Nationwide Mutual, et al v. Morin, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00002-RNC
District Judge Robert N. Chatigny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nationwide Assurance Co, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide General Ins Co, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Life Ins Co, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Property & Casualty Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Variable Life Co, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Chet W. Koelsch, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria T. Ackley +1 860 275 8347 +1 860 275 8299 mackley@rc.com
Space Frank F. Coulom, Jr. +1 860 275 8200 +1 860 275 8299 fcoulom@rc.com
No Logo Ronald Morin, Jr., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria T. Ackley +1 860 275 8347 +1 860 275 8299 mackley@rc.com
Space Frank F. Coulom, Jr. +1 860 275 8200 +1 860 275 8299 fcoulom@rc.com
No Logo Ronald P. Morin, Sr., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria T. Ackley +1 860 275 8347 +1 860 275 8299 mackley@rc.com
Space Frank F. Coulom, Jr. +1 860 275 8200 +1 860 275 8299 fcoulom@rc.com
v.
No Logo Chet W. Koelsch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria T. Ackley +1 860 275 8347 +1 860 275 8299 mackley@rc.com
Space Frank F. Coulom, Jr. +1 860 275 8200 +1 860 275 8299 fcoulom@rc.com
No Logo Ronald Morin, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria T. Ackley +1 860 275 8347 +1 860 275 8299 mackley@rc.com
Space Frank F. Coulom, Jr. +1 860 275 8200 +1 860 275 8299 fcoulom@rc.com
No Logo Ronald P. Morin, Sr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria T. Ackley +1 860 275 8347 +1 860 275 8299 mackley@rc.com
Space Frank F. Coulom, Jr. +1 860 275 8200 +1 860 275 8299 fcoulom@rc.com
No Logo Nationwide Assurance Co, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole J. Anker +1 860 275 6412 +1 860 275 6410

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide General Ins Co, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole J. Anker +1 860 275 6412 +1 860 275 6410

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Life Ins Co, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole J. Anker +1 860 275 6412 +1 860 275 6410

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Mutual Fire Ins. Co., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole J. Anker +1 860 275 6412 +1 860 275 6410

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole J. Anker +1 860 275 6412 +1 860 275 6410

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Property & Casualty Company, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole J. Anker +1 860 275 6412 +1 860 275 6410

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
No Logo Nationwide Variable Life Co, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole J. Anker +1 860 275 6412 +1 860 275 6410

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah S. Freeman +1 860 240 2700 +1 860 240 2818 deborah.freeman@bingham.com
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flags EFILE, REFCNF, TPS
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 OrderCourt Filing
Electronic Filing Case ORDER, Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/5/06. (Blue, A.)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
    NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC ORDER. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE RE: [29] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erin O'Brien Choquette terminated. Granted. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/13/06. (Blue, A.)
      LREF
      Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006, Terminated: 6/13/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
      MOTION for Erin O'Brien Choquette to Withdraw as Attorney by Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin, Jr, Ronald P. Morin, Sr. (Blue, A.)
        LREF
        Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 OrderCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE RE: ELECTRONIC FILING OF CASE - Effective 7/1/06. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE. EFILE Order attached. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/7/06. (Blue, A.) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2006 (Blue, A.).
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny : Telephone Status Conference held on 5/15/2006. (All cases)(15 minutes)(Court Reporter Darlene Warner.) (Walker, J.)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 5/15/2006 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel for plaintiffs will initiate conference call to chambers at 860-240-3659 with all counsel on the line. (Walker, J.)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
            ORDER of referral to Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith for settlement conference (signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny ) (Blue,A.)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
              NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 16(a) Lack of Prosecution. Status Report due on 10/15/02 ( Signed by Mag. Judge Donna F. Martinez ) (Blue,A.)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Order
                ENDORSEMENT approving & adopting [22-1] recommended ruling denying [17-1] motion to Join Additional Party as a counterclaim defendant ( signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny ) (Bauer, J.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Order
                  ENDORSEMENT granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time until 12/28/01 to respond to discovery, all other deadlines remain in effect. ( signed by Mag. Judge Donna F. Martinez ) (Blue,A.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001, Terminated: 11/29/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                    MOTION by Nationwide Mutual, Nationwide Life Ins, Nationwide General, Nationwide Assurance, Nationwide Property, Nationwide Fire Ins, Nationwide Variable to Extend Time until 12/28/01 to respond to discovery (Blue,A.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 22 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001, Terminated: 1/16/2002 Recommended RulingCourt Filing
                      RECOMMENDED Ruling denying [17-1] motion to Join Additional Party as a counterclaim defendant Objections due 9/4/01 ( signed by Mag. Judge Donna F. Martinez ) 10 Page(s) (Blue,A.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 Motion Hearing
                        Motion hearing held re: [17-1] motion to Join Additional Party as a counterclaim defendant by Ronald Morin Jr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald P. Morin Sr. ( DFM) (Blue,A.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY by Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. to response to [17-1] motion to Join Additional Party as a counterclaim defendant (Blue,A.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Nationwide Mutual, Nationwide Life Ins, Nationwide General, Nationwide Assurance, Nationwide Property, Nationwide Fire Ins, Nationwide Variable -- Nicole J. Anker (Blue,A.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              OBJECTIONS by Nationwide Mutual, Nationwide Life Ins, Nationwide General, Nationwide Assurance, Nationwide Property, Nationwide Fire Ins, Nationwide Variable to [17-1] motion to Join Additional Party as a counterclaim defendant by Ronald Morin Jr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald P. Morin Sr. (Former Employee)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 ~Motion for Joinder
                                MOTION by Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. to Join Additional Party as a counterclaim defendant (Brief Due 6/20/01 ) (Blue,A.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mag. Judge Donna F. Martinez ( signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny ) (Blue,A.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER of Transfer ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) to Judge Robert N. Chatigny (Candee, D.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Order
                                      ENDORSEMENT granting [13-1] motion to Transfer Case to Judge Chatnigy ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Order
                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [14-1] report, resetting Discovery deadline to 11/30/01 , resetting Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/01 ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                          REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting (Montz, A.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                            MOTION by Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. to Transfer Case to Judge Chatnigy (Cody, C.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE to Secretary of Labor and Treasury and Atty. General CT and Commissioner of Consumer Protection by Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. (Cody, C.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Answer
                                                ANSWER & AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint; jury demand and COUNTERCLAIM by Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. against Nationwide Mutual, Nationwide Life Ins, Nationwide General, Nationwide Assurance, Nationwide Property, Nationwide Fire Ins, Nationwide Variable (Candee, D.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                  Waiver of Service of Summons as to Ronald Morin Jr. signed on 2/23/01 (Candee, D.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                    Waiver of Service of Summons as to Chet W. Koelsch signed on 2/23/01 (Candee, D.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                      Waiver of Service of Summons as to Ronald P. Morin Sr. signed on 2/23/01 (Candee, D.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Order
                                                        ENDORSEMENT granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time for 30 days to respond to complaint ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Candee, D.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          MOTION by Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. to Extend Time for 30 days to respond to complaint (Candee, D.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. -- Edward F. Hennessey (Candee, D.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. -- Maria T. Ackley (Candee, D.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. -- Erin K. O'Brien (Candee, D.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. -- Frank F. Coulom Jr. (Candee, D.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Scheduling Order
                                                                    ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/4/01 ; Dispositive Motions due 8/3/01 Amended Pleadings due 3/2/01 Motions to Dismiss due 4/2/01 (Walker, J.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H002206 (Walker, J.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for Ronald P. Morin Sr., Chet W. Koelsch, Ronald Morin Jr. (Walker, J.)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?