Bagley v. Yale University et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01890
District Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2017 at 2:51 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Constance E. Bagley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Nelson +1 617 345 3205 +1 617 345 3299 enelson@burnslev.com
Space Carla A. Reeves +1 617 345 3254 +1 617 345 3299 creeves@burnslev.com
Space Laura R. Studen +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 LStuden@burnslev.com
Space Ellen J. Zucker +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 ezucker@burnslev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FordHarrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy M. Cieslak +1 860 748 4660 +1 860 241 1547 ccieslak@fordharrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Kallor LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Rose +1 860 748 4660 +1 860 241 1547 mrose@rosekallor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Todd & Weld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexandra H. Deal +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 adeal@toddweld.com
v.
No Logo Andrew Metrick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Douglas Rae, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Edward Snyder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
Yale University Yale University, Defendant
Unknown Role, Mark Centers Trust
Unknown Role, JBG SMITH Properties
Unknown Role, Douglas Emmett Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (204) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Response
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None extension of time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Objection
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Compel
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 188 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Carla A. Reeves. Attorney Carla A. Reeves of Burns & Levinson LLP requests leave to withdraw her appearance on behalf of Plaintiff Constance E. Bagley in this action. The Court notes that Attorneys Laura R. Studen and Ellen J. Zucker of the same law firm entered appearances on behalf of Plaintiff and continue to represent her in this action. See Doc. 10 & 81 (Appearances of Studen and Zucker, respectively). Plaintiff also continues to be represented in this action by local counsel, Michael J. Rose and Cindy M. Cieslak (nee Miller) of the law firm FordHarrison, LLP. See Doc. 2 & 74 (Appearances of Rose and Miller, respectively). Under these circumstances, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(e), Attorney Reeves's motion is GRANTED and her appearance is TERMINATED. Attorney Reeves is directed to provide Plaintiff with "actual notice by personal service or by certified mail of the motion to withdraw" and this Court's ruling thereon. D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(e). Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on July 1, 2016. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Carla A. Reeves to Withdraw as Attorney by Constance E. Bagley. (Reeves, Carla) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 187 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        RULING amending and replacing 186 Ruling (see attached). The Court's Ruling [Doc. 186 ] on Plaintiff's 172 Omnibus Motion, filed on June 14, 2016, is withdrawn. An amended Ruling is herewith filed in its place. The amendment corrects the omission of a word on page 35 of Doc. 186 , at line 14. The phrase "effort to that claim" is amended to read "effort to prove that claim." It is So Ordered. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 15, 2016. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                          LREF
                          Blank 186 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                          RULING (see attached) granting in part and denying in part 172 Plaintiff's Omnibus Motion. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 14, 2016. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Supplemental Memorandum in Support re 172 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance with Court Orders and Discovery Requests filed by Constance E. Bagley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Reeves, Carla) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RESPONSE re 179 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                RULING (see attached) granting 175 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on April 15, 2016. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER, granting for good cause shown, 180 Defendants' Motion For Permission to File Response. Because Defendants' proposed response to 179 Plaintiff's Reply in Support of her 172 Omnibus Motion will briefly respond to issues and arguments which Defendants say are raised by the Plaintiff for the first time in her 179 Reply, the Court grants leave for Defendants to file a response or "sur-reply" which will "not exceed five pages" and will be filed on or before April 15, 2016. See, e.g., Travelers Indem. Co. v. Excalibur Reinsurance Corp., No. 3:11-CV-1209 (CSH), 2013 WL 4012795, at *3 (D. Conn. Aug. 5, 2013) ("When new evidence appears in opposition papers, the non-moving party should seek leave, or may receive the Court's sua sponte permission, to file a sur-reply to address those new issues.") (citing Guadagni v. New York City Transit Auth., 387 F. App'x 124, 126 (2d Cir. 2010); Goins v. JBC & Assoc., P.C., 352 F.Supp.2d 262, 270 n. 3 (D.Conn. 2005)). Plaintiff, as the moving party, may, if so advised, on or before April 19, 2016, file a response to Defendants' sur-reply, limited to the arguments made in that submission. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on April 14, 2016.(Dorais, L.) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Response
