Howard v. General Elec Capital
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00003-GLG
District Judge Gerard L. Goettel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jennifer Howard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Burgoyne Prestley +1 860 246 2466 +1 860 246 1794 pbprestley@mppjustice.com
v.
No Logo General Elec Capital Svc, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheila Anne Denton +1 203 798 9988 sdenton@rdg.boehringer-ingelheim.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pullman & Comley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam J. Cohen +1 203 330 2230 +1 203 576 8888 ajcohen@pullcom.com
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Fairfield
Terminated 2/25/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Terminated Case
Case closed (Brown, S.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Order
    ENDORSEMENT approving [13-1] stipulation of dismissal ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Brown, S.)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002, Terminated: 2/8/2002 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of dismissal of Case as to General Elec Capital (Villano, P.)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
        Deadline updated; reset Dismissal due by 11/24/01 (Brown, S.)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001 Order
          ENDORSEMENT granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time until 11/24/01 to file closing papers, reset Dismissal due by 11/24/01 ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Brown, S.) Modified on 10/25/2001
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001, Terminated: 9/28/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION by Jennifer Howard to Extend Time until 11/24/01 to file closing papers (Warner, R.)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 16(b) Settlement. Case reported settled on 8/27/01 Dismissal due 9/26/01 ( Signed by Clerk ) (Krajcik, R.)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Notice
                Notice to counsel regarding 26(f). Report of Conference due 8/30/01 ( signed by Clerk ) (Krajcik, R.)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Order
                  ENDORSEMENT granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time until 8/22/01 to respond to complaint ( signed by Judge Gerard L. Goettel ) (Depino, F.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                    MOTION by General Elec Capital to Extend Time until 7/23/01 to respond to complaint (Warner, R.)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Order
                      ENDORSEMENT granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to 7/23/01 to respond to Complaint ( signed by Clerk ) (Pesta, J.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001, Terminated: 6/21/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                        MOTION by General Elec Capital to Extend Time to 7/23/01 to respond to Complaint (Pesta, J.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001, Terminated: 5/18/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                          Unopposed MOTION by General Elec Capital to Extend Time until 6/21/01 to respond to complaint (Inferrera, L.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for General Elec Capital -- Adam J. Cohen (Inferrera, L.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for General Elec Capital -- Sheila Anne Denton (Inferrera, L.)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Order
                                ENDORSEMENT re:[7-1] motion to Extend Time until 6/21/01 to respond to complaint--ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Inferrera, L.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed on 5/1/01 as to General Elec Capital (Montgomery, C.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER of Transfer ( signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny ) to Judge Gerard L. Goettel (D'Onofrio, B.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Scheduling Order
                                      ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/4/01 ; Amended Pleadings due 03/02/01 Motions to Dismiss due 04/02/01 (Sprong, R.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H002210 (Sprong, R.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Summons Issued
                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for General Elec Capital (Sprong, R.)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?