Velicka v. Guardian Life Ins Co, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-01960-DJS
District Judge Dominic J. Squatrito, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Dominic J. Squatrito
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Alvydas Velicka, Plaintiff

Represented by Outten & Golden LLP

v.
No Logo Eyelematic Mfg Co., Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Kamp +1 203 287 7050 +1 203 287 7051

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Glen Pierson +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 gpierson@lflaw.com
Other Parties
No Logo Benefits Group, Inc, Third Party Defendant

Represented by robertnoonan.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert D. Noonan +1 860 349 7010 +1 860 349 7011 robertnoonan@robertnoonan.com

Represented by Sirva

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph T. Sweeney +1 860 297 4629 sweeney@halloran-sage.com
No Logo Eyelematic Mfg Co., Inc., Cross-Claimant

Represented by Carmody & Torrance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Domenico Zaino, Jr. +1 203 573 1200 +1 203 575 2600 dzaino@carmodylaw.com
No Logo Eyelematic Mfg Co., Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Represented by Carmody & Torrance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen Danehy Cox +1 203 573 1200 +1 203 575 2600 mcox@carmodylaw.com
Attributes
Office New Haven
Filed 10/17/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hartford
Terminated 12/18/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, REFCNF, TPS
Timeline
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Order
ENDORSEMENT so ordered [53-1] stipulation and Order of Dismissal ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 53 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal of parties as to Alvydas Velicka, Eyelematic Mfg Co. (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 52 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: This case has been settled (signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Terminated Case
Case closed (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 51 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Settlement Conference
Settlement Conference held. Case settled. (TPS) (Sunbury, B.)
LREF
Blank 50 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
AMENDED ORDERED that a settlement conference shall be held on 12/17/02 at 2:00 p.m. in Hartford (signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [48-1] motion to Extend Time to 01/12/02 to file dispositive motions, resetting Dispositive Motions due by 1/12/03 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [49-1] motion to be Excused from Participation in a mediation session ( signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by Benefits Group, Inc to be Excused from Participation in a mediation session (Brief Due 12/23/02 ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 48 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Benefits Group, Inc to Extend Time to 01/12/02 to file dispositive motions (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 47 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED that a settlement conference shall be held on 12/12/02 at 10:00 a.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Alvydas Velicka -- Tammy T. Marzigliano (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 45 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER of referral to Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith for settlement conference only (signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
Status Conference cancelled ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [43-1] motion to Extend Time to 12/4/02 to file Dispositive Motions, resetting Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/02 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Alvydas Velicka -- Tammy Marzigliano (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 43 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002, Terminated: 11/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Benefits Group, Inc to Extend Time to 12/4/02 to file Dispositive Motions (Ferguson, L.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT so ordered [41-1] stipulation of dismissal ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [42-1] motion for Francis H. Morrison, III to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Francis H. Morrison for Guardian Life Ins Co) ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
Status Conference set for 4:30 11/12/02 ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
LREF
Blank 42 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 10/31/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION by Guardian Life Ins Co for Francis H. Morrison, III to Withdraw as Attorney (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
Status Conference cancelled ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT so ordered [40-1] stipulation of dismissal ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002, Terminated: 10/31/2002 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal of party as to Guardian Life Ins Co ONLY (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal of party as to Guardian Life Ins Co (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time to 11/7/02 to complete Discovery, resetting Discovery deadline to 11/7/02 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Guardian Life Ins Co -- Daniel L. FitzMaurice (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002, Terminated: 10/10/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Guardian Life Ins Co, Benefits Group, Inc to Extend Time to 11/7/02 to complete Discovery (Ferguson, L.)
LREF
Blank 37 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, resetting Discovery deadline to 10/17/02 , resetting Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/02 , resetting Filing of Joint Trial Memorandum due by 12/17/02 This case shall proceed to trial during the month of 01/03 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time to 09/09/02 to respond to Complaint ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002, Terminated: 8/27/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Alvydas Velicka, Guardian Life Ins Co, Eyelematic Mfg Co., Benefits Group, Inc to Extend Time to 09/09/02 to respond to Complaint (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
Status Conference set for 4:00 10/30/02 ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002, Terminated: 7/18/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Guardian Life Ins Co to Extend Time to 08/23/02 to respond to First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time to 08/23/02 to respond to First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents All other scheduled dates shall be modified by this order ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Gothers, M.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting in part [33-1] motion to Extend Time to 10/17/02 to complete discovery, resetting Discovery deadline to 10/17/02 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Status Conference