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/14/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Minute EntryTelephonic Status Conference held on 2/5/2016 with counsel for the plaintiff: Laura R. Studen and Ellen J. Zucker and for the defendants: Matthew Geelan substituting for Patrick Noonan Total Time: 1 hours and 50 minutes (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Status Conference set for 2/5/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Charles S. Haight Jr. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER and NOTICE OF CONFERENCE. The Court has heard from Plaintiff's counsel, on behalf of all parties, pursuant to the Court's January 26, 2016 order. 164 . The parties are notified that the Court has scheduled a telephonic status conference with respect to this case for Friday, February 5, 2016 at 2:00 p.m., at which time the parties are directed to jointly dial chambers at 203-773-2052. The parties should be prepared to discuss all case management and discovery issues, including, but not limited to, a case scheduling order. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on January 27, 2016. (White, B.) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER and NOTICE OF CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference in this case to ascertain the present state of discovery, as well as the parties' respective positions as to a case scheduling order. The parties should jointly confer and select a date at which representatives from both parties are available for such a conference, to take place at 2:00 p.m. on any of the following dates: January 28, January 29, or any day during the week of February 1-5. One representative of the parties should notify chambers of the date selected at 203-773-2052. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on January 26, 2016. (White, B.) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Clarification
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Clarification
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to 135 MOTION to Compel . Defendant'sResponses due by 11/16/2015. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry. Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2015 re 135 MOTION to Compel held before Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. MOTION to Compel 135 is being taken under advisement.Total Time: 1 hours and 49 minutesCourt Reporter M. Falzarano.) (Campbell, A) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, 148 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests. Plaintiff must respond to Defendants' Second Request for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories (dated September 11, 2015) on or before October 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on October 26, 2015. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 142 Motion for Carla A. Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/7/2015. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2015. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, 140 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests. Plaintiff must respond to Defendants' Second Request for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories (dated September 11, 2015) on or before October 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on October 7, 2015. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to 135 MOTION to Compel . Responses due by 10/13/2015 (Perez, J.) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, 138 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Defendants may file their objection to 135 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel on or before October 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on October 6, 2015. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER and NOTICE OF HEARING. The Court will conduct a status conference and hear oral argument on the 135 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Yale University to Produce Documents on Wednesday, October 28, 2015, beginning at 2:00 p.m., in the Courtroom on the 17th Floor of the Connecticut Financial Center, 157 Church Street, New Haven, Connecticut. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on September 28, 2015.(Dorais, L.) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 133 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Emily J. Nelson. Attorney Emily J. Nelson requests leave to withdraw her appearance on behalf of Plaintiff Constance E. Bagley in this action. The Court notes that there remain four counsel of record for Plaintiff, including Laura R. Studen, who is also with the law firm Burns & Levinson LLP. Pursuant to D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(e), if she has not yet done so, Attorney Nelson is directed to promptly provide Plaintiff with "actual notice by personal service or by certified mail of the motion to withdraw." Subject to completion of this notice requirement of Rule 7(e), Attorney Nelson's motion is granted and her appearance is terminated. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 25, 2015. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot 111 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Motions for Protective Orders in light of the Court's 121 Order granting 116 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw their 110 Motion for Protective Order and the Court's 130 & 131 Rulings, denying 108 & 109 Defendants' Motions for Protective Orders. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on April 27, 2015. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 126 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Although, "sur-replies are not permitted under the Local Rules of the District of Connecticut," DeRay v. Larson, No. 3:02-CV-2139(JCH), 2004 WL 2211939, at *4 (D.Conn. Sept. 29, 2004), surreply briefs may be filed "with leave of court," Marczeski v. Law, 122 F.Supp.2d 315, 317 n. 2 (D.Conn. 2000). It is thus within the Court's discretion to accept a surreply, for example, "[f]or the sake of completeness" regarding the issues litigated. See von Spee v. von Spee, 514 F.Supp. 2d 302, 305 n.9 (D.Conn. 2007). In the interest of completeness and allowing the parties to be fully heard, and absent objection from Defendants, the Court will permit Plaintiff to file her proposed 126 -1 Surreply. Plaintiff is directed to file said Surreply as a separate docket entry forthwith. