Martin v. IRS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:00-cv-01631-AWT
District Judge Alvin W. Thompson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Royal R. Martin, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Irs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy J. Kisch +1 202 307 6553 +1 282 514 5238 wendy.j.kisch@usdoj.gov
Space Lisa E. Perkins +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 760 7979 lisa.perkins@usdoj.gov
Office New Haven
Filed 8/25/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $60000
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County New London
Terminated 2/4/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Order on Motion for Judgment
JUDGMENT for IRS against Royal R. Martin ( signed by Clerk ) (Gothers, M.)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ( signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson ) (Gothers, M.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Terminated Case
      Case closed (Gothers, M.)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002 Order
        ENDORSEMENT granting [17-1] motion for William A. Collier to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney William A. Collier for IRS ( signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson ) (Gothers, M.)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002, Terminated: 1/30/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
          MOTION by IRS for William A. Collier to Withdraw as Attorney (Gothers, M.)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Notice of Appearance/
            APPEARANCE of Attorney for IRS -- Lisa E. Perkins (Gothers, M.)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER of Notice to Pro Se Litigant. If no opposition is filed the defendant's motion for judgment will be granted, reset Dismissal due by 1/30/02 ( signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson ) (Walker, J.)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Order
                ENDORSEMENT granting [13-1] motion to Stay discovery, reset Discovery deadline to 4/2/02 Discovery shall be stayed until 4/2/02 ( signed by Judge W. Thompson ) (Gothers, M.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER of Notice to Pro Se Litigant. If no opposition is filed, the respondent's motion will be granted, Brief Deadline reset for 12/21/01 [11-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ( signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson ) (Gothers, M.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001, Terminated: 12/5/2001 Motion to Stay
                    MOTION by IRS to Stay discovery (Bauer, J.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                      MEMORANDUM by IRS in support of [11-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Bauer, J.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001, Terminated: 2/4/2002 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                        MOTION by IRS for Judgment on the Pleadings (Brief Due 12/17/01 ) (Bauer, J.)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Order
                          ENDORSEMENT approving [10-1] report, reset Discovery deadline to 3/4/02 , reset Dispositive Motions due by 4/8/02 , set Filing of Trial Memorandum due by 5/6/02 ( signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson ) (Gothers, M.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001, Terminated: 11/21/2001 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                            REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting (Gothers, M.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER of Notice to Pro Se Litigant. If no opposition is filed by 12/21/01, the respondent's motion will be granted, reset Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/01 ( signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson ) (Gothers, M.) Modified on 11/16/2001
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 Status Conference
                                Telephone Status Conference held ( AWT) (Gothers, M.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for IRS -- William A. Collier (Gothers, M.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                    Deadline updated; reset Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/01 (Gothers, M.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Answer
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by IRS (Grady, B.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for IRS -- Wendy J. Kisch (Grady, B.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed on 8/7/01 as to IRS, John Ashcroft, & U.S. Attorney's Office (Gothers, M.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Summons Issued
                                            SUMMONS(ES) re-issued for IRS, US Attorney's Office and John Ashcroft, Attorney General (Jefferson, V.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              Notice & ORDER to Pro Se Litigant re: service of summons & complaint upon the IRS by 8/27/01. ( signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson ) (Gothers, M.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Scheduling Order
                                                ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 2/24/01 ; Dispositive Motions due 3/26/01 Amended Pleadings due 10/25/00 Motions to Dismiss due 11/25/00 (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H001194 (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Summons Issued
                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for IRS (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?