Shuch v. CBT, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 2:91-cv-00948-JAC
District Judge Jose A. Cabranes, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Frank M. Shuch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Byrne +1 860 725 6200
Space John C. Peters +1 860 559 1904 pete68may@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David I. Goldblatt +1 212 969 3000
v.
No Logo Bank Of Boston Connecticut, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Marie Young +1 617 951 2505

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duane R. Nelson +1 860 275 0100
Space John B. Nolan +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 jbnolan@DayPitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon, Matthew Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Dallas Gordon +1 860 523 0471 +1 860 523 0472 mattgordon@mdgordonlaw.com
No Logo Connecticut Bank & Trust Co, N.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Marie Young +1 617 951 2505

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duane R. Nelson +1 860 275 0100
Space John B. Nolan +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 jbnolan@DayPitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon, Matthew Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Dallas Gordon +1 860 523 0471 +1 860 523 0472 mattgordon@mdgordonlaw.com
No Logo Mechanics Savings Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard K. Lublin +5615 561 561 5000

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duane R. Nelson +1 860 275 0100
Space John B. Nolan +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 jbnolan@DayPitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon, Matthew Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Dallas Gordon +1 860 523 0471 +1 860 523 0472 mattgordon@mdgordonlaw.com
No Logo People's Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara L. Hankin +1 203 221 2833 +1 203 221 2638 blhankin@aol.com
Space Hal M. Hirsch +1 212 801 9200

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeisler and Zeisler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James G. Verrillo +1 203 368 4234 +1 203 367 9678 jverrillo@zeislaw.com
Space Richard D. Zeisler +1 203 368 4234
Office Hartford
Filed 10/4/1991
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Hartford
Terminated 12/9/1993
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 12/9/1993, Entered: 12/10/1993 Order on Motion for Judgment
JUDGMENT. Case is hereby dismissed for want of prosecution. ( signed by Clerk ) (Former Employee)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/9/1993, Entered: 12/15/1993 Terminated Case
    Case closed (Graham, T.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/15/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993 Order
      ENDORSEMENT granting [17-1] motion for Thomas A. Rouse to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Thomas A. Rouse for Frank M. Shuch ( signed by Chief Judge Jose A. Cabranes ) (Former Employee)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 11/10/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 16(a) Lack of Prosecution. Status Report due on 11/30/93 ( Signed by Clerk ) (Former Employee)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
          MOTION by Frank M. Shuch for Thomas A. Rouse to Withdraw as Attorney (Former Employee)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/11/1992, Entered: 5/12/1992 Order
            ENDORSEMENT granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time until 6/8/92 to file a brief on appeal, reset Bankruptcy Briefs due 6/8/92 ( signed by Judge Jose A. Cabranes ) (Moore, P.)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: 5/8/1992 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of John C. Peters by Frank M. Shuch Re [15-1] motion to Extend Time 6/8/92 to file a brief on appeal by Frank M. Shuch (Moore, P.)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: 5/8/1992, Terminated: 5/11/1992 Motion for Extension of Time
                MOTION by Frank M. Shuch to Extend Time 6/8/92 to file a brief on appeal (Moore, P.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: 5/8/1992 Notice of Appearance/
                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Estate of Frank M. Shuch -- John C. Peters (Moore, P.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/22/1992, Entered: 5/1/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER to withdraw action of 2:91CV00951 (JAC) & 2:91CV00954 (JAC). See Order for details. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Cabranes ) (Moore, P.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/22/1992, Entered: 4/24/1992 Letter
                      LETTER dated 4/14/92 by Frank M. Shuch (Moore, P.)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/22/1992, Entered: 4/24/1992 Order
                        ENDORSEMENT [6-1] letter submitted. The clerk shall docket this letter in 2:91CV00948(JAC0 (appeal from "Intervention Order"). The Clerk shall close the cases 2:91cv00951(JAC) (appeal from "Stay Order"), and 2:91cv000954 (JAC) (appeal from "Scheduling Order"). See End Order fld 10/24/91 in 2:91cv00951 (JAC) (appellant w/d appeals from "Stay Order" & "Scheduling Order"). All revelant docket entries in 2:91CV00951 (JAC), which appear to be docket entries No. 5,8,9 &10, shall be removed by the Clerk from 2:91CV00951 (JAC) and re-docketed in the case 2:91CV948 (JAC). The parties shall file all documents relating to the so called "intervention order" in 2:91cv00948 (JAC) A. Cabranes ) (Moore, P.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/8/1992 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 16(a) Lack of Prosecution. Status Report due on 4/27/92 ( Signed by Clerk ) (Moore, P.)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/30/1992, Entered: 4/30/1992 Order
                            ENDORSEMENT granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to serve & file appellant's brief, set Bankruptcy Briefs due 5/8/92 ( signed by Judge Jose A. Cabranes ) (Moore, P.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/30/1992 Motion for Extension of Time
                              MOTION by Frank M. Shuch to Extend Time to serve & file appellant's brief (Moore, P.)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1992, Entered: 4/30/1992 Order
                                ENDORSEMENT granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to serve & file appellate brief. Appellant shall serve and file his brief on appeal by no later than 3/27/92. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Cabranes ) (Moore, P.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/29/1992, Entered: 4/30/1992 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  MOTION by Frank M. Shuch to Extend Time to serve & file appellate brief (Moore, P.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: 4/30/1992 Order
                                    ENDORSEMENT granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to serve & file appellate brief. Appellant shall serve & file his brief on appeal by ;no later than 1/31/92 ( signed by Judge Jose A. Cabranes ) (Moore, P.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/9/1991, Entered: 4/30/1992 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      MOTION by Frank M. Shuch to Extend Time to serve & file appellate brief (Moore, P.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 10/24/1991, Entered: 4/30/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER. Apellant Frank M. Shuch shall have until 11/21/91 to serve & file his brief on appeal from the 8/21/91 Order of the US. Bankruptcy Court for the Dist of CT (Krechevsky, C.J.) ("the Bankruptcy Court") granting motion by the Trustee of Colonial Realty Co to intervene in Shuch's proceeding under Chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code. See Order for details. ( signed by Judge Jose A. Cabranes ) (Moore, P.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/24/1991, Entered: 4/30/1992 Order
                                          ENDORSEMENT granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to serve & file appellate brief ( signed by Judge Jose A. Cabranes ) (Moore, P.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/22/1991, Entered: 4/30/1992 Affidavit
                                            AFFIDAVIT of David JI. Goldblatt by Frank M. Shuch Re [7-1] motion to Extend Time to serve & file appellate brief by Frank M. Shuch (Moore, P.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/22/1991, Entered: 4/30/1992 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              MOTION by Frank M. Shuch to Extend Time to serve & file appellate brief (Moore, P.)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?