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 18, 2015. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, Plaintiff's unopposed 122 Motion for Extension of Time to Replead Defamation Count against Defendant Douglas Rae. Accordingly, Plaintiff must replead her defamation count against Defendant Douglas Rae on or before April 3, 2015, or within ten (10) days after the deposition of Andrew Metrick has been completed, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 9, 2015. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 116 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw their 110 Motion for Protective Order, "seeking to limit the [P]laintiff to ten depositions." Defendants' 110 Motion for Protective Order is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 4, 2015. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot 117 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time in light of Defendants' subsequent filing of an 118 Amended Motion for Extension of Time and the Court's 119 Electronic Order granting the amended motion. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 4, 2015.(Dorais, L.) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, 118 Defendants' Amended Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' counsel represents that, due to intervening scheduled matters, he will be unable to meet the March 9, 2015 deadline to prepare and file reply memoranda in support of Defendants' 108 & 109 Motions for Protective Order. He thus requests a two-day extension to file said reply memoranda and indicates that Plaintiff "does not object" to the requested extension "as it relates to either" of the two Motions for Protective Order. Accordingly, pursuant to Local Rule 7(b)(2) of Civil Procedure, Defendants may reply in support of their Motions for Protective Order [Doc. 108 and 109 ] on or before March 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 4, 2015.(Dorais, L.) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: On December 22, 2014, the Court filed an Opinion [doc. 103] in this case. By indavertence, a section of the discussion on the issue of delay was omitted. After the Christmas holiday, the opinion will be withdrawn and a revised opinion will be filed. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 12/23/2014.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Marked Exhibit and Witness List. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr: taking under advisement 62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/11/2014; Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2014 re 62 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Constance E. Bagley. Total Time: 4 hours and 40 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano Reporting.) (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr: taking under advisement 62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing held on 12/10/2014 re 62 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Constance E. Bagley ; Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/10/2014. Total Time: 4 hours and 40 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano Reporting.) (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr: taking under advisement 62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/9/2014; Motion Hearing held on 12/9/2014 re 62 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Constance E. Bagley. Total Time: 6 hours and 35 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano Reporting.) (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr: taking under advisement 62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 84 Motion to Bifurcate; Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/8/2014; Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2014 re 84 MOTION to Bifurcate Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Douglas Rae, Yale University, Edward Snyder, Andrew Metrick, 62 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Constance E. Bagley. Total Time: 5 hours and 20 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER unsealing Exhibits H & I [Doc. 66 , 67 & 83 ] in support of 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court has reviewed the parties' 86 Joint Notice, informing the Court that "Plaintiff's counsel has conferred with counsel for the Defendants and the Parties agree that these Exhibits [H & I] do not require sealing and may be used at the hearings" on the Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Accordingly, Exhibits H and I are hereby UNSEALED and may be used by the parties at the hearing, which will commence on December 8, 2014, and continue each day until concluded. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on December 3, 2014.(Dorais, L.) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER. Attorney Emily Nelson has phoned Chambers to indicate that Plaintiff's counsel have altered their travel arrangements to New Haven and thus withdraw their request to begin the hearing on 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on December 8, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. The Court therefore re-sets the start time of the hearing on December 8, 2014 to 9:30 a.m. All subsequent dates of the hearing will also commence at 9:30 a.m., as previously scheduled. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on December 3, 2014.(Dorais, L.) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Bifurcate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 76 Motion for Ellen J. Zucker to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/20/2015. Signed by Clerk on 11/21/2014. