United Assoc Of Jour, et al v. United Assoc Of Jour, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 2:90-cv-00244-TEC
District Judge T. Emmet Clarie, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge T. Emmet Clarie
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Leonard, Murray, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Ford, Plaintiff
No Logo Steamfitters Local No. 218, Plaintiff
No Logo United Assoc Of Journeymen & Apprentices, Plumbing/pipe, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Dominic Carnavale, Defendant
No Logo Donald McNamara, Defendant
No Logo Law Offices Of John J Murray, Defendant
Officially listed as "John J. Murray"
No Logo M. Eddie Moore, Defendant
No Logo Marvin J. Boede, Defendant
No Logo United Assoc Of Journeymen & Apprentices Plumbing/pipe, Defendant
Attributes
Office Hartford
Filed 3/19/1990
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 730 - Labor: Reporting/Disclosure
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 5/13/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1992, Entered: 10/1/1992 Remark
Defendant's Exhibits A - I sent 9/1/92; receipt acknowledged by Jrome Paun 9/29/92 (Carpenter, M.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: 9/23/1992 Remark
Plaintiff's Exhibits destroyed as they were not picked up by 9/15/92 per ltr 9/1/92 (Carpenter, M.)
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 5/13/1992, Entered: 5/13/1992 Order on Motion for Judgment
JUDGMENT re: It is ord that this act be and h3erevby is dismissed w/out costs to any party .. for United Assoc Of Jour, John J. Murray, M. Eddie Moore, Donald McNamara against United Assoc Of Jour, Steamfitters Local N, Leonard Murray ( signed by Clerk ) (Former Employee)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/13/1992, Entered: 5/13/1992 Terminated Case
Case closed (Johnson, D.)
LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 4/8/1992, Entered: 4/8/1992 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 16(a) Lack of Prosecution. Status Report due on 4/28/92 ( Signed by Clerk ) (Former Employee)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 54 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?