USA v. Daddona
Criminal Case Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:01-cr-00122-AVC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 3:07 PM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Danaher, III +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 240 3291

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria Araujo Kahn +1 203 821 3700

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office New Haven
Filed 6/6/2001
County Hartford
Terminated 3/12/2002
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1832.F
Offense Level 4
181832.F THEFT OF TRADE SECRETS
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1832.F
Offense Level 4
181832.F THEFT OF TRADE SECRETS
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1030B.F
Offense Level 4
181030B.F COMPUTER FRAUD
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Staff Notes
Refund of $1.04 to Nicholas Daddone. Overpayment of his fine. ( Per USA-FLU). VOucher # 1430603561 dated 03/28/03. (Carfora, C.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Payment
    FINE in the amount of $ 4058.96 paid in full as to Nicholas Daddona . Receipt # H8778 (Montgomery, C.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Dismissal of Counts Motion
      DISMISSAL of Count(s) as to Nicholas Daddona Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Nicholas Daddona (1) count(s) 2, 3 (D'Onofrio, B.)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Order
        ENDORSEMENT as to Nicholas Daddona granting [20-1] motion to Dismiss Counts 2 & 3 as to Nicholas Daddona (1) ( Signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (D'Onofrio, B.)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002, Terminated: 3/25/2002 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION by USA as to Nicholas Daddona to Dismiss Counts 2 & 3 (D'Onofrio, B.)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 USM Return Executed
            MARSHAL'S RETURN of service on Judgment executed as to Nicholas Daddona 3 years probation (D'Onofrio, B.)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
              JUDGMENT as to Nicholas Daddona (1) count(s) 1. Probation for term of 3 years, fine $4,000.00 on count one, 5 months home confinement with electronic monitoring, special assessment $100.00 due immediately. ( Signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (D'Onofrio, B.)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Sentencing
                Sentencing held Nicholas Daddona (1) count(s) 1 Special Assessment $100 ( AVC) (D'Onofrio, B.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Payment
                  SPECIAL ASSESSMENT in the amount of $ 100.00 paid in full as to Nicholas Daddona . Receipt # H5807 (Montgomery, C.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Order
                    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Nicholas Daddona (D'Onofrio, B.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002, Terminated: 1/24/2002 Motion to Continue
                      MOTION by Nicholas Daddona to Postpone Sentencing (Sunbury, B.)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Order
                        ENDORSEMENT as to Nicholas Daddona granting [16-1] motion to Postpone Sentencing reset Sentencing for 11:00 3/12/02 for Nicholas Daddona ( Signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Sunbury, B.)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Order
                          ENDORSEMENT as to Nicholas Daddona granting [15-1] motion to Postpone Sentencing from 12/3/01 to 1/21/02 reset Sentencing for 11:30 1/28/02 for Nicholas Daddona as to Nicholas Daddona (1) ( Signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (D'Onofrio, B.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Motion to Continue
                            MOTION by Nicholas Daddona to Postpone Sentencing from 12/3/01 to 1/21/02 (D'Onofrio, B.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Plea Agreement
                              Plea Agreement Letter as to Nicholas Daddona (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Change of Plea Hearing
                                Change of Plea as to Nicholas Daddona held Request to change plea entered earlier - GRANTED. ( AVC) (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Plea Entered
                                  PLEA entered by Nicholas Daddona . PLEA of GUILTY: Nicholas Daddona (1) count(s) 1 (Terminated motions: ) Sentencing set for 11:00 12/3/01 for Nicholas Daddona Court accepts plea. ( AVC) (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Order
                                    ENDORSEMENT as to Nicholas Daddona granting [12-1] motion For Extension of Time To File PreTrial Motions until August 28,2001 as to Nicholas Daddona (1), to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) Time Excluded from 8/7/01 to 8/28/01 ( Signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001, Terminated: 8/13/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      MOTION by Nicholas Daddona For Extension of Time To File PreTrial Motions until August 28,2001 (Sunbury, B.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                        WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Nicholas Daddona to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) (Sunbury, B.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001, Terminated: 7/25/2001 ICMS - converted docket entry
                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER by Nicholas Daddona, USA (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001 Order
                                            ENDORSEMENT as to Nicholas Daddona approving & so ordering [10-1] Protective Order as to Nicholas Daddona (1) ( Signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Order
                                              ENDORSEMENT as to Nicholas Daddona granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time until 8/7/01 to file pretrial motions as to Nicholas Daddona (1), to Continue pursuant to 18:3161(h)(8) Time Excluded from 7/5/01 to 8/7/01 ( Signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001, Terminated: 7/10/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                MOTION by Nicholas Daddona to Extend Time until 8/7/01 to file pretrial motions (Blue,A.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 USM Return Executed
                                                  MARSHAL'S RETURN of service on summons executed as to Nicholas Daddona on 6/6/01 (Blue,A.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Nicholas Daddona ( Signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith ). SEE Order for conditions of release (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Bond
                                                      Nonsurety Appearance BOND dated 4/13/01 in the Amount of $10,000.00 as to Nicholas Daddona (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Sentencing Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER as to Nicholas Daddona setting Discovery Motions due by 7/5/01 Substantive Motions due by 7/9/01 Government Response due by 7/16/01 Oral Argument Set for 7/23/01 Jury Selection for 10:00 7/25/01 for Nicholas Daddona ( signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Sunbury, B.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                          Appearance for Nicholas Daddona by Attorney William J. St. John,Jr. (Sunbury, B.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Initial Appearance
                                                            Initial presentment held as to Nicholas Daddona Defendant informed of rights. ( TPS) (Sunbury, B.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                              Appearance for Nicholas Daddona by Attorney William J. St. John Jr. (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Plea Entered
                                                                PLEA entered by Nicholas Daddona . Not Guilty: Nicholas Daddona (1) count(s) 1-2, 3 Court accepts plea. ( TPS) (Sunbury, B.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Indictment
                                                                  INDICTMENT returned in Hartford before TPS as to Nicholas Daddona (1) count(s) 1-2, 3 Hartford rotation. Summons issued. (Sunbury, B.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                    SUMMONS issued for Nicholas Daddona to appear on 6/13/01 before TPS 10:00 A.M. (Sunbury, B.)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?