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER on Start Time of Hearing. By telephone call to Chambers, Emily Nelson, an attorney for the Plaintiff, requested that the hearing days on 62 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction begin at 11:00 a.m. That motion is GRANTED with respect to the first day of the hearing, which is December 8, 2014. With respect to all subsequent hearing days, the hearing will resume at the customary time for trials in this District, namely 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on November 19, 2014. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER to Seal Documents until November 24, 2014. Pursuant to the Court's 65 Ruling denying without prejudice 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal, the Court hereby temporarily seals 66 Exhibit H and 67 Exhibit I up till and including November 24, 2014. Plaintiff has represented that Defendants have marked these documents as "confidential" pursuant to the Court's 49 Confidentiality Order, Doc. 63 , at 1 (para. 2). Accordingly, under the 49 Confidentiality Order, "the filing party" of said documents with the Court "shall request an order from the Court that any information subject to this [Confidentiality] Order be sealed and be unavailable to the public." Doc. 49 , at 4 (para. 5). As stated in the Court's 65 Ruling, 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal was denied without prejudice in that it failed to meet the requirements for sealing under Local Civil Rule 5(e)(3). Plaintiff may file an amended motion to seal on or before November 24, 2014, "demonstrating that sealing is supported by clear and compelling reasons and is narrowly tailored to serve those reasons," D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 5(e)(3). Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on November 19, 2014. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 58 Plaintiff's Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time to Replead Defamation Count. Plaintiff must replead her defamation count on or before October 20, 2014, which is ten (10) days after Yale's latest deadline to respond to her discovery requests [Doc. 56 - 10/8/2014 deadline to answer discovery requests dated 7/8/2014; Doc. 59 - 10/10/2014 deadline to answer interrogatories dated 8/11/2014], or within ten (10) days after the deposition of Defendant Douglas Rae has been completed, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on September 10, 2014. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, Defendant Yale University's 57 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Yale must answer Plaintiff's interrogatories (dated August 11, 2014) "to which no objection has been taken" on or before October 10, 2014. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on September 10, 2014. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER. On August 7, 2014, defendants filed a motion Doc. 50 "for a 60 day extension of time, up to and including October 8, 2014, within which to answer plaintiff's discovery requests dated July 8, 2014 to which no objection has been taken." Plaintiff objects to any extension. Defendants' motion would appear to be another example of that familiar but disfavored tactical maneuver: waiting until the last day before some action is due before asking the court for more time to do it or complete doing it. Defendants' 50 motion and 53 amended motion are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on August 27, 2014. (Pylman, J.) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition in Response to Court's June 30, 2014 Order re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Constance E. Bagley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Webpage, # 2 Exhibit B - Hendel Letter, # 3 Exhibit C - Worksharing Agreement, # 4 Exhibit D - Notice of Right to Request Review, # 5 Exhibit E - CHRO Right to Sue Letter (Sept. 2013))(Studen, Laura) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Memorandum in Support re 28 MOTION to Dismiss in Compliance with Court's June 30, 2014 Order filed by Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 43 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Alexandra H. Deal. Attorney Deal has requested leave to withdraw her appearance on behalf of Plaintiff Constance E. Bagley. In so moving, Attorney Deal has represented that Attorneys Laura R. Studen and Emily J. Nelson have filed appearances on behalf of Plaintiff and will continue to represent her in this action. See Doc. 10 , 11 (Notices of Appearance by Studen and Nelson). Pursuant to Local Rule 7(e) of Civil Procedure, "the party whose counsel seeks to withdraw [must have] received actual notice by personal service or by certified mail of the motion to withdraw." D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(e) (emphasis added). Accordingly, the Court grants Attorney Deal's motion to withdraw her appearance with the accompanying ORDER that, if she has not yet done so, Attorney Deal promptly provide the requisite notice of her motion and this Order to Plaintiff by personal service or by certified mail. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on July 3, 2014. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER re 42 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Confidentiality Order in Final Form Pursuant to Court Order by Constance E. Bagley. (Studen, Laura) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER for further briefing Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 6/30/2014.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to withdraw as attorney by Constance E. Bagley NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ALEXANDRA H. DEAL (Nelson, Emily) Modified on 7/1/2014 to correct relief(Falcone, K.). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ruling and Order granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Counsel for Plaintiff are directed to submit an Order in final form, consistent with this Ruling.. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 6/27/2014. