Brett, et al v. Bridgestone/Fire, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00001-DJS
District Judge Dominic J. Squatrito, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alice Brett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo All Plaintiffs, Plaintiff
No Logo Anel Cintron, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Bridgitte Kelly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Bruce L. Nourie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Bryant S. Judd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Denise Wajnowski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Doris Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Gary J. Borkowski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Gianfranco Benedetti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Harry Graham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo James H. Ewen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo James Keeley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo James P. Church, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo James T. Evans, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Joseph Mastracchio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Karen D'Angelo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Kathleen A. Keane, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo KATHLEEN GRAHAM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Lee Schlesinger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Lucille Mastracchio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Michael Demennato, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Pamela Neuendorf, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Peter Massey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Ronald F. Rubano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Steven Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo Thomas Giambra, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
No Logo William McDermott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Slossberg +1 203 877 8000 +1 203 878 9800 dslossberg@hssklaw.com
v.
No Logo Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bridgestone/Firestone, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Chipman, Mazzucco, Land & Pennarola, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ward J. Mazzucco +203 744 192 9x25 +1 203 790 5954 wjm@danburylaw.com
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, Vastera, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzhugh, Parker & Alvaro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Newcity +1 617 695 2330 +1 617 695 2335 mnewcity@fitzhughlaw.com
Space Benjamin Aaron Pushner +1 617 695 2330
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 385 - Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Fairfield
Terminated 2/20/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Order
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - case transferred to the Southern District of Indiana ( Micheal J. Beck) (Gothers, M.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Terminated Case
    Case closed (Gothers, M.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Terminated Case
      Interdistrict transfer to District of Indiana. Original file, certified copies of docket and Order sent 2/27/01 (Gothers, M.)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of Final Transfer Order Issued by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Ford Motor Company (Gothers, M.)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM by Alice Brett, Gianfranco Benedetti, Gary J. Borkowski, James P. Church, Anel Cintron, Karen D'Angelo, Michael Demennato, James T. Evans, James H. Ewen, Thomas Giambra Jr., Harry Graham, Kathleen Graham, Bryant S. Judd, Kathleen A. Keane, Bridgitte Kelly, Joseph Mastracchio, Lucille Mastracchio, Peter Massey, William McDermott, Pamela Neuendorf, Bruce L. Nourie, Ronald F. Rubano, Lee Schlesinger, Denise Wajnowski, Steven Wilson, Doris Wilson, , James Keeley in support of [20-1] motion to Remand (Gothers, M.)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001, Terminated: 2/20/2001 Motion to Remand
            MOTION by Alice Brett, Gianfranco Benedetti, Gary J. Borkowski, James P. Church, Anel Cintron, Karen D'Angelo, Michael Demennato, James T. Evans, James H. Ewen, Thomas Giambra Jr., Harry Graham, Kathleen Graham, Bryant S. Judd, Kathleen A. Keane, Bridgitte Kelly, Joseph Mastracchio, Lucille Mastracchio, Peter Massey, William McDermott, Pamela Neuendorf, Bruce L. Nourie, Ronald F. Rubano, Lee Schlesinger, Denise Wajnowski, Steven Wilson, Doris Wilson, all plaintiffs, James Keeley to Remand (Brief Due 2/21/01 ) (Gothers, M.)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Answer
              ANSWER/ Affirmative Defenses to the Complaint by Bridgestone/Fire (Gothers, M.)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Interested Parties by Bridgestone/Fire (Gothers, M.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001, Terminated: 2/20/2001 Description not availableCourt Filing
                  MOTION by Alice Brett, Gianfranco Benedetti, Gary J. Borkowski, James P. Church, Anel Cintron, Karen D'Angelo, Michael Demennato, James T. Evans, James H. Ewen, Thomas Giambra Jr., Harry Graham, Kathleen Graham, Bryant S. Judd, Kathleen A. Keane, Bridgitte Kelly, Joseph Mastracchio, Lucille Mastracchio, Peter Massey, William McDermott, Pamela Neuendorf, Bruce L. Nourie, Ronald F. Rubano, Lee Schlesinger, Denise Wajnowski, Steven Wilson, Doris Wilson, all plaintiffs, James Keeley to Transfer Case to Judge Warren W. Eginton (Brief Due 2/6/01 ) (Gothers, M.)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 3/9/2001 Remark
                    There is no document #17. (Gothers, M.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Bridgestone/Fire -- Ward J. Mazzucco (Gothers, M.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ford Motor Company -- Mark A. Newcity (Blue,A.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001, Terminated: 2/20/2001 Response to Motion
                          RESPONSE by Bridgestone/Fire to [10-1] motion to Stay Case by Ford Motor Company (Gothers, M.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of [10-1] motion to Stay Case (Walker, J.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001, Terminated: 2/20/2001 Motion to Stay
                              MOTION by Ford Motor Company to Stay Case (Brief Due 1/26/01 ) (Walker, J.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001, Terminated: 2/20/2001 Answer
                                ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company (Bauer, J.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Response
                                  Response by Bridgestone/Fire to [1-1] removal notice by Ford Motor Company (Gothers, M.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION by Bridgestone/Fire to Extend Time until 2/5/01 to answer (Walker, J.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                      COMPLIANCE by Ford Motor Company with Standing Order (Pesta, J.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                        Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Pesta, J.) Modified on 01/10/2001
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ford Motor Company -- Benjamin A. Pushner (Pesta, J.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE of No Pending Motions by Ford Motor Company (Pesta, J.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Re: Parties are to commence normal discovery immediately ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Pesta, J.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Scheduling Order
                                                ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/4/01 ; Dispositive Motions due 8/3/01 Amended Pleadings due 03/03/01 Motions to Dismiss due 04/03/01 (Pesta, J.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice of Removal
                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Judicial District of Bridgeport FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 2400 (Pesta, J.)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?