Magnetic Action Toy
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 07255968
Examiner Mickey Yu, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ross, Bruce, Applicant

Represented by BRUCE ROSS

Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Ross, Bruce, Randallstown, MD (US)
Filing Date October 11, 1988
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number
Confirmation Number 5883
Group Art Unit 3301
Class / Sub-Class 446 / 132
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Assignments (0) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 9/23/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Set Application Status
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 12/21/1989, Entered: None Transaction History
    Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 7/28/1989, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Fee Payment Verified
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 7/12/1989, Entered: None Transaction History
        Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 7/12/1989, Entered: None Transaction History
          Mail Notice of Allowance
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 7/7/1989, Entered: None Transaction History
            Amendment after Final Rejection
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 6/8/1989, Entered: None Transaction History
              Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 6/5/1989, Entered: None Transaction History
                Final Rejection
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 3/24/1989, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Response after Non-Final Action
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 12/29/1988, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Mail Non-Final Rejection
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 12/19/1988, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Non-Final Rejection
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 11/23/1988, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 11/15/1988, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Application Captured on Microfilm
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 10/11/1988, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 8 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?