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr: taking under advisement 33 Motion for Protective Order; taking under advisement 28 Motion to Dismiss; Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2014 re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Douglas Rae, Yale University, Edward Snyder, Andrew Metrick, 33 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Constance E. Bagley. Total Time: 1 hour and 25 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano Reporting.) (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING. The time of the hearing before Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. for oral argument on Defendants' 28 Motion to Dismiss, previously set for 1:00 pm on Wednesday, June 25, 2014, is hereby moved to 11:00 am on that same date. As previously designated, the hearing will take place in the 17th Floor Courtroom at 157 Church Street, New Haven, Connecticut. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 23, 2014. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 37 Reply to Response to Motion for Protective Order and Motion for Entry of Proposed Confidentiality Order filed by Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 33 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Constance E. Bagley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to Yale Employees of Electronic Monitoring)(Studen, Laura) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Constance E. Bagley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - December 23, 2013 Letter to CHRO, # 2 Exhibit 2 - December 23, 2013 Letter to EEOC, # 3 Exhibit 3 - May 22, 2014 Notice of Right to Sue, # 4 Exhibit 4 - January 10, 2014 Letter from Yale)(Studen, Laura) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION re 33 MOTION for Protective Order and Entry of Confidentiality Order filed by Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Confidentiality Order)(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER expediting briefing on 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff has presented the Court with a "Proposed Order on Confidentiality," representing that such an order is necessary "to facilitate discovery while protecting the privacy of non-parties with respect [to] confidential and/or private information, and the legal obligations of educational institutions with regard to disclosure of student-related data." Doc. 33 -1, p. 1. In her motion she states that "[t]he parties in good faith, over the course of approximately one month, attempted to reach agreement on the scope of confidentiality, but have been unable to do so." Doc. 33 , para.2. Plaintiff represents that "[t]he parties' inability to reach an agreement on this issue has caused undue delays in discovery that threaten to substantially prejudice the Plaintiff and her ability to litigate this case in a timely manner." Id., para. 3. Pursuant to D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(a)(1), in the interest of avoiding further delay of discovery in this matter, the Court hereby sets an expedited briefing schedule with respect to Plaintiff's 33 Motion. Therefore, Defendants shall file their responsive brief to this 33 Motion on or before May 30, 2014. Plaintiff, may, if so advised, reply to Defendants' response on or before June 6, 2014. If the Court desires oral argument on this motion, counsel will be advised. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 21, 2014. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Constance E. Bagley.Responses due by 6/10/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Confidentiality Order)(Studen, Laura) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, 31 Plaintiff's Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file her response to 28 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before May 30, 2014 and Defendants may, if so advised, file their reply to Plaintiff's response on or before June 20, 2014. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on April 28, 2014. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PLAINTIFFS ASSENTED-TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss until 5/30/14 by Constance E. Bagley. (Studen, Laura) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER and NOTICE OF HEARING. Pursuant to the teleconference before the Court on March 21, 2014, with counsel for all parties participating, the Court hereby sets the following deadlines for briefing with respect to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 28 ]: Plaintiff must file her opposition or response to the motion on or before Tuesday, April 29, 2014; Defendants must, if so advised, file their reply to Plaintiff's response on or before Tuesday, May 20, 2014. The parties shall appear before the Court for an oral argument on Defendants' 28 Motion to Dismiss on Wednesday, June 25, 2014 at 1:00 pm in the 17th Floor Courtroom at 157 Church Street, New Haven, Connecticut. With respect to discovery, all depositions are stayed pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's 28 Motion to Dismiss. However, requests for the production of documents will proceed at present and while the 28 Motion remains sub judice. Specifically, the parties will continue to follow this District's "Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action." These protocols are expressly designed "to encourage parties and their counsel to exchange the most relevant information and documents early in the case, to assist in framing the issues to be resolved and to plan for more efficient and targeted discovery." See Protocols, Pt. 1. Plaintiff has not "opted out" of said protocols (i.e., has not indicated that the protocols do not apply to this case) by filing the requisite statement within seven days following the Clerk's filing of the protocols notice; and counsel have agreed to cooperate with said "paper discovery." Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 21, 2014.(Dorais, L.) