Best v. Couloute, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00005-SRU
District Judge Stefan R. Underhill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Clifton Best, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Jeffrey L. Sapir, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Sapir
No Logo Lucius Couloute, Defendant
No Logo Vincent A Federico, Defendant
No Logo William A Hamzy, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 220 - Foreclosure (Diversity)
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County New Haven
Terminated 8/23/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT for Date of August 21, 2002 (Court reporter: Susan E. Catucci) (D'Andrea, S.)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002 Order on Motion for Judgment
    JUDGMENT of Dismissal (signed by Clerk) (D'Andrea, S.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Terminated Case
      Case closed (D'Andrea, S.)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002 Miscellaneous Hearing
        Rule 16 Hearing held in chambers - Case dismissed sua sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction ( SRU) Reporter/ECRO: S. Catucci (Sbalbi, B.)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER Status Conference for 8/21/02 3:30 pm (signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill) (D'Andrea, S.)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
            REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting (D'Andrea, S.)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Notice
              Notice to counsel regarding 26(f). Report of Conference due 7/23/02 (signed by Clerk) (D'Andrea, S.)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                MARSHAL's return unexecuted on complaint as to Lucius Couloute (Larsen, M.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                  MARSHAL'S return of service on complaint executed as to William A Hamzy on 2/26/02 (Larsen, M.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                    PRO SE Appearance by William A Hamzy (Candee, D.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Waiver of Service Executed
                      Waiver of Service of Summons as to William A Hamzy signed on 3/26/02 (Candee, D.)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 Summons Issued
                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for Lucius Couloute, William A Hamzy - USM Form 285 given to Marshal for service (Sbalbi, B.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Lack of Service of Complaint. Plaintiff shall report on the status of service within 15 days or the court shall enter dismissal on 12/2/01 ( signed by Clerk ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 Notice
                            Notice to counsel regarding 26(f). Report of Conference due 11/16/01 ( signed by Clerk ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 ~Notice (other)
                              NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 16(a) Lack of Prosecution. Status Report due on 11/21/01 ( Signed by Clerk ) (Sbalbi, B.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Jeffrey L Sapir -- Jeffrey L. Sapir (Larsen, M.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER of Transfer ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) to Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Ruocco, M.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Amended Complaint
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by Clifton Best amending [2-1] complaint; jury demand (Torday, B.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                      MARSHAL's return unexecuted on Complaint as to Lucius Couloute individually (Basile, F.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER to show cause/notice to pro se plaintiff: Plaintiff to file amended complaint by 3/9/01 or the case will be dismissed without prejudice automatically after 3/9/01. ( signed by Judge Janet B. Arterton ) (Basile, F.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                          MARSHAL's return unexecuted on Complaint as to Lucius Couloute (Pesta, J.)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                            MARSHAL's return unexecuted on Complaint as to William A Hamzy (Pesta, J.)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                              MARSHAL'S return of service on Complaint executed as to Vincent A Federico on 1/18/01 (Pesta, J.)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                MARSHAL'S return of service on Complaint executed as to Jeffrey L Sapir on 1/18/01 (Pesta, J.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Jeffrey L Sapir (Basile, F.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Scheduling Order
                                                    ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 7/4/01 ; Dispositive Motions due 8/3/01 Amended Pleadings due 03/02/01 Motions to Dismiss due 04/02/01 (Pesta, J.)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                      MOTION by Clifton Best for Appointment of Counsel (Pesta, J.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT (Pesta, J.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                          MOTION by Clifton Best to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Pesta, J.)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                            US Marshal 285 forms and instructions returned to plaintiff for completion (Pesta, J.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Summons Issued
                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for Lucius Couloute, William A Hamzy, Jeffrey L Sapir, Vincent A Federico (Pesta, J.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Order
                                                                ENDORSEMENT granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Mag. Judge Joan G. Margolis ) (Pesta, J.)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 312 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?