Dumas v. Bush, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 2:92-cv-00617-TFGD
District Judge T. F. Gilroy Daly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert R. Dumas, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo George Bush, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John B. Hughes +1 203 821 3802 +1 203 773 5373 john.hughes@usdoj.gov
No Logo James A. Baker, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John B. Hughes +1 203 821 3802 +1 203 773 5373 john.hughes@usdoj.gov
No Logo James P. Clapper, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John B. Hughes +1 203 821 3802 +1 203 773 5373 john.hughes@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael P.W. Stone, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John B. Hughes +1 203 821 3802 +1 203 773 5373 john.hughes@usdoj.gov
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard B. Cheney"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John B. Hughes +1 203 821 3802 +1 203 773 5373 john.hughes@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John B. Hughes +1 203 821 3802 +1 203 773 5373 john.hughes@usdoj.gov
Office Hartford
Filed 7/20/1992
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 444 - Civil Rights: Welfare
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 3/16/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/16/1993, Entered: 3/16/1993 Terminated Case
Case closed (Torday, B.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/16/1993, Entered: 3/16/1993 Order
    ENDORSEMENT granting [10-1] motion to Withdraw Without Prejudice [1-1] complaint ( signed by Judge T. F. Gilroy Daly ) (Torday, B.)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 1/11/1993, Entered: 1/13/1993 Motion to Withdraw
      MOTION by Robert R. Dumas to Withdraw Without Prejudice [1-1] complaint (Former Employee)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/29/1992, Entered: 1/11/1993 Order
        ENDORSEMENT granting [9-1] motion to Transfer Case from docket of Judge Nevas ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Kolesnikoff, D.)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/28/1992, Entered: 12/28/1992 Case Assigned/Reassigned
          CASE reassigned to Judge T. F. Gilroy Daly (Lopez, B.)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 12/21/1992, Entered: 12/22/1992 Description not availableCourt Filing
            MOTION by George Bush, James A. Baker III, Richard B. Cheney, Michael P.W. Stone, Robert M. Gates, James P. Clapper Jr. to Transfer Case from docket of Judge Nevas (Brief Due 1/11/93 ) (Kolesnikoff, D.)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 11/19/1992, Entered: 11/20/1992 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION by Robert R. Dumas for informal hearing (Former Employee)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1992, Entered: 11/20/1992 Order
                ENDORSEMENT denying [8-1] motion for informal hearing ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Former Employee)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/4/1992, Entered: 11/4/1992 Notice of Appearance/
                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for George Bush, James A. Baker III, Richard B. Cheney, Michael P.W. Stone, Robert M. Gates, James P. Clapper Jr. -- John B. Hughes (Former Employee)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/26/1992, Entered: 10/27/1992 Order
                    ENDORSEMENT denying/ mooting [3-1] motion to have USM serve defts Rbert M Gates, and Lt. General James P. Clapper, Jr. ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Former Employee)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/23/1992, Entered: 11/2/1992 Summons Returned Executed
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed via Certified mail receipts as to George Bush 7/23/92, James A. Baker 7/24/92 III, Richard B. Cheney, Michael P.W. Stone 7/29/92, Robert M. Gates unexecuted, James P. Clapper Jr. unexecuted (Former Employee)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/21/1992, Entered: 10/22/1992 Motion for Sanctions
                        MOTION by Robert R. Dumas for Sanctions for failure to comply with the FRCP on the receipt of summons and complaint. (Former Employee)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/21/1992, Entered: 10/22/1992 Order
                          ENDORSEMENT denying [5-1] motion for Sanctions for failure to comply with the FRCP on the receipt of summons and complaint. ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Former Employee)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/30/1992, Entered: 10/1/1992 Order
                            ENDORSEMENT granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time until 60 days after proper service has been made. ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Former Employee)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/28/1992, Entered: 9/28/1992, Terminated: 9/30/1992 Motion for Extension of Time
                              MOTION by George Bush, James A. Baker III, Richard B. Cheney, Michael P.W. Stone, Robert M. Gates, James P. Clapper Jr. to Extend Time until 60 days after proper service has been made. (Former Employee)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/2/1992, Entered: 9/3/1992 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                MOTION by Robert R. Dumas to have USM serve defts Rbert M Gates, and Lt. General James P. Clapper, Jr. (Former Employee)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/20/1992, Entered: 7/22/1992 Scheduling Order
                                  ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Joining of Parties, Amending of Pleadings by 9/28/92 Motions to Dismiss by 10/28/92 ; Discovery cutoff 1/19/93 ; Motion for Summary Judgment by 2/25/93 (Former Employee)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/20/1992, Entered: 7/22/1992 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 119386 (Former Employee)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1992, Entered: 7/22/1992 Summons Issued
                                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for George Bush, James A. Baker III, Richard B. Cheney, Michael P.W. Stone, Robert M. Gates, James P. Clapper Jr. (Former Employee)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?