Hannon v. Armstrong, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00012-AHN
District Judge Alan H. Nevas, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Hannon, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Connecticut Board of Parole, Defendant
No Logo John Armstrong, Defendant
No Logo John G. Rowland, Defendant
Office New Haven
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $600000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County New Haven
Terminated 6/7/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 01-0263[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, PRISONER
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Filing Fee Received
Filing fee: $ 150.00, receipt number B007382 (Corriette, M.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Appeal Record Returned
    Record on Appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals, Regarding [13-1] appeal by Michael Hannon . Receipt mailed to USCA. (Simpson, T.)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 USCA Mandate
      MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) dated 5/23/02 dismissing [12-1] appeal for lack of arguable basis in law or fact ( Roseann B. MacKechnie) (Fazekas, J.)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 Acknowledged Receipt of ROA
        ACKNOWLEDGED receipt of Record on Appeal at USCA on 11/16/01 received re: [13-1] appeal by Michael Hannon, [12-1] appeal by Michael Hannon USCA Number: 01-0263 (Warren, C.)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
          Record on Appeal Mailed to USCA: [13-1] appeal by Michael Hannon (Warren, C.)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Notice of Appeal
            NOTICE OF APPEAL of [11-1] order by Michael Hannon Certified Copy of Appeal and Docket mailed to USCA (Warren, C.)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Order
              ENDORSEMENT denying [10-1] motion for Protective Order ( signed by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ) (Larsen, M.)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL of [7-1] judgment order, [0-0] frivolous dismiss/dismissal by Michael Hannon Certified Copy of Appeal and Docket mailed to USCA (Warren, C.)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  RULING denying [8-1] motion for Clarification of [6-1] order, granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to file appeal. Clerk to docket Notice of Appeal. ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) 2 Page(s) (Larsen, M.)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Motion for Protective Order
                    MOTION by Michael Hannon for Protective Order (Jaiman, R.)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                      MOTION by Michael Hannon to Extend Time to file appeal (Larsen, M.)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001, Terminated: 10/4/2001 Motion for Clarification
                        MOTION by Michael Hannon for Clarification of [6-1] order (Larsen, M.)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Order on Motion for Judgment
                          JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the complaint be dismissed without prejudice and the matter closed, in accordance with the Court's order. ( signed by Clerk ) (Larsen, M.)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Terminated Case
                            Case closed (Larsen, M.)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Order FrivolousCourt Filing
                              RULING and ORDER dismissing the complaint without prejudice. It is certified that any appeal in forma pauperis from this order would not be taken in good faith because such an appeal would be frivolous. ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Larsen, M.)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ( signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas ) (Candee, D.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Order
                                  ENDORSEMENT granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Mag. Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons ) (Larsen, M.)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Motion for TRO
                                    MOTION by Michael Hannon for Restraining Order , and for Permanent Injunction (Brief Due 2/13/01 ) (Larsen, M.)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT (Beverly, T.)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Prisoner Authorization Form
                                        Prisoner Authorization Form by Michael Hannon (Beverly, T.)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                          MOTION by Michael Hannon to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Beverly, T.)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?