Paradis, et al v. Daley Moving
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00004-JBA
District Judge Janet Bond Arterton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carol Paradis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William A. Conti

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith, Keefe, Moraghan & Waterfall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Moraghan +1 860 482 7651 +1 860 482 7845 dam@skmwlaw.com
No Logo Richard Shock, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William A. Conti
v.
No Logo Daley Moving & Storage, Inc. of Torrington, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by General Electric Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John William Dietz +1 203 227 2855
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 450 - Commerce ICC Rates Etc.
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 9/18/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Terminated Case
Case closed (Brown, S.)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to Daley Moving (Brown, S.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 2/20/2002 Order
      ENDORSEMENT re: [15-1] voluntary dismissal ordered accordingly ( signed by Clerk ) (Brown, S.) Modified on 02/20/2002
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 16(b) Settlement. Case reported settled on 8/17/01 Dismissal due 9/17/01 ( Signed by Clerk ) (Brown, S.)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Order
          ENDORSEMENT granting [13-1] motion to Continue status conference-settlement conference; reset to 5/29/01 @ 10:00 ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Brown, S.)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001, Terminated: 4/24/2001 Motion to Continue
            MOTION by Richard Shock to Continue status conference-settlement conference (Warner, R.)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Order
              ENDORSEMENT denying [11-1] motion For Alternative to Personal Attendance at Status Conference ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Depino, F.)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses by Daley Moving to amended complaint (Brown, S.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  MOTION by Carol Paradis For Alternative to Personal Attendance at Status Conference (Brown, S.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 9/3/01 ; Dispositive Motions due 9/17/01 ; Status Report by 8/16/01 . Trial Ready Date Set for 11/1/01 SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DATES ( Signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Depino, F.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Status Conference
                      Status Conference held ( JBA) (Torday, B.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                        REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting (Pesta, J.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Amended Complaint
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by Carol Paradis, Richard Shock amending [1-1] removal notice by Daley Moving; jury demand (Depino, F.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                            APPEARANCE of Attorney for Carol Paradis -- David A. Moraghan (Pesta, J.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Notice
                              Notice to counsel regarding 26(f). Report of Conference due 3/5/01 ( signed by Clerk ) (Depino, F.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Carol Paradis, Richard Shock --William A. Conti (Pesta, J.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for Daley Moving -- John William Dietz (Beverly, T.) Modified on 01/11/2001
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Scheduling Order
                                    ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/4/01 ; Dispositive Motions due 8/3/01 Amended Pleadings due 03/02/01 Motions to Dismiss due 04/02/01 (Beverly, T.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Notice of Removal
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Daley Moving from Judicial District of Litchfield FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # B001358 (Beverly, T.) Modified on 01/11/2001
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?