: 1/21/2000 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                      EX PARTE MOTION for confidentiality and filing under seal the Declaration of D Frederickson by pla Tegal Corporation [3-1] (document lodged at Clk's desk) (MAP)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000, Terminated: 1/21/2000 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                        MOTION to exceed the page limit (motion for preliminary injunction) by pla Tegal Corporation [2-1] (lodged document at Clk's desk) (MAP)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed regarding (patent/trademark). Copy of complaint and docket sent to Washington, DC. (MAP)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 220 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?