Status Conference held ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002, Terminated: 7/1/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Eyelematic Mfg Co. to Extend Time to 10/17/02 to complete discovery (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
Status Conference set for 4:00 6/21/02 ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
Status Conference cancelled ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Answer
ANSWER by Benefits Group, Inc to [16-1] third-party complaint by Eyelematic Mfg Co. (Basile, F.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time to 06/17/02 to submit expert reports ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002, Terminated: 5/9/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Guardian Life Ins Co to Extend Time to 06/17/02 to submit expert reports (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
Status Conference set for 3:00 5/30/02 ( DJS) (Glynn, T.)
LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Answer
ANSWER by Benefits Group, Inc to [16-1] third-party complaint by Eyelematic Mfg Co. (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED that the parties shall call chambers on 04/29/02 to set up a conference ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/17/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to 04/24/02 to respond to Third-Party Complaint ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002, Terminated: 4/16/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Guardian Life Ins Co to Extend Time to 04/24/02 to respond to Third-Party Complaint (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Benefits Group, Inc -- Joseph T. Sweeney (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to 04/20/02 to answer the Third-Party Complaint ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Benefits Group, Inc to Extend Time to 04/20/02 to answer the Third-Party Complaint (Grady, B.)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Benefits Group, Inc -- Robert D. Noonan (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [24-1] motion for Domenico Zaino, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Domenico Zaino for Eyelematic Mfg Co. (signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [23-1] motion for Maureen Danehy Cox to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Maureen Danehy Cox for Eyelematic Mfg Co., (signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002, Terminated: 3/20/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION by Eyelematic Mfg Co. for Domenico Zaino, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002, Terminated: 3/20/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION by Eyelematic Mfg Co. for Maureen Danehy Cox to Withdraw as Attorney (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed on 03/01/02 as to Benefits Group, Inc (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to 04/12/02 to answer Third-Party Complaint ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Eyelematic Mfg Co. -- W. Glen Pierson (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Eyelematic Mfg Co. -- Michael P. Kamp (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Guardian Life Ins Co to Extend Time to 04/12/02 to answer Third-Party Complaint (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Stipulation
STIPULATION regarding initial disclosures by Guardian Life Ins Co (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Crossclaim
CROSSCLAIM by Eyelematic Mfg Co. against Guardian Life Ins Co (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Third-Party Complaint
THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Eyelematic Mfg Co. against The Benefits Group (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for The Benefits Group (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER approving [11-1] report, resetting Discovery deadline to 7/17/02 , resetting Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/02 , setting Filing of Joint Trial Memorandum due by 9/17/02 This case shall be trial ready 10/02 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 Answer
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Eyelematic Mfg Co. (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002 Answer
ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint by Guardian Life Ins Co (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Guardian Life Ins Co -- Christine A. Baily (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to 01/29/02 to respond to the Complaint, denying as moot [9-1] motion to Extend Time to 1/9/2002 to answer, 26(f) Report of Conference Due 1/25/02 , setting Dismissal due by 1/25/02 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Guardian Life Ins Co to Extend Time to 01/29/02 to respond to the Complaint (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Guardian Life Ins Co to Extend Time to 1/9/2002 to answer (Montgomery, C.)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Guardian Life Ins Co -- Francis H. Morrison III (Montgomery, C.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 Order
ENDORSEMENT granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time 30 days to file a response to the Complaint, 26(f) Report of Conference Due 1/31/02 , setting Dismissal due by 1/31/02 ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 ~Notice (other)
Disclosure Statement by Eyelematic Mfg Co. (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Eyelematic Mfg Co. -- Domenico Zaino Jr. (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Notice of Appearance
APPEARANCE of Attorney for Eyelematic Mfg Co. -- Maureen Danehy Cox (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001, Terminated: 12/19/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Eyelematic Mfg Co. to Extend Time 30 days to file a response to the Complaint (Grady, B.)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER re: parties to commence discovery immediately ( signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito ) (Walker, J.)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Scheduling Order
ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel Discovery cutoff 4/18/02 ; Dispositive Motions due 5/18/02 Amended Pleadings due 12/17/01 Motions to Dismiss due 1/17/02 (Walker, J.)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Complaint
COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # H004621 (Walker, J.)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for Guardian Life Ins, Eyelematic Mfg Co. (Walker, J.)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 136 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?