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support re 28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss by Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University.Responses due by 4/10/2014 (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. Pursuant to the joint request of counsel for all parties, the Telephone Status Conference, previously scheduled for Tuesday, March 18, 2014 at 2:00 p.m., is hereby moved to Friday, March 21, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. All other parameters previously set by the Court remain in effect. Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the conference by phoning Chambers at (203) 773-2052 with Defendants' counsel on the line. Counsel for all parties shall prepare to present their proposed case deadlines and such additional issues as may assist the Court in governance of the case. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 5, 2014.(Dorais, L.) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. The Telephone Status Conference, previously scheduled for Thursday, February 27, 2014, at 2:00 p.m., is hereby moved to Tuesday, March 18, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. All other parameters previously set by the Court remain in effect. Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the conference by phoning Chambers at (203) 773-2052 with Defendants' counsel on the line. Counsel for all parties shall prepare to present their proposed case deadlines and such additional issues as may assist the Court in governance of the case. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on February 24, 2014. (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 2/27/2014 02:00 PM before Judge Charles S. Haight Jr. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference by calling chambers at 203-773-2052 with defendant's counsel on the line. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER and NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 12 Rule 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and notes that they have requested a pretrial conference with the Court, preferably "by telephone," "before entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)." See Doc. 12 , p. 6. Moreover, the parties' Rule 26(f) Report reflects that they have been unable to reach agreement as to the majority of proposed case deadlines, certain instances with explanation and others without. Under these circumstances, the Court hereby schedules a Telephone Status Conference for Thursday, February 27, 2014, at 2:00 p.m., before Judge Charles S. Haight Jr. Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the conference by phoning Chambers at (203) 773-2052 with Defendants' counsel on the line. Counsel shall be prepared to present and explain the parties' proposed case deadlines at that time, as well as such additional issues as may be profitably explored in order to further the proper governance of the case. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on February 20, 2014.(Dorais, L.) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Deal, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time until March 20, 2014 to respond to complaint. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2014. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/20/2014and/or Clarification Response to Complaint 1 Complaint by Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 18 Motion for Alexandra Deal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2014. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney(s) Alexandra H. Deal to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3134381) by Constance E. Bagley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Rose, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Laura R. Studen and Emily J. Nelson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3115776) by Constance E. Bagley. (Studen, Laura) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Laura R. Studen and Emily J. Nelson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3115776) by Constance E. Bagley. (Nelson, Emily) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Andrew Metrick waiver sent on 12/20/2013, answer due 2/18/2014 filed by Constance E. Bagley. (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Edward Snyder waiver sent on 12/20/2013, answer due 2/18/2014 filed by Constance E. Bagley. (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Yale University waiver sent on 12/20/2013, answer due 2/18/2014 filed by Constance E. Bagley. (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Douglas Rae waiver sent on 12/20/2013, answer due 2/18/2014 filed by Constance E. Bagley. (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Emily J. Nelson on behalf of Constance E. Bagley (Nelson, Emily) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Laura R. Studen on behalf of Constance E. Bagley (Studen, Laura) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 8 Motion for Laura Studen and Emily Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificates of Good Standing due by 3/10/2014. Signed by Clerk on 1/9/2014. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney(s) Laura R. Studen and Emily J. Nelson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3115776) by Constance E. Bagley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Rose, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Constance E. Bagley, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 1 Complaint filed by Constance E. Bagley, 5 Notice, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 12/23/13.(Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 12/20/13. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment)(Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 12/20/13.(Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/20/14. Discovery due by 6/21/2014 Signed by Clerk on 12/20/13.(Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Rose on behalf of Constance E. Bagley (Rose, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Andrew Metrick, Douglas Rae, Edward Snyder, Yale University ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3103193.), filed by Constance E. Bagley.(Rose, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 711 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?