LABR v. Intermountain Res
Federal Court Proceeding Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-mc-00001-BNB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Department of Labor United States Department of Labor, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lydia A. Tzagoloff +1 303 844 1748 +1 303 844 1753 Tzagoloff.Lydia@dol.gov
v.
No Logo Intermountain Resources LLC, Respondent
Office Denver
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 999 - Miscellaneous Cases
Cause Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Montrose
Terminated 5/23/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Affidavit/Return of Service
RETURN OF SERVICE by petitioner of warrant [3-1]. Warrant not service as it was not needed to conduct its inspection. Case can now be closed. (gms)
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
    Inspection WARRANT issued by Magistrate Judge Boland (bpm)
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Affidavit
      AFFIDAVIT of John Healy re: petition for application for administrative inspection warrant pursuant to OSHEA [1-1] (bpm)
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Petition
        Application (PETITION) by petitioner for an administrative inspection warrant pursuant to OSHEA (bpm)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 66 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?